Kahala CCM Factors, LLC v. Fong, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00383-SOM-BMK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 31, 2017 at 2:26 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kahala CCM Factors, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Cole +5297 529 529 7300 +5248 524 524 8293 ccole@carlsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert G. Klein klein@m4law.com
No Logo Ellyn Lo Fong, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Hiram L. Fong, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Patsy Nakano Fong, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Rodney Leong Fong, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
v.
No Logo 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ning Lilly & Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A. Jones +5281 528 528 1100
Space Michael A. Lilly michael@nljlaw.com
Space Ke-Ching Ning +5281 528 528 1100 ning@nljlaw.com
No Logo Adrienne M.L. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Brandon N.C.K. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Chelsea Tree Fong, Defendant
No Logo Clifford Marshall Tong, Defendant
No Logo Dale S.N. Fong, Defendant
No Logo David Y.H. Asari, Defendant
No Logo Deborah B.J. Fong Fong, Defendant
No Logo Del Associates, Defendant
No Logo Ellen Lee Fong, Defendant
No Logo Ellyn Lo Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Ellyn Lo Fong Revocable Trust dated 3/24/93, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Emily Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Finance Enterprises, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colette L. Honda +1 808 523 9833 +1 808 528 1656 hondacolette@yahoo.com
Space Delwyn H.W. Wong +5313 531 531 3526
Space Reuben S.F. Wong +5313 531 531 3526 reubenwong@yahoo.com
No Logo Forest Wing Fong, Defendant
No Logo Glen S.W. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Hiram L. Fong, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Hiram Leong Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Hiram Leong Fong Revocable Trust Dated 3/17/93, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Janet Fong, Defendant
No Logo Janna Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Jason Roberto Tong, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey S.C. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hpclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison P. Chung +5233 523 523 3311 +5311 531 531 1339 bkr@hpclaw.com
No Logo Jonathan Warren Tong, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Y.C. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Keith S.K. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Tong, Defendant
No Logo Leonard K.K. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Linda L. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Mark Lex Tong, Defendant
No Logo Marvin Allan Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terence J. O'Toole +1 808 537 6100
Space Stephanie E.W. Thompson +1 808 537 6100 +1 808 537 5434 sthompson@starnlaw.com
No Logo Mary Lou Woo, Defendant
No Logo Merie Ellen Fong Gushi, Defendant
No Logo Nathan Allan Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terence J. O'Toole +1 808 537 6100
No Logo NVC Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith Ann Pavey +5285 528 528 5200
No Logo Patsy Nakano Fong, Defendant
No Logo Pearl L. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Rodney Leong Fong, Defendant
No Logo Rodney S.O. Fong, Defendant
No Logo Ronald K. Kotoshirodo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Playdon & Guben

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerrold K. Guben jkg@roplaw.com
No Logo Sai Investment Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by lawcsilc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven L. Ching +5225 522 522 5133
Space David M. Lum +5225 522 522 5133 ksagena@lawcsilc.com
No Logo Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terence J. O'Toole +1 808 537 6100
Space Stephanie E.W. Thompson +1 808 537 6100 +1 808 537 5434 sthompson@starnlaw.com
No Logo Shama Rain Fong, Defendant
No Logo Sherman S. Hee, Defendant
No Logo Sky Hiram Fong, Defendant
No Logo Stephanie Y. Hee, Defendant
No Logo Susan B.L. Fong Takashima, Defendant
No Logo Valerie B.L. Fong Asari, Defendant
No Logo Winton Tong, Defendant
No Logo N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyons Brandt Cook & Hiramatsu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George W. Brandt gbrandt@lbchlaw.com
No Logo Oliver Lau Lawhn Ogawa & Nakamura, Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogawa, Lau, Nakamura & Jew

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt K. Leong kleong@ollon.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 6/24/2002
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 6/28/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, CSSTAY, HGREC, SPKREC
  Entries (270) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 257 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership. (bbb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 256 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Request
    REQUEST FOR REMOVAL from Service List as to Attorney Jill D. Raznov by 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership. (bbb, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 255 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Clerks Judgment
      JUDGMENT entered on 6/28/07. It is ordered and adjudged that judgment is entered pursuant to the various orders entered in this case. It is further ordered that, pursuant to the "FINAL ORDER REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF FORECLOSURE PROCEEDS" filed on June 27, 2007, that the Clerk of Court shall close this case. (emt, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 254 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC re [253] Order Regarding Disbursement of Foreclosure Proceeds, Filed June 27, 2007 (Cole, Christopher)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [255] JUDGMENT, with copy of "FINAL ORDER REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF FORECLOSURE PROCEEDS" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on June 28, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 253 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
            FINAL ORDER REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF FORECLOSURE PROCEEDS [252] - Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/27/07. (emt, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 252 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Submission of Proposed OrderCourt Filing
              SUBMISSION of Proposed Order to Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY Regarding Disbursement for Foreclosure Proceeds. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                LREF
                Legal Document 251 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Status Report
                COMMISSIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT - by Jay T. Suemori. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 250 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER (1) DENYING DEFENDANT FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; AND (2) DENYING DEFENDANT NVC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT TO MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS [237], [247] - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 5/3/07. [Motions terminated: [247] MOTION for Leave to File filed by NVC Limited Partnership.] (emt, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                  COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [250] "ORDER (1) DENYING DEFENDANT FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; AND (2) DENYING DEFENDANT NVC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT TO MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on May 4, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 249 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                    EP: [237] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion for Sanctions - DENIED. Court to prepare the order. Motions terminated: [237] Motion for Sanctions. (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 1:58 - 2:21) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 248 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition NVC's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Wong, Reuben)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 247 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                        Defendant NVC Limited Partnership's MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to Defendant NVC Limited Partnership's Memorandum in Oppposition to Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion for Sanctions filed on March 23, 2007, filed on April 13, 2007 - by NVC Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Judith Ann Pavey# (2) Exhibit J (part 1 of 2)# (3) Exhibit J (part 2 of 2)# (4) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 246 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Memorandum
                          MEMORANDUM re [242] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for Sanctions filed by Marvin Allan Fong, Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Stephanie E.W. Thompson# (2) Certificate of Service)(Thompson, Stephanie)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 245 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [237] MOTION for Sanctions Reply Memo to NVC's Memo In Oppo filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Declaration of Reuben S.F. Wong# (3) Certificate of Service)(Wong, Reuben)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 244 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Statement of No Opposition
                              STATEMENT of No Opposition re [237] MOTION for Sanctions Filed March 23, 2007 filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Cole, Christopher)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 243 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Statement of No Opposition
                                STATEMENT of No Position and Notice of Intention Not to Appear at Hearing on [237] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MOTION for Sanctions filed on March 23, 2007; Certificate of Service - filed by Jay T. Suemori. (emt, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 242 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  Defendant NVC Limited Partnership's MEMORANDUM in Opposition to [237] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MOTION for Sanctions filed on March 23, 2007 - filed by NVC Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Declaration of Judith Ann Pavey# (11) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 241 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC re [240] Stipulation and Order Filed April 10, 2007 (Cole, Christopher)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 240 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                      STIPULATION RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/10/07. (emt, ) Modified on 4/10/2007 to add linkage to [239](emt, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 239 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007, Terminated: 4/10/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        MOTION approve Stipulation Re: Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 238 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                          NOTICE of Hearing on [237] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion for Sanctions is set for 5/3/2007 at 02:00 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (rwy)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 237 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Sanctions
                                            Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MOTION for Sanctions - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents and Table of Authorities # (2) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Declaration of Delwyn H. W. Wong# (8) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 236 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Declaration
                                              DECLARATION of Jay T. Suemori Regarding Additional Fees and Costs - by Jay T. Suemori, Commissioner (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 235 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Declaration
                                                Declaration of Christopher J. Cole in Support of Undisputed Secured Debt Amount for Lot 1 Shares; Certificate of Service. (Cole, Christopher)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 234 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Terminate MotionsCourt Filing
                                                  EP: Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order Dated 2/22/07 -Discussion held.Mr. Klein to turn over the stock certificate to Commissioner, Mr. Suemori.Finance Enterprises to turn over a check to Mr. Suemori.Mr. Suemori to disburse principle, interest and late fees to plaintiff.Mr. Suemori to file a declaration of his fees and costs through today, and to state who will be his nominee.Mr. Klein to file a declaration of fees and costs today.Mr. Klein to file his motion for fees by 4/9/07. This motion to be considered by Magistrate Kurren.Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order Dated 2/22/07 - Granted in part and Denied in part.No written order will be prepared Motions terminated: [228] MOTION to Compel filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd., Motion Hearing held on 3/16/2007 re [228] MOTION to Compel filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.. (Court Reporter Stephen Platt.) (Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY )(tbf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 233 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Statement in Support of Motion
                                                    STATEMENT in Support re [228] MOTION to Compel filed by Rodney Leong Fong(Individually and as Trustee for Chelsea Tree Fong, Forest Wing Fong, Shama Rain Fong, and Sky Hiram L. Fong), Patsy Nakano Fong. (Chung, Harrison)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 232 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [228] MOTION to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order Dated February 22, 2007, Filed March 15, 2007 filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Stewart Pressman# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 231 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        AMENDED ORDER GRANTING [229] FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR ITS [228] MOTION TO COMPEL ENFORCEMENT OF FEBRUARY 22, 2007, ORDER [230] -Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/15/07. [MOTION to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order Dated February 22, 2007 set for 3/16/2007 02:15 PM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY.] (emt, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 230 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER GRANTING FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.'S [229] MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR ITS [228] MOTION TO COMPEL ENFORCEMENT OF FEBRUARY 22, 2007, ORDER - Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/15/07. [ Motion terminated: [229]Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time to hear [228] MOTION to Compel - GRANTED. [228] MOTION to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order Dated February 22, 2007 set for 3/19/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY.] (emt, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 229 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 3/15/2007 Motion to Shorten Time to hear Motion
                                                            Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s EX PARTE MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear [228] Defendant's MOTION to Compel Enforcement of the Court's February 22, 2007 "Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Approving Report of Commission and Confirming Sale of Collateral (1,963 shares of stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Acution, filed December 13, 2006"; Certificate of Service - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (emt, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 228 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 3/16/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                              Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MOTION to Compel Compliance with this Court's Order Dated February 22, 2007 - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Declaration of Sam K. Yee# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E# (8) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [230] "ORDER GRANTING FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.'S [229] MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR ITS [228] MOTION TO COMPEL ENFORCEMENT OF FEBRUARY 22, 2007, ORDER" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on March 15, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 225 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                  Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Quash Subpoena issued to James H. Wright, Esq dated January 29, 2007 and for a Protective Order filed on February 1, 2007; Certificate of Service - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) [196] (cc: BMK) (ecs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2007 (emt, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 224 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE by 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership Withdrawal of: 1) Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination, dated January 29, 2007; and 2) Subpoena Issued to James H. Wright, Esq. dated January 29, 2007 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership. (Raznov, Jill)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [222] "ORDER DENYING [220] DEFENDANT 1570 ALEWA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO RESTRAIN FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD., FROM REFUSING TO ALLOW SHAREHOLDERS TO EXAMINE ITS FINANCIAL INFORMATION" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on February 26, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Note: a copy of this order was emailed by Chambers to the following: Reuben Wong, Esq., Jay Suemori, Esq., Judith Ann Pavey, Esq., Steven Jones, Esq., on February 23, 2007. (emt, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 223 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MEMORANDUM in Opposition to [215]Defendant NVC Limited Partnership's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed on February 22, 2007 - filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Declaration of Sam K. Yee (with exhibits)# (6) Declaration of Reuben S. F. Wong# (7) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 222 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER DENYING [220] DEFENDANT 1570 ALEWA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO RESTRAIN FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD., FROM REFUSING TO ALLOW SHAREHOLDERS TO EXAMINE ITS FINANCIAL INFORMATION - Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/23/07. (emt, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 220 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007, Terminated: 2/23/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                            Defendant 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership's Emergency MOTION to Compel Finance Enterprises Ltd. to Produce Financial and Valuation Information to Shareholders - by 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Declaration of Stephen A. Jones# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 219 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                              RESPONSE in Support[220]of Defendants 1570 Alewa's Emergency Motion to Compel Finance Enterprise Ltd to Produce Documents filed by Marvin Allan Fong. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Stephanie E.W. Thompson# (2)Certificate of Service # (3) Errata "A"# (4) Exhibit "B")(Thompson, Stephanie) Modified on 2/26/2007 to label attachment and add linkage. (Note: this filing contains a declaration and exhibits which are not referenced in the caption.) (emt, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                EO: NVC Limited Partnership's Motion for Temorary Restraining Order set for 2/23/07 @ 3:00 p.m. SOM is taken off calendar. Court issued an order. re [215] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY )(tbf, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 217 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER DENYING [215] DEFENDANT NVC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/23/07. [Because NVC fails to demonstrate any irreparable injury, its motion is denied. Should NVC have a different record upon which it would like a restraining order to issue, NVC may file another motion for temporary restraining order.] (emt, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                    COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [217] "ORDER DENYING [215] DEFENDANT NVC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER", [216]"ORDER REGARDING 215 DEFENDANT NVC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on February 23, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Note: Copies of both orders were emailed to Reuben Wong, Esq., Jay Suemori, Esq. and Judith Ann Pavey, Esq. on February 22, 2007 and February 23, 2007 respectively. (emt, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 216 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING [215] DEFENDANT NVC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/22/07. [Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2007 03:00 PM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY] (emt, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 215 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007, Terminated: 2/23/2007 Motion for TRO
                                                                                        (Notice of Motion); Defendant NVC Limited Partnership's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - by NVC Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Declaration of Judith Ann Pavey# (3) Exhibit 1# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit 3# (6) Exhibit 4# (7) Certificate of Service)(emt, ) Modified on 2/22/2007 (NOTE: Motion is not signed) (emt, ).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 214 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [158] PLAINTIFF KAHALA CCM FACTORS, LLC'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF COMMISSIONER AND CONFIRMING THE SALE OF COLLATERAL (1,963 SHARES OF STOCK IN FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.) AT PUBLIC AUCTION, FILED DECEMBER 13, 2006 - Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/22/07. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(emt, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                            COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [214] "ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [158] PLAINTIFF KAHALA CCM FACTORS, LLC'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF COMMISSIONER AND CONFIRMING THE SALE OF COLLATERAL (1,963 SHARES OF STOCK IN FINANCE ENTERPRISES, LTD.) AT PUBLIC AUCTION, FILED DECEMBER 13, 2006" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on February 22, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 213 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Statement of No Opposition
                                                                                              STATEMENT of No Position and Notice of Intention Not to Appear at Hearing on [196] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MOTION to Quash Subpoena Issued to James H. Wright, Esq., Dated January 29, 2007 and for Protective Order filed February 1, 2007; Certificate of Service - filed by Jay T. Suemori, Commissioner. (emt, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 221 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Susan Oki Mollway from Susan Tius, dated February 16, 2007. (emt, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 212 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Defendant 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership's MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s [196] Motion to Quash Subpoena issued to James H. Wright, Esq. dated January 29, 2007 and for a Protective Order;# (1) Declaration of Stephen A. Jones;# (2) Exhibit A;# (3) Exhibit B;# (4) Exhibit C;# (5) Exhibit D;# (6) Exhibit E;# (7) Exhibit F;# (8) Certificate of Service. (cc: BMK) (bbb, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 210 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Statement of No Opposition
                                                                                                    STATEMENT of No Opposition re [196] MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 211 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                      Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) (emt, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 209 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Submission of Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s PROPOSED ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part [158] Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 shares of stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed December 13, 2006 - by Finance Enterprise, Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion for Order Approving Report and Confirming Sale held on 2/6/07 before Judge Susan Oki Mollway. Court Reporter: Debra Chun. (dc@hid.uscourts.gov) pp. 49.
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 207 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC re [206] Order Denying Defendant Finance Enterprises' Motion to Compel Discovery From Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors Filed January 30, 2007 (Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 206 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT FINANCE ENTERPRISES' [186] MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFF KAHALA CCM FACTORS FILED JANUARY 30, 2007 - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 2/9/07. (emt, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 202 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura re [198] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 204 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Daniel B. T. Lau - by Finance Enterprises, Inc. (emt, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 203 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Terminate MotionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    EP: Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming Sale of the Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) At Public Auction -This hearing held together with the Honorable Robert J. Faris for cases:03-00674Hiram Leong & Ellyn Lo Fong - M/Authorize Sale of Assets and ProposedBidding Instructions Counsel present: Jerrold Guben, Reuben S.F. Wong, Lex Smith, Harrison Chung and James Wagner/Neil Verbrugge. Trustee Ronald Kotoshirodo present.05-04104Rodney Leong & Patsy Nakano Fong - M/Approve Sale Pursuant to StockPurchase Agreement Counsel present: Susan Tius, Harrison Chung and Lex Smith. Trustee Sandra Loomis present.Commissioner Jay Suemori present.Arguments.The bankruptcy minutes will be prepared by bankruptcy CRM Oriette Vegas.11:10 a.m. - Court takes a recess to allow the commissioner to conduct an overbid auction.11:35 - Commissioner informs the Court of the high bidders.Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming Sale of the Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) At Public Auction - Granted in part and denied in part.Court confirms the sale of the 3 lots at the prices announced by the commissioner.Commissioner to send notice of right of first refusal to Finance Enterprises tomorrow.A response is due 15 days after Finance Enterprises receives the notice.Notice to be sent to stockholders if Finance Enterprises does not exercise its right with respect to all 1,963 shares.Kahala CCMs request for attoneys' fees - denied without prejudice.Any renewed attorney fee requests to be submitted as soon as possible.Plaintiff to email or fax a proposed form of order to all counsel.Parties have 48 hours to object to the form of the order. Motions terminated: [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC, Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2007 re [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Court Reporter Debra Chun.) (Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY )(tbf, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 201 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC re [200] Affidavit, Exhibit "A" (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A")(Choi, Chuck)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 200 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction ; Exhibits "1" - "3" by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Choi, Chuck)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 199 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on [196] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to James H. Wright, Esq. Dated January 29, 2007 and for a Protective Order is set for 3/9/2007 at 03:00 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (rwy)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 198 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [154] MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, FILED DECEMBER 5, 2006 - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 2/2/07. (emt, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                              ADVISORY ENTRY RE: The entry docket number [200] Affidavit, filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. Please be advised that all attachments should be separated into individual pdfs and then attached to the main document. The filer may wish to refer to Section 2.6 of the Amended General Order Adopting Electronic Case Filing Procedures for further clarification. NO FURTHER ACTION REQUIRED. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 197 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                EP: [186] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Discovery From Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors - DENIED. Robert Klein to prepare the order. Motion terminated: [186] MOTION to Compel. (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 11:14 - 11:36) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 195 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [186] MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors Filed January 30, 2007 filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert G. Klein# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Certificate of Service)(Klein, Robert)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 196 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                    Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MOTION to Quash Subpoena Issued to James H. Wright, Esq., Dated January 29, 2007 and for a Protective Order - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 194 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Judge's InclinationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      JUDGE'S INCLINATIONS - by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (emt, ) Modified on 2/1/2007 to create linkage to [158] (emt, ).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                        COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [194] Judge's Inclinations has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on February 1, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on [186] Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Discovery From Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors is set for 2/2/2007 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Memorandum in Opposition are due by 10:00 AM on 2/2/2007. A courtesy copy shall be faxed to the court @ 808-541-3500. (rwy)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 190 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            EO: Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery, filed January 30, 2007, is hereby GRANTED. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 192 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership re: Deft 1570 Alewa Ltd Partnership's Notice of F.R.C.P Rule 45 Subpoenas Duces Tecum - Bank of Hawaii and Wamco XXVIII, Ltd. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 189 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [187] MOTION to Shorten Time to hear Motion re[186] MOTION to Compel filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher J. Cole# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3# (5) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 188 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership. re: Deft's Ntc of Taking Depo Upon Oral Examination - James H. Wright, Esq. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 187 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007, Terminated: 1/31/2007 Motion to Shorten Time to hear Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s EX PARTE MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear [186] MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 186 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). [Note: The caption does not reference the inclusion of the memorandum, exhibits, declaration and certificate of service in this filing.] (Attachments: # (1) Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Declaration of Reuben S. F. Wong# (6) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 185 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC re: Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Objections to Defendant Finance Enterprises, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC (Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 184 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of it's to Response to Motion re [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher J. Cole# (2) Exhibit 6# (3) Exhibit 7# (4) Exhibit 8# (5) Exhibit 9# (6) Exhibit 10# (7) Exhibit 11# (8) Exhibit 12# (9) Exhibit 13# (10) Exhibit 14# (11) Exhibit 15# (12) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher) Modified on 1/29/2007 to amend caption (emt, ).
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 183 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                            Defendant NVC Limited Partnership's RESPONSE and JOINDER in [180]Defendant 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership's Memorandum in Response to Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed December 12, 2006; Certificate of Service - filed by NVC Limited Partnership. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 182 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 181 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MEMORANDUM in Opposition to [158] Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LCC's MOTION for an Order Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction, filed December 13, 2006 - filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Declaration of Daniel B. T. Lau# (7) Declaration of Reuben S. F. Wong# (8) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 180 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership's MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE to Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's [158] Motion for an Order Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed December 12, 2006; Certificate of Service. (cc: BMK) (bbb, ) Modified on 1/23/2007 (cc:SOM)(emt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 179 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/20/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    EP: [154] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Filed by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura GRANTED. Kurt Leong to prepare the order. Motion [154] terminated. (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 2:40 - 2:42) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN) (rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 178 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT in Opposition re [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed by Rodney Leong Fong(Individually and as Trustee for Chelsea Tree Fong, Forest Wing Fong, Shama Rain Fong, and Sky Hiram L. Fong), Patsy Nakano Fong. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Chung, Harrison)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 177 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion for an Order Approving the Report of the Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction, Filed Dec. 12, 2006, filed by Marvin Allan Fong, Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong. (Attachments: # Certificate of Service(1))(Thompson, Stephanie) Modified on 1/22/2007 to label attachment (emt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 176 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION re [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed by Sai Investment Company. (Lum, David)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT in Opposition re [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction filed by Ronald K. Kotoshirodo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Certificate of Service)(Guben, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 174 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              EO: [154] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Filed by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura is continued from 1/12/2007 to 1/19/2007 at 02:30 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Notified: Robert Klein, Jeffrey Lau, Reuben Wong. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 173 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura re [171] Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,, (Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant SAI Investment Co.) (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd.'s MEMORANDUM in Opposition to [169] Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Ex Parte MOTION to Advance and Shorten Time for Hearing on [158] Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's MOTION for an Order Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction - filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reuben S. F. Wong# (2) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 171 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SAI INVESTMENT COMPANY, AND ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 1/5/07. [Attorney Steven L. Ching and David M. Lum of the law firm Char, Sakamoto, Ishii, Lum & Ching for Sai Investment Company added; Jeffrey Daniel Lau and Kurt Leong, law office of Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura withdrawing.] (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 170 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten time to hear MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Denying [169] Ex Parte Motion to Advance and Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral - Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/5/07. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                        COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [170] "ORDER Denying [169] Ex Parte Motion to Advance and Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on January 5, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007, Terminated: 1/5/2007 Motion to Shorten Time to hear Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time to hear Motion re[158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert G. Klein# (2) Certificate of Service)(Klein, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 168 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Return of Service on Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service on Subpoena (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura re [163] Order,, (Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Statement of No Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of No Opposition re [154] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Filed December 5, 2006 filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 an for Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94, filed November 14, 2006 [134] - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 12/22/06. [The law firm of Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura withdraw as counsel for defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement, Nathan Allan Fong and Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement.] (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 162 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura re [161] Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,, (Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel) (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 161 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION of Counsel for Defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd., and ORDER - signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren [Attorney Reuben S.F. Wong for Finance Enterprises, Ltd. added., Jeffrey Daniel Lau and Kurt K. Leong withdrawing as counsel for Finance Enterprises, Ltd.] (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on [154] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura is set for 1/12/2007 at 02:00 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura re [157] Submission of Proposed Order (re: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [158] MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction:. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2007 10:30 AM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (tbf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006, Terminated: 2/7/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for an Order of the Court Approving Report of Commissioner and Confirming the Sale of Collateral (1,963 Shares of Stock in Finance Enterprises, Ltd.) at Public Auction by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Appendix A# (3) Declaration of Christopher J. Cole# (4) Exhibit 1# (5) Exhibit 2# (6) Exhibit 3# (7) Exhibit 4# (8) Exhibit 5# (9) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 157 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Submission of Proposed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBMISSION of Proposed Order to Judge BARRY M. KURREN (re: Motion to Withdraw As Counsel). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 156 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura re [154] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 154 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura. (Leong, Kurt) Modified on 12/6/2006 [Note: this filing contains a memorandum in support of motion; notice to clients; appendix A] (emt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number [154] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura, was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that all attachments must be submitted as separate PDF's and labeled accordingly. The filer should refer to Section 2.6 of the Amended General Order Adopting Electronic Case Filing Procedures for further clarification. No further action required. . (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 155 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Original Signature submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement dated 5/9/94's SUBMISSION OF ORIGINAL DECLARATIONS OF MARVIN ALLAN FONG AND SANDRA Y. Y. AU FONG in Support of [142] Statement of Position Re Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - by Marvin Allan Fong, Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marvin Allan Fong# (2) Declaration of Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong# (3) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 153 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP: : [134] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 - GRANTED. Kurt Leong to prepare order. Christopher Cole to file Motion for Confirmation of Sale by 12/13/2006.Terminated: 134] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 1:58 - 2:05) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 152 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [151] Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 151 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Order on Motion to Substitute PartyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion to Substitute for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Parters I, L.P., filed September 28, 2006 [102] - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 11/29/06. [Kahala CCM Factors, LLC, shall be and is hereby substituted as a party plaintiff in this action for N. Harwood Street Partners, I, LP. The case caption shall hereinafter be amended to reflect that Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is the plaintiff in all future pleadings and papers filed in this case. The Court denies Enterprises' request to disqualify the McCorriston law firm from representing Kahala CCM in this matter. The Court orders that the following attorneys shall not participate in the McCorriston law firm's representation of Kahala CCM herein, and shall be hereafter screened off from providing or receiving any information in this matter: William C. McCorriston, Donald K. O. Wong, Paul B. Wong, David J. Minkin, and Stacey C. G. Hee. N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. terminated] (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 150 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [149] Errata (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 149 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Errata re [144] Objection (Objection to Proposed Order re: Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs, etc). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 148 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [144] Objection (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 147 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [146] Reply to Response to Motion, (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 146 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of to Response to Motion re [134] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Leong, Kurt) Modified on 11/28/2006 to amend caption (emt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 145 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's STATEMENT OF NO POSITION RESPONSE to Motion re [134] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94, Filed November 13, 2006; Certificate of Service filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Cole, Christopher) Modified on 11/28/2006 to amend text to reflect correct caption(emt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 144 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION re [139] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Objection to Proposed Order re: Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs, etc.) filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 143 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC re [139] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for an Amended Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Submission of Order Granting Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion to Substitute for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. Filed on September 28, 2006 (Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADVISORY ENTRY RE: The entry docket numbers [145] Response to Motion,, filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC and [146] Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura. Please be advised that incorrect event was used in both instances. Counsel may have used the event "statement of no opposition" with regards to docket number [145]. With regard to docket number [146], counsel may have used "memorandum in support of motion" or "reply". No further action required. . (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 142 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/24/2006 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong and Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94's STATEMENT OF POSITION re [134] MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94, filed November 13, 2006 - filed by Marvin Allan Fong, Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marvin Allan Fong# (2) Declaration of Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong# (3) Declaration of Terence J. O'Toole# (4) Exhibit A# (5) Exhibit B# (6) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 141 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership's STATEMENT OF POSITION re: [135] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong and Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement dated 5/9/94, filed November 13, 2006; # (1) Declaration of Stephen A. Jones;# (2) Declaration of Deane P. Leong;# (3) Exhibit A;# (4) Exhibit B;# (5) Certificate of Service. (cc: BMK) (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 140 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Statement of No Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of No Position and Notice of Intention Not to Appear at Hearing on [134] Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa and Nakamura's MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement dated 5/9/94 an for Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y. Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement dated 5/9/94; Certificate of Service - by Jay T. Suemori, Commissioner (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 139 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC, Kahala CCM Factors, LLC of Submission of Order Granting Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion to Substitute for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. Filed on September 28, 2006 Kahala CCM Factors, LLC, Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 138 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 137 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Commissioner's REPORT - by Jay T. Suemori. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Affidavit of Jay T. Suemori# (5) Exhibit A# (6) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [134] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on [134] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement Dated 5/9/94 is set for 12/1/2006 at 02:00 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 134 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006, Terminated: 12/22/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL for Defendants 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership, Marvin Allan Fong, as Trustees for the Marvin Allan Fong Revocable Trust Agreement date 5/9/94 and Nathan Allan Fong, and Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, as Trustee of the Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong Revocable Trust Agreement date 5/9/94; # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion;# (2) Notice to Clients by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation).(bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 133 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP: Status Conference Following Auction - the auction was held 11/1/2006. Commissioner Jay Suemori to file his report next week. Robert G. Klein will file a Motion for Confirmation of Sale. If Stephen A. Jones or Terence J. O'Toole file motions re representational issues, the hearings will be set expeditiously. (FTR-Ctrm C7 no record, 9 - 9:25) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 132 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance; certificate of service by Terence J. O'Toole on behalf of Marvin Allan Fong, Nathan Allan Fong, Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong on behalf of Marvin Allan Fong, Nathan Allan Fong, Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 131 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance; certificate of service by Michael A. Lilly, Stephen A. Jones, Ke-Ching Ning on behalf of 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership on behalf of 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership. (cc: BMK) (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 130 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC Re: Order Granting Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Setting Deadline for Any Interested Party to Show Cause Why Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is Allegedly Not Entitled to Credit Bid on the Collateral in the Amounts Set by the Express Terms of the Foreclosure Decrees, Filed on October 24, 2006 (Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 129 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's [124] FOR AN ORDERSETTING DEADLINE FOR ANY INTERESTED PARTY TO SHOW CAUSE WHY KAHALA CCMFACTORS, LLC IS ALLEGEDLY NOT ENTITLED TO CREDIT BID ON THE COLLATERAL IN THE AMOUNTS SET BY THE EXPRESS TERMS OF THE FORECLOSURE DECREES, FILED ON OCTOBER 24, 2006. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on November 3, 2006. (Order prepared by Pltf's counsel). (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 128 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO: Amended 10/27/2006 Minutes: Status Conference Re [124] Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Setting Deadline for Any Interested Party to Show Cause Why Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is Allegedly Not Entitled to Credit Bid on the Collateral in the Amounts Set by the Express Terms of the Foreclosure Decrees held. Auction to proceed on 11/1/2006 on three lots.Motion GRANTED w/o hearing. Klein to prepare the order.Commissioner Jay Suemori present. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 127 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Terminate MotionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Status Conference Re [124] Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Setting Deadline for Any Interested Party to Show Cause Why Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is Allegedly Not Entitled to Credit Bid on the Collateral in the Amounts Set by the Express Terms of the Foreclosure Decrees held. Auction to proceed on 8/1/2006 on three lots.Motion [124] GRANTED w/o hearing. Klein to prepare the order.Commissioner Jay Suemori present.Motion terminated: [124] Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Setting Deadline for Any Interested Party to Show Cause Why Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is Allegedly Not Entitled to Credit Bid on the Collateral in the Amounts Set by the Express Terms of the Foreclosure Decrees. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 2:30 - 2:50) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 126 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [124] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is Allegedly Not Entitled to Credit Bid filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EO: Status Conference Re [124] Plaintiff Kahala CCM Factors, LLC's Motion for an Order Setting Deadline for Any Interested Party to Show Cause Why Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is Allegedly Not Entitled to Credit Bid on the Collateral in the Amounts Set by the Express Terms of the Foreclosure Decrees is set for 10/27/2006 at 02:30 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 124 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006, Terminated: 10/27/2006 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Kahala CCM Factors, LLC is Allegedly Not Entitled to Credit Bid by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Declaration of Robert G. Klein# (3) Exhibit 1# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Certificate of Service)(Klein, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 123 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [122] Declaration. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 121 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP: Status Conference Re Whether Counsel for Kahala CCM Factors, LLC Should be Disqualified - the McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP law firm is not disqualified, but certain lawyers from the firm are not allowed to work on this matter.Klein to prepare an order. (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 10:56 - 11:21) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 122 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Russell J. Lau re [115] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 120 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. Re: Representation of Plaintiff by McCorriston Law Firm filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher J. Cole# (2) Exhibit 6# (3) Exhibit 7# (4) Declaration of Donald K. O. Wong# (5) Declaration of Bradley E. Smith# (6) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 119 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [115] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, [116] Declaration, [117] Declaration (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO: Briefing schedule for the Status Conference Re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. set for 10/20/2006 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN is amended as follows: Defendants' deadline to file brief extended from 10-16-06 to 10-17-06, Plaintiff's deadline to file brief extended from 10-18-06 to 10-19-06. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration re [115] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Kurt K. Leong). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration re [115] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Sam Yee). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. (First Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion) filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2006 re [107] MOTION for Joinder re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. filed by N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.,, [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. Status Conference set for 10/20/2006 11:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Court Reporter FTR-Courtroom 6) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN )(wnn, ) Modified on 10/11/2006 (wnn, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 111 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: 10/9/2006 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher J. Cole# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Declaration of William C. McCorriston# (7) Declaration of Stacey C. G. Hee# (8) Declaration of Paul B.K. Wong# (9) Declaration of David J. Minkin# (10) Declaration Donald K.O. Wong# (11) Declaration of Stewart Pressman# (12) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTIVE ENTRY. The entry docket number [111] Reply,, filed by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC, was filed incorrectly in this case. The signature on the main document (Reply. It appears to be Mr. Klein's.) is dramatically different from the signature on the Declaration of Christopher J. Cole. The person whose Login and password is being used shall be the signator of the pleading entered. The filing party should to take caution to enter pleadings correctly in future filings. (gls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 112 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Jeffrey Daniel Lau. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [109] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. ; Declaration of Kurt K. Leong filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTIVE ENTRY. The entry docket number [109] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd., was filed incorrectly in this case. The Declaration of Mr. Leong should've been entered as a separate PDF attachment. The filing party is cautioned to enter all parts of pleading articulated in future filings. The filing will stand. No action is required. (gls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTIVE ENTRY. The entry docket number [105] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd., was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit a corrected filing pursuant to the CM/ECF General Order 5.2 ECF User's Signature. The name of the ECF User under whose login andpassword the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" andtyped in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ JohnLawyer)... (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 108 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC re [107] MOTION for Joinder re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. (Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 106 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation) re [105] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. ; Declaration of Jeffrey Daniel Lau filed by Finance Enterprises, Ltd.(a Hawaii corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Leong, Kurt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RATIFICATION OF and Joinder in [102] MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. by N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.. (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 104 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP: Further Status Conference Re Completion of Auction - Commissioner Jay Suemori present.[102] Motion by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. is set for hearing on 10/10/2006 @ 2:45 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Per Commissioner Jay Suemori, notices of the auction will be placed in the newspaper for 3 consecutive weeks, beginning next week. Auction to take place on 11/1/2006.Status Conference Following the Auction is set for 11/8/2006 @ 9 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. cc: Judge Susan Oki Mollway, Toni Fujinaga(FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 9 - 9:17) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on [102] Motion by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. is set for 10/10/2006 at 02:45 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 11/29/2006 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Party for Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P. by Kahala CCM Factors, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Declaration of Bradley E. Smith# (3) Exhibit 1# (4) Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 101 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EP: Status Conference Re Completion of Auction held. Further conference set for 9/29/2006 @ 9 a.m., BMK.(FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 9:05 - 9:20) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO: . Status Conference set for 9/14/2006 at 9:30 AM is moved to 09:00 AM the same day before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Notified: Robert Klein, Jeffrey Lau. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP: Status Conference Re Completion of Auction held on 8/14/2006. Auction to take place in September 06. Further Status Conference set for 9/14/2006 @ 9:30 a.m., BMK. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 9:35 - 9:40) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO: Status Conference Re Completion of Auction continued from 8/1/2006 to 8/14/2006 at 09:30 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EP: Further Status Conference Re Settlement held on 4/17/2006. Bankruptcy stay lifted. Auction will proceed. Status Conference Re Completion of the Acution is set for 8/1/2006 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Beverly Hiramatsu and Jeffrey Lau present.(FTR-Ctrm C6 no record 9:05 - 9:08) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Further Status Conference Re Settlement held. Further Status Conference set for 4/17/2006 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Beverly HIramatsu and Jeffrey Lau present.(FTR-Ctrm No record.) (Judge BARRY M KURREN )(rwy, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP: Further Settlement Conference held on 12/28/2005. No settlement at this time. Further conference on call. (FTR-Ctrm No Record.) (Judge BARRY M KURREN )(rwy, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference Re Settlement continued from 1/06/06 to 1/17/06 10:30 AM before JUDGE BARRY M KURREN. (rwy, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EP: Further Status Conference Re Settlement - parties to have lift stayed to allow property to be sold. Further Status Conference 1-6-06 @ 2:30 p.m., BMK. [92-1] 2:30 1/6/06 ; status conference set for 2:30 1/6/06 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of bankruptcy filing by Defendants; exhibit a; certificate of service - CASE STAYED by Hiram L. Fong, Rodney Leong Fong, Patsy Nakano Fong, Ellyn Lo Fong (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER regarding status conference by Judge Susan O. Mollway - that the status conference scheduled for 11/9/05 9:30am before the Honorable Barry M. Kurren may not be continued without the permission of the trial judge; ; status conference set for 9:30 11/9/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel, Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren, CRM-RY) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO : ;Continued further status conference re settlement from 10/28/05 9:00 AM to for 9:30 AM 11/9/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Daphne from Lau's office to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO : ;Continued further status conference re settlement from 09/27/05 9:00 AM to 10/28/05 9:00 AM before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; per Beverly Lynn K. Hiramatsu, her clients are reviewing new documents; Hiramatsu to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Further Status Conference Re Settlement held. Jeffrey Lau to provide pltf with documents. Pltf will then decide on whether to proceed with the appraisal. Further Conference continued to 9-27-05 @ 9 a.m., BMK. ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 9/27/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : In chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION of counsel for defendants Finance Enterprses, Ltd., Marvin Allan Fong, as trustee for the Marvin Allan Fong revocable trust agreement dated 5/9/94 and for Nathan Allan Fong, Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, as trustee of the Sandra Y.Y Au Fong revocable trust agreement dated 5/9/94, Merie Ellen Fong Gushi, Emily Mitchell, Leonard K.K. Fong, as trustee of the Leonard K.K. Fong revocable living trust under trust dated 2/19/98, Ellen Lee Fong, as trustee for the Ellen Lee Fong revocable living trust under trust dated 2/19/98, Dale S.N. Fong, individually and as custodian for Adrienne M.L. Fong and Brandon N.C.K. Fong under the Hawaii Uniform Gift to minors act, Linda L. Fong, Glen S.W. Fong, Jeffrey S.C. Fong, Keith S.K. Fong, Rodney S.O. Fong, Pearl L. Fong, as trustee of the Pearl L. Fong, as trustee of the Pearl L. Fong revocable trust dated 2/21/00, Deborah B.J. Fong Yee, Jonathan Y.C. Fong, Susan B.L. Fong Takashima, Valerie B.L. Fong Asari, individually and as custodian for David Y.H. Asari under the Hawaii Uniform Gift to minors act, Winton Tong , as trustee for the 1994 Winton Tong and Gladys F. Fong revocable trust, Clifford Marshall Tong, Jonathan Warren Tong, Mark Lex Tong, Jason Roberto Tong, Kelly Tong, Del Associates, 1570 Alewa Limited Partnership and Sai Investment Company and Order - by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren - approved and so ordered; certificate of service [terminating attorney Sam K. Yee for Sai Investment Compa, attorney Sam K. Yee for 1570 Alewa Limited, attorney Sam K. Yee for Del Associates, attorney Sam K. Yee for Kelly Tong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Jason Roberto Tong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Mark Lex Tong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Jonathan Warren Tong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Clifford Marshall Tong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Winton Tong, attorney Sam K. Yee for David Y.H. Asari, attorney Sam K. Yee for Valerie B.L. Fong Asari, attorney Sam K. Yee for Susan B.L. Fong Takashima, attorney Sam K. Yee for Jonathan Y.C. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Deborah B.J. Fong Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Pearl L. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Rodney S.O. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Keith S.K. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Jeffrey S.C. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Glen S.W. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Linda L. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Brandon N.C.K. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Adrienne M.L. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Dale S.N. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Ellen Lee Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Leonard K.K. Fong, attorney Sam K. Yee for Merie Ellen Fong Gushi, attorney Sam K. Yee for Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, attorney Sam Yee for Nathan Allan Fong and substituting attorney Jeffrey Daniel Lau of the law firm Oliver, Lau, Lawhn, Ogawa & Nakamura] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP :Further status conference re settlement held; ; further conference set for 9:30 8/16/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION of counsel for defendants Rodney Leong Fong, aka Rodney L. Fong, individually and as trustee for Chelsea Tree Fong, Forest Wind Fong, and Sky Hiram L. Fong; and Patsy Nakano Fong, aka Patsy N. Fong; and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren {approving} the substitution and withdrawal of attorney Jean Filomena Malia Orque-Lee for Patsy Nakano Fong and for Rodney Leong Fong (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Sam K. Yee for Finance Enterprises and substituting attorney Jeffrey D. Lau for defendant Finance Enterprises, Ltd. - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP : Further Status conference Re Settlement. Mr. Lau to contact Ms. Hiramatsu for discussion prior to status conference hearing. Futher Status Conference Re Settlement continued to 07/15/2005 @ 9:00 a.m. BMK. Notified - Beverly Hiramatsu. ;further status conference re settlement 7/11/05 ; further status conference re settlement continued to 07/15/05 @ 9:00 a.m. BMK ( Ct Rptr : C6 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for protective order ; ORDER by Judge Barry M. Kurren - approved and so ordered - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Finance Enterprises, (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference by Judge Susan O. Mollway - The parties may not continue the settlement conference scheduled to be held at 9:00 a.m. on July 11, 2005, before the Honorable Barry M. Kurren. The parties should submit settlement conference statements to Judge Kurren in accordance with local court rules (gs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO : ;Further status conference re settlement continued from 03/04/05 to 7/11/05 @ 9 a.m. before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; notified: Beverly Hiramatsu, Sam Yee ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EP :Status conference re settlement held; ;Further status conference set for 9:00 3/4/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's FINDINGS OF FACT, conclusions of law, order - by Judge Susan Oki Mollway - granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to counts I and III of the amended complaint filed herein on February 3, 2004, filed September 20, 2004 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO : Because there is no opposition to Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s Motion For Summary Judgment set for 11/08/2004 09:00:00 AM before SOM, it is granted without a hearing pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d). Plaintiffs' counsel, Beverly Lynn K. Hiramatsu, is to prepare and submit a proposed order no later than next week Wednesday, November 10, 2004. cc: all counsel of record, and Judge Mollway's Chambers; granting motion for summary judgment as to counts I and III of the amended complaint filed herein on February 2003 [67-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of defendants Hiram Leong Fong and Ellyn Lo Fong as to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment filed 9/20/04; exhibit A; certificate of service [67-1] - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUGGESTION of death of defendant Hiram L. Fong, Sr.; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment to CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment to CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of original DECLARATION by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s of William H. Douning in support of its concise statement of facts filed September 20, 2004; exhibit A; certificate of service [68-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s; declaration of Beverly Lynne K. Hiramatsu; certificate of service [67-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004, Terminated: 11/3/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING on plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s motion for summary judgment as to counts I and III of the amended complaint filed herein on February 3, 2003 ; memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment; certificate of service - set for 9:00 11/8/04 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP : [40-1] Status Conference Re Lifting of Bankruptcy Stay and Rescheduling Conference - bankruptcy stay lifted to allow foreclosure on Ellen Fong and Hiram Fong, Jr.'s stock. Hiramatsu to file M/Summary Judgment by 9-20-04. Hearing on M/Summary Judgment 11-8-04 @ 9 a.m., SOM. Status Conference Following the M/Summary Judgment set for 12-1-04 @ 9 a.m., BMK. cc: Beverly Lynne K. Hiramatsu, Sam Yee status conference set for 9:00 12/1/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record taken 9-9:07 C6) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EP: Status conference re Lifting of Bankruptcy Stay and Rescheduling Conference continued to 8/30/04 @ 9:00 a.m., BMK; Per Sam Yee, case still in bankruptcy (Ct Rptr: no record) by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law by Judge Susan O. Mollway; Order granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment against defendants Rodney Leong Fong, also known as Rodney L. Fong and Patsy Nakano Fong, also known as Patsy N. Fong filed on October 1, 2003 - on behalf of Plaintiff (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Original Signature submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUBMISSION by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa of original supplemental declaration of William H. Douning [56-1]; exhibit 1; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Beverly Lynne K. Hiramatsu re [56-1]; exhibit 1; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to dismiss claims seeking foreclosure of Market City shares owned by defendants Rodney and/or Patsy Fong and to approve private sale of shares and ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway : dismissing (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP : Status Conference - held. Fongs still in bankruptcy. Hiramatsu may seek to have bankruptcy stay lifted. Further Status Conference and Rescheduling Conference set for 7-12-04 @ 9 a.m., BMK. Trial date and deadlines vacated. settlement/status conference held 1/8/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 7/12/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO :Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, LP's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Rodney Leong Fong, also known as Rodney L. Fong and Patsy Nakano Fong, also known as Patsy N. Fong is Granted. Ms. Beverly Hiramatsu to prepare the order. Any objections to the form of the order are to be filed by 12/12/03. [54-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO : Plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, LP's Motion for Summary Judgment against Rodney Leong Fong, also known as Rodney L. Fong and Patsy Nakano Fong, also know as Patsy N. Fong set for hearing on Monday, December 01, 2003 is hereby vacated. This Court will rule on this Motion without an Oral Hearing. Court will issue a written Order in a few weeks. [54-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submission of original DECLARATION by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s of William H. Douning in support of its concise statement of facts filed October 1, 2003; exhibit A; certificate of service [55-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s; declaration of Beverly Lynne K. Hiramatsu; certificate of service [54-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING on plaintiff N. Harwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s motion for summary judgment ; motion for summary judgment against Rodney Leong Fong, also known as Rodney L. Fong and Patsy N. Fong; memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment; certificate of service - set for 9:45 12/1/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP : Status Conference Re Lifting of Stay as to Rodney and Patsy Fong - case will proceed as to those parties not affected by the stay. Court to prepare an amended scheduling order as to Rodney and Patsy Fong. 1. Jury trial on March 2, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on January 21, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by January 14, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 1, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 3, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 1, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by February 10, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by February 17, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 3, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 3, 2003 12. Discovery deadline January 5, 2004 13. Status Conference set for January 8, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK. 14. 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by February 17, 2004 21. File Final witness list by February 10, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 3, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by February 10, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by February 17, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by February 10, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by February 17, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by February 17, 2004 settlement/status conference held 7/22/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 3/2/04 before Judge Susan O. Mollway , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 1/21/04 ; Discovery ddl set for 1/5/04 ; Motion filing ddl set for 10/3/03 ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 1/8/04 before Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO : Further Status Conference Re Bankruptcy Stay set for 7-15-03 @ 9 a.m. before BMK is vacated. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa of Order granting N. Hardwood Street Partners I, L.P.'s motion to modify stay to permit prosecution of claims against other parties; exhibit a; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO :Status Conference Re Lifting of Stay as to Rodney and Patsy Fong set for 07/22/2003 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Beverly Hiramatsu to notify parties. status conference set for 9:00 7/22/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE - service of complaint and summons executed upon defendant Janet Fong by leaving copies with Joseph Sullivan, boyfriend; date of service: 05/08/03 (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed 02-03-03; certificate of service - by defendant Finance Enterprises, defendant Marvin Allan Fong, defendant Nathan Allan Fong, defendant Sandra Y.Y. Au Fong, defendant Merie Ellen Fong Gushi, defendant Emily Mitchell, defendant Leonard K.K. Fong, defendant Lee Fong, defendant Dale S.N. Fong, defendant Adrienne M.L. Fong, defendant Brandon N.C.K. Fong, defendant Linda L. Fong, defendant Glen S.W. Fong, defendant Jeffrey S.C. defendant Keith S.K. Fong, defendant Rodney S.O. Fong, defendant Pearl L. Fong, defendant Deborah B.J. Fong Fong, defendant Jonathan Y.C. Fong, defendant Susan B.L. Fong Takashima, defendant Valerie B.L. Fong Asari, defendant David Y.H. Asari, defendant Winton Tong, defendant Clifford Marshall Tong, defendant Jonathan Warren Tong, defendant Mark Lex Tong, defendant Jason Roberto Tong, defendant Tong, defendant Del Associates, defendant 1570 Alewa Limited, defendant Sai Investment Comp [24-1] (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by defendant Hiram Leong Fong, defendant Ellyn Lo Fong to plaintiff's amended complaint filed 2/3/03 [24-1]; demand for jury trial; certificate of service (sm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by defendant Rodney Leong Fong, defendant Patsy Nakano Fong to plaintiff's amended complaint filed 2/03/03 [24-1];demand for jury trial; certicate of service (sm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP :Status Conference Re Bankruptcy Stay - case stayed. Further Status Conference set for 07/15/2003 09:00:00 AM before BMK. All other dates vacated. status conference held 4/1/03 ; status conference set for 9:00 7/15/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO : Status Conference Re Bankruptcy Stay is set for 4-1-03 @ 9 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Any party who would like to participate by phone is to notify Richlyn Young @ (808) 541-3090 prior to the hearing date. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003, Terminated: 8/30/2004 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Hiram Leong Fong, Ellyn Lo Fong of filing bankruptcy; exhibit a; certificate of service - CASE STAYED (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by defendants Hiram Leong Fong and Ellyn Lo Fong of order granting partial relief from automatic stays re bankruptcy filing against defendant Hiram L. Fong, Jr., exhibit a; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren withdrawing attorney Harrison P. Chung for Patsy Nakano Fong, attorney Harrison P. Chung for Sky Hiram Fong, attorney Harrison P. Chung for Shama Rain Fong, attorney Harrison P. Chung for Forest Wing Fong, attorney Harrison P. Chung for Chelsea Tree Fong, attorney Harrison P. Chung for Rodney Leong Fong and substituting attorney (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO :Continued : [Settlement Conference] from 03/14/2003 11:00:00 AM to 04/01/2003 10:00:00 AM before BMK. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements due 03/25/2003. cc: George Brandt, Sam Yee, Harrison Chung settlement conference set for 10:00 4/1/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : extending time to file dispositive motions , Motion filing ddl set for 4/4/03 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed on 2/14/03 on twenty-six (26) defendants Mr. Sam Yee, Esq. agreed to accept for; named defendants on Amended Complaint (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant NVC Limited Partners on 3/1/03 through Stephanie Hee, Director (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Sherman S. Hee on 2/14/03 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Mary Lou Woo on 2/14/03 through Paul Alston, attorney (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Stephanie Y. Hee on 3/1/03 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Hiram L. Fong Jr. on 2/27/03 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO :Continued : [Settlement Conference] from 02/20/2003 10:00:00 AM to 03/14/2003 11:00:00 AM before BMK. Harrison Chung to notify parties. settlement conference set for 11:00 3/14/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO :Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/25/2003 08:30:00 AM before HG is taken off calendar. This case is now assigned to Judge Mollway. cc: all parties of record, Judge Mollway's Chambers. Pretrial conference ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by defendant Hiram L. Fong Jr. of bankruptcy filing; declaration of Harrison P. Chung and exhibits a-d; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Samuel P. King - case reassigned to Judge Susan Oki Mollway (cc: all counsel; SOM, SPK, BMK, respective CRM's) (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Helen Gillmor - case reassigned to Judge Samuel P. King (cc: all counsel, SPK, BMK, HG, respective CRM's) (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1]; exhibits a through 40; summons issued; certificate of service - by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for leave to file amended complaint and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : re [21-1]; exhibit a (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Text not available.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO :Settlement Conference set for 01/24/2003 continued to 02/20/2003 10:00 AM before Judge Kurren. Atty. Beverly Hiramatsu to notify all Counsel of this Continued Date. settlement conference set for 10:00 2/20/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for extention of time to join parites or amended complaint and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : re [1-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare order. 1. Jury trial on August 5, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before HG 2. Final Pretrial Conference on July 1, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge Helen Gillmor on July 25, 2003 at 8:30 a.m. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by June 24, 2003 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by January 3, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by May 7, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by March 5, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by July 15, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by July 22, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by February 3, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 5, 2003 12. Discovery deadline June 6, 2003 13. Settlement Conference set for January 24, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by January 17, 2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by July 22, 2003 21. File Final witness list by July 15, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by July 8, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by July 15, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by July 22, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by July 15, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by July 22, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by July 22, 2003 30. cc: Alycia/Kim ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 8/5/03 ; Pretrial conference set for 8:30 7/25/03 before Judge Helen Gillmor , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 7/1/03 settlements conference set for 9:00 1/24/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; file dispositive motions by 3/5/03 ; Discovery ddl by 6/6/03 ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of dismissal of counterclaim filed by defendants Hiram L. Fong, Rodney Leong Fong, Patsy Nakano Fong, Ellyn Lo Fong, individually and as Trustee of the Ellyn Lo Fong Revocable Trust dated 3/24/93; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of defendants Hiram L. Fong, Rodney Leong Fong, Patsy Nakano Fong, Ellyn Lo Fong, Individually and as Trustee of the Ellyn Lo Fong Revocable Trust dated 3/24/93; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by defendant Finance Enterprises,; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Finance Enterprises,; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIM by defendants Hiram L. Fong, Rodney Leong Fong, Patsy Nakano Fong, and Ellyn Lo Fong against plaintiff N. Harwood Street Pa; jury demand, certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by defendant Finance Enterprises, to complaint filed 6/24/02 [1-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Ellyn Lo Fong on 6/24/02 through Hiram L. Fong (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Hiram L. Fong on 6/24/02 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Finance Enterprises, on 6/24/02 thru Hiram L. Fong (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Rodney Leong Fong on 6/25/02 through his wife Patsy Fong (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Patsy Nakano Fong on 6/25/02 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 09/23/2002 09:00:00 AM to 09/16/2002 09:00:00 AM, BMK. Sam Yee to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 9/23/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT; exhibits 1 through 27; (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 209599 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 550 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?