Methods For Diagnosis And Therapy Of Autoimmune Disease, Such As Insulin Dependent Diabetes Mellitus, Involving Retroviral Superantigens
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09490700
Examiner Misook Yu, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Conrad, Bernard, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin N. Ainsworth +1 212 692 6745 +1 212 983 3115 kainsworth@mintz.com
Space Ingrid Beattie +1 617 348 1838
Space William D. Belanger +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 wdbelanger@mintz.com
Space CHARLES E. BELL +1 203 321 2200
Space NAOMI S. BISWAS +1 617 348 4401
Space BRADFORD C. BLAISE +1 703 770 7900
Space SEAN M. COUGHLIN +1 202 585 3577
Space David Franklin Crosby +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 dcrosby@mintz.com
Space Christopher J Cuneo +1 208 562 4900 +1 208 562 4901 ccuneo@parsonsbehle.com
Space Brian Dauphin +1 617 749 9800
Space Brett N. Dorny +1 508 709 0501 +1 508 519 9185 bndorny@dornylaw.com
Space MARIANNE MCLAUGHLIN DOWNING +1 781 401 9988
Space Ivor R. Elrifi +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 ielrifi@mintz.com
Space HEIDI A. ERLACHER +1 617 348 4909
Space James Gatto +1 703 770 7754
Space Richard Gervase +1 212 692 6755
Space Matthew Golden +1 973 503 3427
Space John Andrew Harre +1 617 542 6000
Space Brian Patrick Hopkins +1 212 692 6800 brianphopkins@yahoo.com
Space Shane Hunter +1 858 480 5530
Space David Johnson +1 617 500 2508 david.johnson@pillsburylaw.com
Space Kristin Konzak +1 617 871 3216
Space Cynthia Kozakiewicz +1 617 542 6000
Space Barry Marenberg +1 908 458 1361
Space Anthony Jason Mirabito +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 ajmirabito@mintz.com
Space Carol Peters +1 617 348 4914
Space David Poirier +1 617 456 8262
Space Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
Space BRIAN S. ROSENBLOOM +1 202 783 6040
Space ROBERT J. SAYRE. +1 617 401 2460
Space Charles Schulman 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Gregory Sieczkiewicz +1 617 218 1605
Space CHRISTINA K. STOCK +1 617 348 1817
Space THOMAS SULLIVAN, +1 617 395 7000
Space Janine Susan +1 617 345 3275
Space Howard J. Susser +1 617 542 6000
Space +1 781 541 7181
Space Raphael Valencia +1 703 535 3962
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Conrad, Bernard, Geneve (CH)
Filing Date January 24, 2000
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 61130/JPW/KRD
Confirmation Number 7519
Group Art Unit 1642
Class / Sub-Class 435 / 320
  Entries (159) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Sequence Moved to Public Database
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
    Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
      Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
        Issue Notification Mailed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
          Receipt into Pubs
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
            Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
              Dispatch to FDC
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                Issue Fee Payment Received
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
                  Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Issue Fee Payment Verified
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Receipt into Pubs
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Sequence Forwarded to Pubs on Tape
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Mail Notice of Allowance
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                              Claims (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                  Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                    Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                      Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                        Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                              Examiner's search strategy and results (39 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Response after Non-Final Action
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                    Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                      Drawings-only black and white line drawings (25 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                        Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                          Claims (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                            Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Workflow - Drawings Finished
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                New or Additional Drawing Filed
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                    Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                        Non-Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                          Non-Final Rejection
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                              Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                  Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                    Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                      Claims (2 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                        Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                            Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                              Final Rejection (5 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                    Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                      Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                        Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                          Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTRS
                                                                                                              Requirement for Restriction/Election (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/16/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                    Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                      Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                        Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                            Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                              Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                  Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
                                                                                                                                    List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - NFDR
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Formal Drawings Required (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                                                                                        Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                                                                                          Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                                                                                            Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                                                                                                              List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                Non-Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                    Examiner's search strategy and results (168 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                      Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                        CRF Is Good Technically / Entered into Database
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                          Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None 1 - SEQLIST
                                                                                                                                                            Sequence Listing (15 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CRFL
                                                                                                                                                              CRF Sequence Listing Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                                  Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                      Response to a Letter to Comply with the Sequence Rules
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                        CRF Diskette Unreadable / Did Not Comply / Required but Not Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                                                                                                                                                                          Miscellaneous Action with SSP (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Letter Requiring CRF (Unreadable, Non-Compliant, Not Submitted)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CRFL
                                                                                                                                                                              CRF Sequence Listing Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CRFL
                                                                                                                                                                                CRF Sequence Listing Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                    Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                                                                                                                                                                                      Miscellaneous Action with SSP (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                        Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                                                                                                          Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                                                                                                              Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Election / Restriction Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Restriction Requirement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CTRS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Requirement for Restriction/Election (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Restriction/Election Requirement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application Is Now Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oath or Declaration filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Non Patent Literature (34 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Reference (54 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Reference (58 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Reference (46 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Reference (158 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Reference (88 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - FRPR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (116 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - FRPR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (111 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Preexamination Location Change
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CRF Disk Has Been Received by Preexam / Group / PCT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None 1 - SEQLIST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sequence Listing (27 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None 1 - SEQLIST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sequence Listing (19 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CRFL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CRF Sequence Listing Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Claims (13 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Specification (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claims (15 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Specification (88 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Drawings-only black and white line drawings (34 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Pacr - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (211 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Preliminary Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?