Trom, et al v. Mountain Riders Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00600-SOM-LEK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Catherine J. Trom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frame & Nakano

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert G. Frame +1 808 545 3043 +1 808 545 3065 rframe@framenakano.com
Space Michael J. Nakano +5453 545 545 3065 info@framenakano.com
No Logo Timothy R. Trom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frame & Nakano

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert G. Frame +1 808 545 3043 +1 808 545 3065 rframe@framenakano.com
Space Michael J. Nakano +5453 545 545 3065 info@framenakano.com
v.
No Logo Corrine Parker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo David Watson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Ichiyama +5368 536 536 8091

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Don Parker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo Linda Parker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo Mountain Riders, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter K. Siu +2750 275 275 0371

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gale L.F. Ching +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222
Space Mitzi A. Lee +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222 mitzilee@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Moutain Riders, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter K. Siu +2750 275 275 0371

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gale L.F. Ching +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222
Space Mitzi A. Lee +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222 mitzilee@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Corrine Parker, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo David Watson, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Don Parker, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo Linda Parker, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo Mountain Riders, LLC, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter K. Siu +2750 275 275 0371

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gale L.F. Ching +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222
Space Mitzi A. Lee +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222 mitzilee@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Moutain Riders, Inc., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter K. Siu +2750 275 275 0371

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gale L.F. Ching +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222
Space Mitzi A. Lee +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222 mitzilee@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Corrine Parker, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo David Watson, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Ichiyama +5368 536 536 8091

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Don Parker, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo Linda Parker, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P.H. Sumida ksumida@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo Mountain Riders, LLC, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter K. Siu +2750 275 275 0371

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gale L.F. Ching +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222
Space Mitzi A. Lee +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222 mitzilee@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Moutain Riders, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter K. Siu +2750 275 275 0371

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gale L.F. Ching +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222
Space Mitzi A. Lee +2750 275 275 0200 +2750 275 275 0222 mitzilee@hawaii.rr.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 9/18/2002
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 6/13/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (180) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 177 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/gb re [176-1] that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees pursuant to the "Order of Dismissal" filed June 12, 2003. terminating case (cc: all counsel) (gab)
    LREF
    Blank 176 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER of Dismissal by Judge Susan O. Mollway (cc: all counsel) (gab)
      LREF
      Blank 175 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP : Further Settlement Conference held. Settlement reached. Settlement on the Record held [at the Office of Kevin P.H. Sumida]: Present were Gale Ching, Mark Ichiyama, Kevin Sumida, Robert Frame, and his clients, Mr. and Mrs. Trom. Terms of the settlement were stated. Mr. Ichiyama stated that he has been unable to contract his insurance adjuster who is the person with authority but will recommend the settlement amount and places the settlement on the record contingent upon receiving authority from the adjuster. The Court instructed Mr. Ichiyama to confirm his settlement authority to all parties and the Court, in writing, by no later than Tuesday, June 10, 2003 at 4:00 p.m. Mr. Ching will draft the settlement agreement and circulate to defense counsel by no later than June 13, 2003, and thereafter to Mr. Frame. Payment of the settlement consideration will be made to the plaintiffs and Mr. Frame by no later than July 15, 2003. Once confirmation is received from Mr. Ichiyama as to his settlement authority, this Court will recommend to District Judge Susan Oki Mollway that the matter should be dismissed with prejudice. Office of Kevin P.H. Sumida [Reporter: Adrienne Kurasaki] ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
        LREF
        Blank 174 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Description not available
        DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker; certificate of service (gab)
          LREF
          Blank 173 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway denying motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Mountain Riders, Inc., on April 2, 2003; denying motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant David Watson on April 17, 2003; denying motion for summary judgment by Defendants Corinn Parker and her parents, Don Parker and Linda Parker filed on April 15, 2003 (cc: all counsel) (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 172 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP : Defendant Mountain Riders, Inc., etc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant David Watson's Motion for Summary Judgment - Arguments. Defendant Mountain Riders, Inc., etc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment - Denied. Defendant David Watson's Motion for Summary Judgment - Denied. Mr. Tani stated that Defendants Corinn Parker et al.'s Motion for Summary Judgment set for hearing on 7/7/03 @ 9:00 a.m. is essentially the same motion as these motions for summary judgment scheduled for today. Mr. Tani requests that Parkers' Motion for Summary Judgment be advanced to today, and that the hearing set for 7/7/03 be vacated - Granted. Defendants Corinn Parker et al.'s Motion for Summary Judgment - Denied. Court to prepare an order. ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
              LREF
              Blank 171 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Miscellaneous Document
              Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC in support of its motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' claims [170-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 170 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' claims memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Gale L.F. Ching; exhibits A-E; certificate of service set for 9:45 7/21/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                  LREF
                  Blank 169 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Description not available
                  DECLARATION of Gale LF. Ching Re: Defendants Mountain Riders Inc, dba Maui Mountain Riders, and defendant Mountain Riders, LLC's reply memorandu in response to Plaintiff Timonthy Trom and Catherine J. Trom's memorandum in opposition to defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders, LLC's motion for summary judgment, filed on 5/15/2003 (filed 5/22/03)re [163-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                    LREF
                    Blank 168 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                      LREF
                      Blank 167 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                        LREF
                        Blank 166 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 165 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 164 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                            CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC in support of its motion for summary judgment as to all crossclaims asserted by defendants Corinn Parker, a minor and her parents Don and Linda Parker, and David Watson [163-1]; certicate of service (sm)
                              LREF
                              Blank 163 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC for summary judgment as to all crossclaims asserted by defendants Corinn Parker, a minor and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker, and David Watson ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Gale L. F.Ching; exhibits a-e; certificate of service - set for 10:30 7/14/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (sm)
                                LREF
                                Blank 162 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Reply
                                defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC's reply memorandum in response to plaintiff Timothy Trom and Catherine J. Trom's memorandum in opposition to defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders, LLC's motion for summary judgment filed on 5/15/03 [117-1]; declaration of Gale L.F. Ching; exhibit D; certificate of service (gab)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 161 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Description not available
                                  DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC; certificate of service (gab)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 160 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 ERRATA
                                    Submission of original signature page to affidavit of Catherine J. Trom and Timothy R. Trom re: 1) Memorandum in opposition to Defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC's motion for summary judgment and 2) Memorandum in oppostition to Defendant David Watson's motion for summary judgment, filed May 15, 2003; attachments; certificate of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom to [154-1], to [153-1] (gab)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 159 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Description not available
                                      DISCLOSURE of expert witness by defendant David Watson; certificate of service (gab)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 158 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                        defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC memorandum of law in response to defendants Corinn Parker, a minor, and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker's motion for summary judgment [137-1] led 4/15/03; certificate of service (gab)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 157 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                          defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC memorandum of law in response to defendant David Watson's motion for summary judgment, filed 4/17/03 [139-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 156 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                            Separate and Concise STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom in support of thier memorandum in opposition to Defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC's motion for summary judgment [117-1]; exhibits A-D; affidavit of Michael J. Nakano; certificate of service (gab)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 155 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                              Separate and Concise STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom in support of their memorandum in opposition to Defendant David Watson's motion for summary judgment [139-1]; exhibits A-F; affidavit of Michael J. Nakano; Affidavit of Catherine J. Trom; affidavit of Timothy R. Trom; certificate of service (gab)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 154 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom in opposition to Defendant David Watson's motion for summary judgment filed 4/17/2003 [139-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom in opposition to defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC's motion for summary judgment [117-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              EP : settlement conference held with counsel only before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                defendant David Watson's statement of position with response to defendant Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC'd motion for summary judgment [117-1] (gab)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                  Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant David Watson in support of his motion for summary judgment [139-1] filed 04/17/2003; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 6/2/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant David Watson for summary judgment memorandum in support of motion; declaration of John R. Williams; exhibits A-D; certificate of service; set for 10:30 6/2/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker in support of its motion for summary judgment [137-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker for summary judgment memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Milton S. Tani; exhibits A and B; certificate of service; set for 9:00 7/7/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                    OFFER of judgment filed by defendant David Watson to Plaintiffs Timothy R. Trom and Catherine J. Trom; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                            OFFER of judgment to Plaintiffs Timothy R. Trom and Catherine J. Trom filed by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker; certificte of service (gab)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Answer
                                                                                                  Amended ANSWER by defendant David Watson to [1-1] complaint filed on 9/18/2002; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Amend Defendant David Watson's Answer to Complaint filed 9/18/2002 and ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi; exhibit A (gab)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Amend Answer to Complaint filed 09/18/2002 and ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi; exhibit A (gab)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Supplement
                                                                                                          Notice of Submission by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker to Amended Answer to complaint filed 09/18/2002 filed 3/28/2003; exhibit A; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                              Defendant Mountain Riders Inc, dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC's offer of Judgment to Plaintiffs Timothy R. Trom and Catherine J. Trom; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                        Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC in support of its motion for summary judgment [117-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC for summary judgment memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Gale L.F. Ching; exhibits A-C; certificate of service; set for 10:30 6/2/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER (not signed) [8-1] by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker to complaint filed 09/18/2002; cross claim against Mountain Riders and David Watson; demand for jury trial; and certificate of service (gab) Modified on 03/31/2003
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi to Amend Answer to Complaint filed 09/18/2002 (gab)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by cross-defendant David Watson to [1-1] Defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC's crossclaim filed 02/26/03; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by cross-defendant Corrine Parker, cross-defendant Don Parker, cross-defendant Linda Parker to Defendants Mountain Riders, Inc., dba Maui Mountain Riders nd Mountain Riders LLC's crossclaim against defendants Corinne Parker, a minor, and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker and David Watson filed 2/26/2003; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                              First Amended ANSWER by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC to complaint filed 9/18/2002; Defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC's Crossclaim against Defendants Corrine Parker, a minor, and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker and David Watons; summons; demand for jury trial; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Catherine J. Trom, defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO : Further settlement conference (Clients and Counsel to be present) continued from 5/28/03 2:00 p.m. to 2:00 6/6/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO : Further settlement conference continued from 5/19/03 2:00 p.m. to 2:00 5/28/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. 1. Jury trial on October 28, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on September 16, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by September 9, 2003 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by March 28, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by July 30, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by May 28, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by October 7, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by October 14, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 28, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by May 28, 2003 12. Discovery deadline August 29, 2003 13. Settlement Conference (with Attorneys only) set for April 24, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by April 17, 2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by October 14, 2003 21. File Final witness list by October 7, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by September 30, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by October 7, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by October 14, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by October 7, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by October 14, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by October 14, 2003 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: Further Settlement Conference (with clients and Attorneys physically present) set for 2:00 5/19/03, LEK. Updated Settlement Conference Statements are due 5/12/03. A copy of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties. ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 10/28/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway , ; Pretrial conference set for 9:00 9/16/03 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 4/24/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi , ; Discovery ddl set for 8/29/03 ; Motion filing ddl set for 5/28/03 ( Rptr : C-335 no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL DISCLOSURE by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL DISCLOSURE by defendant David Watson; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiffs (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiffs (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service - by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; exhibit a; certificate of service - by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant David Watson's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Mountain Riders Inc (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff Timothy R. Trom, plaintiff Catherine J. Trom; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by cross-defendant David Watson to [1-1] Defendants Corinne Parker, a Minor, and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker's cross claim filed on 10/10/02; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by cross-defendant David Watson to [1-1] Defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders and Mountain Riders, LLC's Cross Claim filed on 10/17/02; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by cross-defendant Corrine Parker, cross-defendant Don Parker, cross-defendant Linda Parker to defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders; Mountain Riders, LLC's crossclaim against defendants Corinne Parker, a minor, and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker and David Watson filed 10/17/02; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by cross-defendant Corrine Parker, cross-defendant Don Parker, cross-defendant Linda Parker to defendant David Watson's cross claim against defendants Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders; Mountain Riders, LLC; Corinne Parker, a minor, and her parents Don Parker aned Linda Parker filed 10/15/02; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by cross-defendant Mountain Riders Inc, cross-defendant Mountain Riders, LLC to defendant DAvid Watson's crossclaim; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by cross-defendant Mountain Riders Inc to defendants Corinne Parker, a minor, and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker's crossclaim against defendant Mountain Riders, Inc. dba Maui Mountain Riders; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS issued as to cross-defendant Corrine Parker, cross-defendant Don Parker, cross-defendant Linda Parker, cross-defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSSCLAIM by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC against defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker, defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC to [1-1] complaint filed 9/18/02; crossclaim against defendants Corinne Parker, A minor, and her parents Don Parker and Linda Parker and David Watson; summons not issued; demand for jury trial; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by defendant David Watson to [1-1] complaint filed on 9/18/02; jury demand; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSSCLAIM by defendant David Watson against defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant Mountain Riders, LLC, defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSSCLAIM by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker against defendant Mountain Riders Inc, defendant David Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker to [1-1] complaint filed 9/18/02; cross claim against mountain riders, Inc., dba Maui Mountain Riders and David Watson; demand for jury trial and certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Linda Parker on 9/25/02 (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed on 9/25/02 - 2593 S. Elizabeth St., Salt Lake City (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Linda Parker on 9/25/02 (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed on 9/25/02 left with Barbara Watson (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Mountain Riders Inc on 9/23/02 - served Brain Kramers, general manager (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/16/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 211276 (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 1/21/2002, Entered: 1/21/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Corrine Parker, defendant Don Parker, defendant Linda Parker (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 155 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?