Maui Divers HI, Ltd. v. PNJ Enterprises Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00601-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maui Divers of Hawaii, Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by lawcsilc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vernon F.L. Char +5225 522 522 5133
Space David M. Lum +5225 522 522 5133 ksagena@lawcsilc.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 9/18/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Cause Section 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Honolulu
Terminated 4/10/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER of permanent injunction against defendants Arpas International, Ltd. and Oro Pasha Creations, LLC by Judge David A. Ezra : for permanent injunction , dismissing party Oro Pasha Creations and Arpas International with prejudice each party to bear its or her own costs and attorneys' fees (fe)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff's counsel has reviewed and approved the form of Permanent Injunction. Filing of Dismissal set for 4/28/03 at 9:00 am before Judge Chang. rule 16 conference held on 9:00 3/28/03 ; status conference set for 9:00 4/28/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : none) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 03/07/2003 09:00:00 AM to 03/28/2003 09:00:00 AM before KSC. Negotiating settlement. (Ct Rptr: None) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 02/13/2003 continued to 03/07/2003 09:00 AM before Judge Chang. David Lum was notified of this continued date. () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Notice of Dismissal
          NOTICE OF DISMISSAL as to defendants P&J Gem Trading Enterprise, Inc. and Unity Trading Inc. - filed by plaintiff (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ] from 12/16/2002 09:00:00 AM to 02/13/2003 09:00:00 AM before KSC. Per David Lum, negotiating settlement. (Ct Rptr: In Chambers - No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
              STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra of permanent injunction against defendants PNJ Enterprises, Inc. and Ngan Soong Leung ; exhibit A - submitted by defts - [PNJ Enterprises, Inc. and Ngan Soong Leung, their agents, et al./etc. are enjoined from the date hereof through the expiration of Maui Divers of Hawaii, Ltd.'s Copyright Registration No. VA-825-059 dated September 24, 1996, from manufacturing or distributing any product, including but not limited to jewelry, bearing a design that is substantially similar to Maui Divers of Hawaii, Ltd.'s "Aloha Heart" design; Maui Divers of Hawaii, Ltd. acknowledges that it does not have the exclusive right to make and sell jewelry in the shape of a heart or with the word "aloha" contained thereon; all remaining claims by and between Maui Divers of Hawaii, Ltd. and PNJ Enterprises, Inc. and Ngan Soong Leung are DISMISSED with prejudice; each party to bear its or her own costs and attorneys' fees; this stip disposes of all claims by and between Maui Divers of Hawaii, Ltd. and PNJ Enterprises, Inc. and Ngan Soong Leung] terminating party PNJ Enterprises Inc., party Ngan Soong Leung (cc: copyright office w/report) (afc) Modified on 12/10/2002
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Amended Complaint
                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Maui Divers HI, Ltd.; exhibits A-D; summons (summons issued) adding defendants: Arpas International, Ltd.; Oro Pasha Creations, LLC (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION to allow plaintiff's to file first amended complaint by Mag Judge Kevin S.C. Chang - submitted by plaintiff (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                        WITHDRAWAL OF ANSWER filed in error; certificate of service - by defendant Unity Trading Inc. [14-1] (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Answer
                          ANSWER by defendant Unity Trading Inc. to complaint [1-1] {NOTE: Withdrawal of this answer was filed on October 24, 2002; refer to next docket entry} (afc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002, Terminated: 10/24/2002 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff for leave to file first amended complaint ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibit a; certificate of service - set for 9:30 11/13/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Answer
                              ANSWER by defendant PNJ Enterprises Inc., defendant Ngan Soong Leung to complaint [1-1] (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                STIPULATION submitted by plaintiff - to continue the hearin gon plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and to extend the effective date of order granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order filed 09-19-02 - by Judge David A. Ezra - M/PI set for 10-02-02 4pm is continued to 12-02-02 at 10:30; FURTHER stipulated that the order filed 09-19-02 shall remain in effect until hearing scheduled for 12-02-02] (afc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Transcript
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - 09/19/02 - ORIG - (Cynthia Tando Fazio) - pp 18 (afc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EP: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order-GRANTED. Court to issue order. Further hearing regarding Temporary Restraining Order set for 10/2/2002 @4:00pm DAE [3-1] (Ct Rptr: Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (afc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order [3-1] by Judge David A. Ezra [excerpts from conclusion include: TRO granted for period 09-19-02 until hearing scheduled for 10-02-02; court orders that defts restrained and enjoined from engaging in acts (which are detailed in the order)] (cc: David M.K. Lum, Esq.; Alan Maor (Unity Trading Inc.); PNJ Enterprises, Inc.; P & J Gem Trading Enterprise, Inc.; Ngan Soong Leung) (afc)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant P&J Gem Trading Enterprise, Inc. thru service on its corp. officer, Pui Yung Chan on 9/18/02 (afc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant Ngan Soong Leung thru service on the agent, Pui Yung Chan on 9/18/02 (afc) Modified on 09/19/2002
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant PNJ Enterprises Inc. thru service upon its Corp. Officer Pui Yung Chan on 9/18/02 (afc) Modified on 09/19/2002
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant Unity Trading Inc. by service upon its Corp. Officer, Alan Maor, on 9/18/02 (afc) Modified on 09/19/2002
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                EO: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining ORder. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - SET for 9/19/2002 @ 9:45 a.m. DAE. [3-1] () JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (afc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002, Terminated: 9/19/2002 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff for temporary restraining order ; memorandum in support of motion; exhibits 1-11; declaration of Carl P. Marsh; declaration of Amy H.I. Han; Order - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (afc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/16/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT; exhibits a-d; summons (Summons issued) (afc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Filing Fee Received
                                                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 211292 (afc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Remark
                                                          REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights (afc)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?