United States of Ame v. Valerio
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00625-ACK-KSC
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia M. Corrales-Talleda +1 213 894 8627 +1 213 894 2648 Patricia.Corrales@dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Francisca Valerio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon T. Yang +6289 628 628 9529

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward Tuddenham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maile M. Hirota +5280 528 528 0100 maile@loio.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 9/30/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Revocation of Naturalization - Title 8 USC 1451(a)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Honolulu
Terminated 8/5/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
CONSENT JUDGMENT Revoking Naturalization and Order by Judge Alan C. Kay terminating case (gs)
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION withdrawal without prejudice of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [10-1]; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - withdrawing motion for summary judgment [10-1] - on behalf of USA (lmg) Modified on 04/07/2004
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION to continue April 1, 2004 deadline for compliance with the order of February 23, 2004 and ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay : re [25-1] ddl for the US to respond is extended to 4/1/04 (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
        STIPULATION to continue to March 17, 2004 deadline for compliance with the order of February 23, 2004; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - the deadline for the United States to respond to the court's order from the bench of 02/23/04 is extended to 03/17/04 - on behalf of USA (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Transcript
          ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Debra Chun) taken on 2/23/04 (gs)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP: Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment: Deft Francisca Valerio present; Arguments made; Plaintiff to file within 7 days an explanation as to whether or not they followed the 1909 policy re [10-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) by Judge Alan C. Kay (gs)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Defendant's supplemental MEMORANDUM in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; Exhibits A & B; Certificate of Service [10-1] (gs)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/17/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                Plaintiff's Supplemental MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in support of its motion for summary judgment; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service [10-1] (gs)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Francisca Valerio on 12/22/03 thru Gordon T Yang, Esq. (eps)
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Answer
                    Defendant's ANSWER to the First Amended Complaint to Revoke Naturalization filed on October 24, 2002 and Served on December 22, 2003; Certificate of Service by defendant Francisca Valerio to [4-1] (sealed)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Transcript
                      Transcript of Proceedings 12/15/03 - Orig ;# of pages 18 ; Cynthia Fazio; (gs)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EP: Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment: Plaintiff Francisca Valerio present. Arguments made. Mr. Helper to serve Ms. Valerio through Mr. Yang. When service is completed, Mr. Helper to inform Judge Kay's Courtroom Manager who in turn will give a new hearing date for Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment re [10-1] (Ct Rptr: Cynthia Fazio) by Judge Alan C. Kay (gs)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          Reply in Support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Exhibits 1-8; Certificate of Service [10-1] by Plaintiff USA (gs)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Defendant's MEMORANDUM in opposition to motion for summary judgment; Certificate of Compliance; Certificate of Service [10-1] (gs)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                              Defendant's Concise STATEMENT; Exhibit A; Certificate of Compliance; Certificate of Service by defendant Francisca Valerio [10-1] (gs)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Answer
                                Defendant's ANSWER to the First Amended Complaint to Revoke Naturalization; Certificate of Service by defendant Francisca Valerio to [4-1] (gs)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Granting Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Alan C. Kay setting hearing on motion for summary judgment [10-1] 10:30 12/15/03 granting order proposed [13-1] (gs)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                    Ex Parte Motion to Continue hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Order; Exhibit A; Notice of Hearing on Motion; Certificate of Service PROPOSED Order re [10-1] (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                      Notice of Appearance of Counsel; Certificate of Service for defendant Francisca Valerio by Gordon T. Yang, Maile M. Hirota (gs)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                        Plaintiff's Separate and Concise STATEMENT in Support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; Exhibits 1 - 21; Certificate of Compliance; Certificate of Service [10-1] (gs)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003, Terminated: 9/12/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion for summary judgment ; Table of contents; Table of Authorities; Memorandum in support of Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment; Certificate of Service set for 9:30 9/22/03 before Judge Alan C. Kay (gs)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/5/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            EO: Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment set for hearing on February 23, 2004 @ 9:30 a.m. before Judge Kay [10-1] Judge Alan C. Kay (gs)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference-Thomas Helper-AUSA was present for the Plaintiff. This Conference was not held. The Plaintiff U.S.A. will file a Motion for Summary Judgment by February 28, 2003 that will be set for a hearing before Judge Kay. No Date will be reset as to the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. cc: Thomas Helper, Rustam Barbee and Dottie Miwa-Courtroom Manager for Judge Kay Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of plaintiff United States of America; certificate of service (gs)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                  Plaintiff's Status Report and [PROPOSED] Order Setting Briefing; Exhibits A and B; Certificate of Service (gs)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon Wally Valerio defendant Francisca Valerio's adult son on 10/29/02 (gs)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Francisca Valerio on 10/29/02 (gs)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/27/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT to Revoke Naturalization; Exhibit A; Summons [1-1] by plaintiff United States of Ame (gs)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant Francisca Valerio via service through attorney of record, Carmen Diamore-Siah, by her duly authorized representative, Angla Nakamura, on 10/1/02 (afc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/30/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT to Revoke Naturalization; (Summons(es) issued) (gs)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?