Collins v. White, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00787-HG-KSC
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rudy Collins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by attyandrewooten.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre S. Wooten +5454 545 545 4165 Andre@AttyAndreWooten.com
v.
No Logo David A. Brailo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-12, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Wussenberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas E. White, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 12/6/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 4/30/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court GRANTS defendants' motion for summary judgment on Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment Bivens claims and state common law tort claims, and defendant's motion to dismiss all of plaintiff's other claims, pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendants Thomas E. White, David Brailo and Nancy Rauschenburg's Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment" filed on October 15, 2003. by Judge Helen Gillmor re [24-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003, Terminated: 4/30/2004 Order
    ORDER granting defendants Thomas E. White, David Brailo and Nancy Rauschenburg's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment [16-1] (bbb)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
      EP: DEFENDANTS THOMAS E. WHITE, DAVID A. BRAILO AND NANCY RAUSCHENBURG'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Arguments made. The motion is granted. Mr. Helper shall prepare the order by October 3, 2003 and submit it through Mr. Wooten. [16-1], [16-1] ( Ct Rptr : Stephen Platt) JUDGE Helen Gillmor (bbb)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
        reply MEMORANDUM in support of defendants Thomas E. White, David A. Brailo, Nancy Wussenberg's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment [16-1], and for summary judgment [16-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO: At defendant's request, the Settlement Conference currently set for 9/16/2003 at 2:00 PM has been continued to 10/17/2003 at 11:00 AM before Judge Chang. Tom Helper to notify all parties.; settlement/status conference set for 11:00 10/17/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Statement in Opposition to Motion
            Concise STATEMENT by plaintiff Rudy Collins in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment [16-1]; declaration of Rudy Collins; certificate of service (fe)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Rudy Collins in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment [16-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Judge Helen Gillmor by plaintiff Rudy Collins continuance of hearing and to file memorandum & concise statement in opposition to defendant Army's motion for summary judgment ; declaration of counsel; exhibits a & b; Order {GRANTING}; certificate of service - setting hearing on motion to dismiss and for summary judgment [16-1] 10:30 9/22/03 before Helen Gillmor (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                  defendants Thomas E. White, David A. Brailo, Nancy Rauschenburg's SEPARATE AND CONCISE STATEMENT of facts in support of their motion for summary judgment [16-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003, Terminated: 9/22/2003 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF MOTION; defendants Thomas E. White, David A. Brailo, Nancy Rauschenburg's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment ; table of contents; table of authorities; memorandum in support of defendants Thomas E. White, David Brailo, and Nancy Rauschenburg's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment; declaration of David A. Brailo; exhibits a-d; certificate of service; motion set for 9:45 8/11/03 before Judge Helen Gillmor (bbb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003, Terminated: 9/22/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF MOTION; defendants Thomas E. White, David A. Brailo, Nancy Rauschenburg motion to dismiss and for summary judgment ; table of contents; table of authorities; memorandum in support of defendants Thomas E. White, David Brailo and Nancy Rauschenburg's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment; declaration of David A. Brailo; exhibits a-d; certificate of service; motion set for 9:45 8/11/03 before Judge Helen Gillmor (bbb)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference 1. Jury trial on January 27, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before HG 2. Final Pretrial Conference on December 16, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge Helen Gillmor on January 16, 2004 at 8:30a.m. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by December 9, 2003 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by June 27, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by October 29, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by August 27, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by January 6, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by January 13, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by July 28, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by August 27, 2003 12. Discovery deadline November 28, 2003 13. Settlement Conference set for September 16, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by September 9, 2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by January 13, 2004 21. File Final witness list by January 6, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by December 30, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by January 6, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by January 13, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by January 6, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by January 13, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by January 13, 2004 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A rule 16 conference held on 9:00 3/3/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , Jury Trial set for 9:00 1/27/04 ; Pretrial conference set for 8:30 1/16/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , final pretrial conference set for 9:00 12/16/03 ; Discovery ddl set for 11/28/03 ; Motion filing ddl set for 8/27/03 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 9/16/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Rudy Collins; certificate of service (fe)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by United States of America defendants; certificate of service (fe)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Answer
                                ANSWER by defendants Thomas E. White, David A. Brailo, (incorrectly named David A. Braillo in the complaint), and Nancy Rauschenburg Copada (incorrectly named Nancy Wussenberg in the complaint) to [1-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Rudy Collins to AFFES Furniture Store, GUam (bbb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Rudy Collins to David Anthony Brailo (bbb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Rudy Collins to Nancy Wussenburg (bbb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Nancy Wussenberg on 12/27/02 served through U.S. Attorney's Office, Honolulu, HI through Stephen Lehto, Receptionist (fe)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant David A. Brailo on 12/27/02 served through U.S. Attorney's Office, Honolulu, Hi through Stephen Lehto, Receptionist (fe)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Thomas E. White on 12/27/02 served through U.S. Attorney's Office, Honolulu, HI through Stephen Lehto, Receptionist (fe)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [3-1] (cc: all counsel, Financial ) (fe)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002, Terminated: 12/11/2002 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa PauperisCourt Filing
                                                APPLICATION by plaintiff Rudy Collins to proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (fe)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/3/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT for damages for personal injuries and violation of constitutional civil rights; demand for jury trial; (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?