EEOC v. Enterprise Rent-A-Ca, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00804-ACK-LEK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 1:51 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Equal Employment Opportunity Commission"

Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

v.
No Logo Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Hawaii, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheri-Ann S.L. Lau Clark +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 ssl@torkildson.com
No Logo Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheri-Ann S.L. Lau Clark +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 ssl@torkildson.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 12/17/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 2/4/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
CONSENT DECREE by Judge Alan C. Kay - 1) court retains jurisdiction only for the purposes of enforcing compliance with this decree & resolving any disputes that arise from it; 2) unless extended by this court, this consent decree will automatically expire 12 months after its entry - on behalf of EEOC (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION to dismiss with prejudice as to defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Inc and ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay : (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP : Status Conference Re: Consent Decree and Re: Payment of Settlement held. William R. Tamayo not present. Status Conference is continued to 9:30 4/7/03, before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : C7 no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT: that this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. re [8-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (eps) Modified on 02/13/2003
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER of dismissal by Judge Alan C. Kay re [7-3] (cc: all counsel) (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP : Settlement Conference held. Settlement reached. Settlement on the Record held. Terms stated. Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi to recommend to Judge Alan C. Kay to enter Order for Dismissal With Prejudice. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9:00 3/10/03, LEK is Vacated. Status Conference Re: Consent Decree and Re: Payment of Settlement set for 9:30 3/3/03, Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi , status conference set for 9:30 3/3/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : In Chambers no record; FTR C7-CD#13 2:00-4:45, 4:50-4:56) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (eps) Modified on 02/13/2003
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Answer
              ANSWER by defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Ca, defendant Enterprise Rent-A- to complaint [1-1] filed on December 17, 2002; certificate of service (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EO : Settlement Conference/Mediation set for 01/31/2003 02:00:00 PM before LEK. Parties request that no confidential settlement conference statements be submitted. Elizabeth Jubin Fujiwara to notify Roman Amaguin. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Ca on 1/6/03 thru The Corporation Company, Gail S. Myers, service agent (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/10/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Summons Issued
                      SUMMONS issued (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT, Civil Rights-Employment Discrimination; jury trail demand (fe)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 289 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?