Kessel v. Aloha Airlines Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00834-SOM-BMK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shawn Kessel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiatt & Hiatt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Harada-Stone +1 808 885 3400 +1 808 885 6765 dhs@hiattlaw.com
Space Jerry M. Hiatt +1 808 885 3400 jh@hiattlaw.com
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
No Logo Aloha Islandair, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
No Logo Charles J. Edwards, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
No Logo Doe Corporations 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Doe Partnerships 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Jane Does 1-20, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Other Entities 1-20, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 12/30/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Honolulu
Terminated 7/10/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case Cv02-1-2787-11[Circuit Ct 1st Circu]
Def Custody Status
Flags REMAND, TERMED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Answer
ANSWER by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc, defendant Aloha Islandair Inc., defendant Charles J. Edwards to first amended complaint [1-1] filed October 18, 2004; certificate of service (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway adopting Magistrate's FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff Shawn Kessel's motion for remand and for attorneys' fees be granted in part and denied in part [11-1] remanding case to state court (cc: all counsel) (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Findings and RecommendationsCourt Filing
      FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff Shawn Kessel's motion for remand and for attorneys' fees be granted in part and denied in part by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP :Plaintiff Shawn Kessel's Motion for Remand and for Attorneys' Fees GRANTED. Harada-Stone to prepare a findings and recommendation. All dates vacated. - granting motion for remand and for attorneys' fees [5-1] rule 16 conference on 9:00 7/7/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren vacated ( Ct Rptr : Tape 1396, C6 (2-2:20)) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Shawn Kessel in support of plaintiff Shawn Kessel's motion for remand and for attorneys' fees [5-1]; certificate of service (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc, defendant Aloha Islandair Inc., defendant Charles J. Edwards in opposition to plaintiff Shawn Kessel's motion for remand and for attorneys' fees [5-1]; filed March 24, 2003; certificate of service (eps)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EO : Plaintiff Shawn Kessel's Motion for Remand and for Attorneys' Fees, filed 3-24-03, is set for hearing on 5-30-03 @ 2 p.m. before Judge Barry Kurren. [5-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway referring to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren the motion for remand and for attorneys' fees [5-1] (cc: BMK, CRM) (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Motion to RemandCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Shawn Kessel for remand and for attorneys' fees ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of David R. Harada Stone; exhibits 1; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 03/31/2003 09:00:00 AM to 07/07/2003 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Colleen from Hiatt's office to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Answer
                      ANSWER; certificate of service by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc, defendant Aloha Islandair Inc., defendant Charles J. Edwards to [1-1] (eps)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/31/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Notice of Removal
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL of State court action to Federal Court; exhibit a; certificate of service - from Circuit Ct 1st Circuit Case Number: CV 02-1-2787-11 (fe)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Filing Fee Received
                            FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 213155 (fe)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 187 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?