Continuous Media Playback System Controlled Over A Distributed Communication System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09579393
Examiner Sahera Halim, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Sahera Halim
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Thomas M. Krikorian, West Bloomfield, MI, Applicant

Represented by Novak Druce, LLP

Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Thomas M. Krikorian, West Bloomfield, MI, ()
Filing Date May 26, 2000
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 27592-01055-US2
Confirmation Number 7066
Group Art Unit 2457
Class / Sub-Class 709 / 219
Timeline
  Entries (255) Tab Overlap Assignments (8) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF
Issue Notification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/9/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (17 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Document Verification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Amendment Communication
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/8/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/8/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (18 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/9/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (19 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
Change of Address (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Supplemental Response
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Supplemental Response
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Finish
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow incoming amendment IFW
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (60 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?