USA v. Sater
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:98-cr-01101

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 17, 2019 at 12:21 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sater, Felix H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Felix Sater"

Toggle Switch Represented by Beys, Stein & Mobargha LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nader Mobargha +1 646 755 3603 +1 646 755 3599 nmobargha@blmpllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Malman Malman & Rosenthal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Myles H. Malman +1 954 322 0065 +1 954 322 0064 myles@malman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie R Caldwell +1 212 309 6260 +1 212 309 6001 lcaldwell@morganlewis.com
Space Kelly Anne Moore +1 212 309 6612 +1 212 309 6001 kelly.moore@morganlewis.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (220) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/1/2019, Entered: None Unseal Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        (Fax)Letter dtd. 7/30/13 filed by Richard E. Lerner o/b/o by Frederick Martin Oberlander to Judge Glasser, "requesting copies of sealed transcripts." (This is doc. 126 in 12-mc-150). (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration *** THIS IS A COURTESY CROSS-DOCKETING OF MOTION ACTUALLY FILED ON 12-MC-150 *** by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/13/2013. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER unsealing documents 1, 2, 5-8, 10, 11, 13-15, 17, 18-25, 29-35, 37-39, 41-49, 51-56, 58-61, 65-67, 69-75, 77, 78, 81-86, 89-99, 101-108; 110, 111, 113, 114, 116, 117, 120, 123-126, 128-131, 133-136, 139, 140, 143-152, 155-157, 159-168, 174-184, 186-190, 193, 198, 200-201. The Court finds that the required burden of proof was satisfied as regards the docket numbered documents not included in those listed above and should remain sealed in their entirety or remain sealed as redacted.. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/12/2013. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Change of docketed counsel of record for non-party respondent Frederick M. Oberlander , to indicate that Richard E. Lerner is counsel of record for Oberlander,....... by John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Lerner, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                  Letter as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 dated 9/24/12 (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                    Letter MOTION to Compel exchange of information between counsels in re unsealing of records by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to above) (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER dated 9/28/12 as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 re: adjournment. ( Hearing is adjourned and set for 10/9/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8B South before Judge I. Leo Glasser. ( Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/28/12 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MOTION to Produce This is the response to Judge Cogan's request for production of a certain retainer agreement, see docket entry of 9/27/2012. There is also a request to supplement prior argument for reconsideration by a few pages. No motion de novo is here but no other PACER category worked. The court is asked to understand the document produced was not available to counsel to give me from his files which have been removed from his access, so it required finding my copies archived offsite. by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter authorizing appointment of counsel., # 2 Exhibit Memorandum of law Exhibit 56 in 12-MC-150 before Judge Glasser, to be deemed incorporated herein to current papers sub judice in supplementation pursuant to request for same in main document., # 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Lerner which is Exhibit 4 in Exhibit 2 herein.) (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/29/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                          Letter providing update with respect to sealing matters and requesting adjournment as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Norris, Evan) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                            Letter requesting clarification as to the purpose and use of docket 12-mc-0557 and requesting contact information be posted as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LIMITED UNSEALING ORDER, granting 211 Motion to Unseal Document as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (1). Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/21/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Unseal Document Limited Unsealing Application by USA as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Limited Unsealing Order) (Cooley, Alicyn) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/15/2012, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of order of April 16 granting leave to withdraw by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support) (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/15/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                    Interim MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration. Temporary law office failure in obtaining affidavit of Richard Lerner in support of motion is briefly delaying ECF upload. by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                      Interim MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to unserved and unnoticed order of August 16, 2012 by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of Feb. 27, 2012 contempt proceedings, # 2 Exhibit US v Lauria, 98-cr-1102, as obtained from Lee's Summit Archives April 3, 2012, # 3 Exhibit Transcript of hearing February 2, 2001 in US v Coppa, 00-cr-0196, # 4 Affidavit Testimony of Brian Vodicka as to his independent determination from public sources that John Doe is Felix Sater and his disclosure of same to the Miami Herald) (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of failure to serve or otherwise notice a certain order as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request for Relief from Order of August 16, 2012 by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Judge Glasser's scheduling order in 12-MC-150) (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 held on 10/23/2009, before Judge I. Leo Glasser. Court Reporter/Transcriber Fred Guerino, Telephone number 718 330-7687. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. ( Redaction Request due 9/25/2012., Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2012., Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2012.) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 202) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Letter dated 2/23/2012 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Letter dated 2/1/2012 from Michael P. Beys to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Letter dated 3/21/2012 from Nader Mobargha to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 199) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Letter dated 1/6/2012 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Letter dated 11/23/2011 from the Government to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ENDORSED ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 on letter dated 9/29/2011 from the Government to Judge Glasser.. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 10/3/2011. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Letter dated 8/24/2011 from the Government to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            PRELIMINARY STATEMENT dated 3/21/2012 from Nadar Mobargha to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 194) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Letter dated 4/19/2011 from Judy Selmeci to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Letter dated 4/14/2011 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 192) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Letter dated 4/8/2011 from Nadar Mobargha to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 191) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/8/2011. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Letter dated 3/4/2011 from the Government to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nader Mobargha appearing for John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/22/11. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER referring case to Judge Cogan as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 2/15/2011. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Letter dated 1/25/2011 from AUSA T. Kaminsky and E. Kramet to Judge Glasser. as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Letter dated 1/14/2011 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Letter dated 1/14/2011 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATED STANDSTILL ORDER and cover letter dated 8-12-10 from Kelly Moore. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/12/2010. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/18/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Letter dated 8/12/2010 from Richard Lerner as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/9/2010. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/3/2010. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Letter dated 7/20/2010 from Stamatios Stamoulis to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 6/25/2010. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 6-25-10. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of Kelly Moore (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request for Relief from Order of August 16, 2012 by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request for Relief from Order of August 16, 2012 by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Letter dated 8/21/2012 from Frederick Oberlander to the Honorable I Leo Glasser (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Coleen F Middleton and Judy Selmeci withdrawn from case as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (1). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/16/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER, granting 166 Motion to Unseal Case (For Limited Unsealing Order in Sealed Case) as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (1). Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/8/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal Case (For Limited Unsealing Order in Sealed Case) filed by USA as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  (Copy)Letter dtd. 8/6/12 from C. Friel Middleton, Esq. to Judge Cogan, in response to letter submitted by counsel for John Doe on 8/2/12, as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER, as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 on letter dtd. 5/8/12 from C. Middleton to Judge Glasser, denying counsel's application as moot for the adjournment of the proceeding scheduled 4/18/12. See 163 Order, dtd. 4/27/12. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 5/8/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER, as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. By endorsement dated April 25, 2012, 159 Order, the Court granted the request of Richard Roe for a second adjournment of a hearing that was originally to take place on April 18, 2012 and directed Roe to provide a status report on May 8, 2012. This request was granted in error as the Court, by order dated April 16, 2012, already cancelled the April 18, 2012 hearing. Roe's request for an adjournment is therefore moot. Roe need not provide the Court with a status report on May 8, 2012. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/27/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        LIMITED UNSEALING ORDER, as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. ORDERED that the transcript of sentencing, 34 , in the above-captioned case, dated October 23, 2009, having been previously ordered sealed, be unsealed for the limited purpose of permitting the government to obtain a copy for its files and for the files of the defendant. So Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/18/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER, as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 re 160 Letter. By letter dated April 16, 2012 160 , counsel for Richard Roe requested an adjournment for an indeterminate date of the scheduled April 18th hearing for the reasons stated.Accordingly, the hearing scheduled for April 18th, 2012 is cancelled and the remaining issues noted will be determined on the record and the briefs. The request of Roe's counsel for an adjournment is, therefore, moot. So Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/16/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            (Faxed)Letter, dtd. 4/16/12 from Coleen F. Middleton to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101, requesting an adjournment to the proceeding scheduled to take place 4/18/12. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER, as to John Doe 98-cr-01101, on faxed letter dtd. 4/25/12 from Coleen F. Middleton to Judge Glasser, granting her request for an adjrnmt. of the 4/18 proceeding until such time as Judge Cogan rules on the motion to withdraw. Status report adjourned to 5/8/12. So Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/25/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Letter dtd. 4/3/12 from AUSA to Judge Glasser, in further support of it's 2/7/12 Memo. of Law in Supp., as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Firm Wilson Elser be Relieved as Counsel for Non-Party "Richard Roe") by Coleen Friel Middleton. by John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER, as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 re 155 Letter. He is clearly mistaken regarding the representation of John Doe, and there was no hearing scheduled before me on April 2 to postpone. His request for an extension of time is therefore denied. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/3/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      (Faxed)Letter dtd. 3/30/12 from counsel as to John Doe 98-cr-1101, requesting a 60-day adjournment re the motion pending from 4/2 to any day the week of 6/4-6/8. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANT JOHN DOE'S ("DOE") REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF AN ORDER ENJOINING RICHARD ROE FROM DISSEMINATING CERTAIN SEALED AND CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND DIRECTING ROE TO RETURN ALL COPIES OF DOE'S SEALED AND CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 154) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPLY AFFIRMATION OFNADER MOBARGBA by John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER on faxed letter dtd. 3/20/12 from counsel for John Doe as to John Doe 98-cr-01101, granting their request to file rely brief to 141 Memorandum filed 2/24/12. (Oral argument set adjourned to 4/18/2012 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 8B South before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/20/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AUSA's RESPONSE in Opposition re 140 MOTION for Recusal of Non-Party Richard Roe filed 2/24/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 3/15/2012 from AUSAS Kaminsky, Kramet and Norris to Judge Glasserr as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Fax Letter dated 2/23/2012 from Richard Lerner as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 in regards to a stay of Proceedings. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 147 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (1). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/2/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101, ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/23/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8B South before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser.). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/2/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 140 Motion for Recusal as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (1). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/2/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 2/10/2012 from Richard Lerner to The Honorable I Leo Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 4/8/2011 from Richard Lerner to the Honorable I Leo Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 2/3/2011 from Richard Lerner to the Honorable I Leo Glasser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 140 MOTION for Recusal of Non-Party Richard Roe (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 141) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Recusal of Non-Party Richard Roe by Fred M Oberlander as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 denying Richard Roe's eleven page submission titled Extremely Sensitive Material submitted under Seal and In Camera demanding a stay of proceedings and an enlargement of time.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/24/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION OF NADER MOBARGHA by John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha, # 2 Ex. 2 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha, # 3 EX. 3 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha, # 4 Ex. 4 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha, # 5 Ex. 5 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha, # 6 Ex. 6 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha, # 7 Ex. 7 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha, # 8 Ex. 8 - Affirmation of Nader Mobargha) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 9 REDACTED 138 Main, # 10 REDACTED 138-1, # 11 REDACTED 138-2, # 12 REDACTED 138-3, # 13 REDACTED 138-4, # 14 REDACTED 138-5, # 15 REDACTED 138-6, # 16 REDACTED 138-7, # 17 REDACTED 138-8) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant John Doe's ("Doe") Memorandum of Law in Support of anOrder Enjoining Richard Roe from Disseminating Certain SealedAnd Confidential Documents and Directing Roe to Return AllCopies of Doe's Sealed and Confidential Documents (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Richard Lerner, # 2 Affidavit of Service on Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 3 REDACTED 137 Main) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 4 REDACTED 137-1, # 5 REDACTED 137-2) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 re 128 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, (Roe's request for an enlargement of time to file his responsive briefs is granted. Briefs due by 2/24/2012.). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/22/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to John Doe 98-cr-01101. Show Cause Hearing reset for 2/27/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/15/2012. (counsel of record notified of this Order via fax) (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 133 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/21/2012 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/13/2012. (Clarke, Melonie) M (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION for Order to Show Cause findings of Civil Contempt by John Doe 98-cr-01101. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated 2/10/12 from Nader Mobargha, Esq. to Judge Cogan re New York Times article. (Attachments: # 1 NYT article, # 2 Summary Order, # 3 Transcript, # 4 Redact letter) (Clarke, Melonie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 5 REDACTED 132 Main, # 6 REDACTED 132-1, # 7 REDACTED 132-2, # 8 REDACTED 132-3, # 9 REDACTED 132-4) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Fax Letter dated 1/31/2012 to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 2/1/2012 from Michael Beys to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Fax Letter dated 2/1/2012 to Judge Glasser as to John Doe 98-cr-01101 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER (The government shall file its brief on or beforeFebruary 7, 2012; Doe and Roe shall file their responsive briefs onor before February 21, 2012; The government shall file any reply on or beforeFebruary 28, 2012; and oral argument is set for 3/9/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8B South before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser.). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 1/26/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 1/26/2012 from AUSA Todd Kaminsky and Evan Norris to Judge Glasser requesting that the Court issue the enclosed proposed order to the parties, as well as to non-party Roe. The government also respectfully requests that this letter be filed under seal for the same reasons previously explained in the government's sealed and ex parte motions dated May 19, 2011, July 13, 2011, August 18, 2011, August 24, 2011, September 29, 2011, and November 23, 2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 2 REDACTED 127 Main, # 3 REDACTED 127-1) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Felix Sater. A letter from Richard Roe, transmitted to the Court by facsimile and dated January 31, 2012, "demanding" the unsealing of the government's January 26th letter is denied. He also requests that the Court expand the breadth of the issues to be considered at oral argument, which is also denied. The discrete issue to be addressed at oral argument is whether Richard Roe violated an Order of this Court by publishing the specifically identified documents in his possession and if he has, should he be permanently enjoined from disseminating them. The issue sought to be added will be scheduled and heard in due course. So Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/2/2012. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Felix Sater. (1) The judgment of the District Court permanently enjoining the dissemination of John Does Pre-Sentence Report is AFFIRMED. (2) The appeal in Docket No. 10-2905-cr is DISMISSED in part, and the appeal in Docket No. 11- 1408-cr is DISMISSED in full, insofar as they challenge the District Courts temporary restraining orders of May 18, 2010 and July 20, 2010 and insofar as they challenge any related orders that may have been entered or re-affirmed on May 28, June 11, June 14, or June 21, 2010. (3) The appeal in Docket No. 11-1411-cr is DISMISSED because Roe has waived his opportunity to challenge Judge Brian M. Cogans orders of April 1, 2011 and April 4, 2011. (4) The appeal in Docket No. 11-1906-cr is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction. (5) With respect to Docket No. 11-2425-cr, the order of Judge Cogan is AFFIRMED. (6) The appeal in Docket No. 11-1666-cr by pro se appellants is DISMISSED in all respects except insofar as it challenges the District Courts permanent injunction against the dissemination of Does PSR; with respect to that claim, the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (7) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close Docket Nos. 11-1408-cr, 11-1411-cr, 11-1906-cr, and 11-2425-cr upon entry of this order. The Clerk of Court is also DIRECTED to close Docket No. 11-479-cr to the extent it was not already closed upon entry of our February 14, 2011 order. See Order, Roe v. United States, Docket Nos. 10-2905-cr, 11-479-cr (2d Cir. Feb. 14, 2011). (8) The remainder of this cause (Docket Nos. 10-2905-cr, 11-1666-cr) is REMANDED to the District Court (I. Leo Glasser, Judge) for proceedings consistent with this order and with instructions (i) to rule upon the governments unsealing motion of March 17, 2011, (ii) to issue a final determination regarding whether the dissemination of the other (non-PSR) sealed documents in John Does criminal case, particularly those that refer to Does cooperation, should be enjoined, and (iii) in the event that a final determination regarding the dissemination of the other sealed documents does not result in an injunction against the dissemination of documents referring to Does cooperation, to enter an order temporarily staying the unsealing of any documents referring to Does cooperation pending an appeal by the government to our Court. In the event that the government elects not to appeal the unsealing of any documents that may be unsealed by the District Court, the government is ORDERED to notify the District Court and our Court of its decision not to pursue the appeal within the otherwise applicable time for taking the appeal. (9) It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to United States v. Jacobson, 15 F.3d 19 (2d Cir. 1994), this panel shall retain jurisdiction over any further appeals from proceedings in the District Court, including any further petitions for extraordinary writs. (10) It is hereby ORDERED that Judge Cogan shall retain jurisdiction for the limited purpose of enforcing our February 14, 2011 mandatethat is, to ensure the parties compliance with the orders of this Court and any that have been, or may hereafter be, entered by Judge Glasser. Our panel retains jurisdiction pursuant to United States v. Jacobson, 15 F.3d 19 (2d Cir. 1994), over any appeals from any orders or judgments entered by Judge Cogan. (11) Finally, it is ORDERED that appellant Richard Roe is hereby warned that the Courts patience has been exhausted by his filing of six separate notices of appeal regarding the same principal legal disputeincluding the filing of an appeal from a March 23, 2011 scheduling order that obviously was not a final order nor subject to any of the exceptions to the final judgment rule, see Part (iv), anteand that any further attempts to re-litigate the issues decided by this order, or other future filings of a frivolous nature, may result in sanctions, including the imposition of leave-to-file restrictions, requirements of notice to other federal courts, and monetary penalties. (12) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this order to Judge Cogan. (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated 12/22/2011 from Richard E. Lerner to the Honorable I Leo Glasser. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Mandate issued on 12/20/2011, # 2 Facsimile cover page) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Case by Fred M Oberlander as to Felix Sater. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER as to Felix Sater Status Conference set for 1/10/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8B South before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser. Endorsed on the Government's application of 11/23/2011.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 11/28/11. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER, as to Felix Sater, granting AUSA's request for 30-day adrnmnt. of status cnf. scheduled 9/30/11. (Status Conference adjourned to 11/30/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8B South before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 10/3/2011. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 119 MOTION for an Order that would permit it to withdraw an unsealing motion made on March 17, 2011, without prejudice and with leave to re-file that motion at a later, unspecified date by USA as to Felix Sater (1). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/24/2011. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for an Order that would permit it to withdraw an unsealing motion made on March 17, 2011, without prejudice and with leave to re-file that motion at a later, unspecified date by USA as to Felix Sater. (Marziliano, August) Modified on 8/26/2011 (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue the hearing scheduled for August 19, 2011 in the above-captioned case by USA as to Felix Sater. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to Felix Sater. A hearing re govt's 101 Letter is hereby directed to be heard on 8/19/11. Hearing set for 8/19/2011 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8B South before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/18/2011. (Layne, Monique) (Main Document 117 replaced on 7/19/2011). (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to Felix Sater. Parties directed to reconvene 7/15/11 at 11:00 A.M. for purpose of continuing to address the motion pursuant to Summ. Order of Court of Appeals dtd. 6/29/11. Motion hrg. set for 7/15/2011, 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8B South before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser. So Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/1/2011. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 7/13/2011 from AUSA Kaminsky to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455, receipt number 4653030359 as to Felix Sater re 113 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory : (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by Fred M Oberlander as to Felix Sater re 111 Order,,. Filing fee $ 455. Receipt Number 4653030359. Emailed to Richard Alcantara, USCA on 6/15/2011. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue its motion to unseal the docket be stayed for a period of 60 days by USA as to Felix Sater. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, as to Felix Sater, "On October, 23, 2009," John Doe, by his real name, "was sentenced to probation and a $25,000 fine." The Government's request to unseal certain information about Doe's sentence is currently pending before Judge Glasser. Unless and until Judge Glasser orders this information unsealed, it remains subject to the Second Circuit's injunction. It seems obvious that Roe is seeking to fatally undermine the purpose of the injunctions by publicizing information that would render them ineffective. Roe therefore may not issue any of the three statements submitted in his April 14 letter. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/13/2011. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by Fred M Oberlander as to Felix Sater re 104 Order,. Filing fee $ 455> Notice of Appeal was taken from after hours drop box but there was no file stamp on the envelope. (Attachments: # 1 Order by Judge Glasser dated 3/23/2011, # 2 Affidavit in Support, # 3 Transcript Order, # 4 Receipt Number 4653028027) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 4/8/2011 from AUSA Kaminsky to the Honorable I. Leo Glasser as to Felix Sater (Attachments: # 1 Letter dated 3/30/2011 from AUSA Kaminsky to Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Fred M Oberlander as to Felix Sater for proceedings held on (not noted on request) before Judge (not noted on request) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Fred M Oberlander as to Felix Sater re 106 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Filing Fee for $455, Receipt number 4653027604) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court has reviewed Richard Roe's motion for reconsideration 105 . It is denied. It was plainly the intent of Judge Glasser to have those documents destroyed or returned. There is no prejudice to Roe because in the event he prevails in having the sealing order overturned in the Circuit, he will again have access to the documents. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/4/2011. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for Reconsideration Richard Roe's Application for Reconsideration of Affirmative Injunction or Stay Pending Submission of Application for Stay to the Second Circuit by Felix Sater. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER as to Felix Sater requesting the government, Richard Roe and John Doe to brief the issue of the Court's jurisdiction and submit their briefs simultaneously on April 8, 2011.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/23/2011. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 3/15/2011 from Michael Beys to the Honorable I Leo Glasser as to Felix Sater requesting an oportinity to review the sealed documents. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 3/17/2011 from Judge Glasser to Michael Beys in regards to his letter dated 3/15/2011 as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 3/17/2011 from AUSA Kaminsky to Judge Glasser supplementing the government's March 17, 2011 letter moving for the continued sealing of certain docket entries and documents in this case, as well as the unsealing of others. as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated 3/17/2011 from AUSA Kaminsky to Judge Glasser in response to Mr. Lerner's letter, dated February 3, 2011, demanding that the Court "immediately docket all events that have occurred in this case, from its inception as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 100) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Richard Roe to respond until 3/28 by Felix Sater. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Richard Roe's letter dated March 1, 2011 by Felix Sater. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Felix Sater (1). Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/8/2011. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA as to Felix Sater. (Attachments: # 1 Press Release) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nader Mobargha appearing for Felix Sater (Attachments: # 1 Substitution of Counsel, # 2 Memorandum in Support) (Marziliano, August) Modified on 3/10/2011 (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Myles H. Malman appearing for Felix Sater. This Notice of Appearance was found along with the Waiver of Indictment and Pleading Calendar. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Felix Sater Marziliano, August) (Marziliano, August). Modified on 3/10/2011 Hard copy has been found and was attached to this entry.(Marziliano, August). (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser:Plea Agreement Hearing as to Felix Sater held on 12/10/1998, Plea entered by Felix Sater (1) Guilty Count 1. (Court Reporter Henri LeGendra.) (Marziliano, August) (Marziliano, August). Modified on 3/10/2011 Hard copy has been found and was attached to this entry.(Marziliano, August). (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Felix Sater: In accordance with the Order and Mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, dated 2/14/11, the matter is referred to Judge Brian Cogan for the limited purpose of implementing and overseeing compliance with the orders of the Circuit and the orders previously entered by Judge Glasser relating to the documents placed under seal. Ordered by Chief Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 2/15/2011. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to Felix Sater re 47 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory 42 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory 41 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. The petition for a writ of mandamus in Docket No. 11-479 is DENIED, and the docket of that case shall remain SEALED pending further order of our Court; the government's motion for a temporary stay of unsealing of the docket in No. 10-2905-cr; pending full review of the merits of Roe's appeal is GRANTED; the parties and all who are in active concert or participation with them are TEMPORARILY ENJOINED, pursuant to the terms of the order stated above; we REMAND the cause to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York for a limited purpose and under the terms noted above;The limited mandate described above shall issue forthwith. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 2/4/2011 from Richard E. Lerner to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter dated 2/3/2011 from the Government to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater with exhibits attached. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 2/3/2011 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser and Exhibits as to Felix Sater (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 2 REDACTED 87 Main, # 3 REDACTED 87-2) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Felix Sater held on June 11, 2010, before Judge BEFORE THE HONORABLE I. LEO GLASSER. Court Reporter/Transcriber FREDERICK R. GUERINO, C.S.R., Telephone number 718-330-7687. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 1/25/2011 from Kelly Moore to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated 12/16/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 12/13/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 12/3/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 12/2/2010 from the Government to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/Memo dated 12/2/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 80) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 2 REDACTED 80) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Movant John Doe's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Permanent Injunction. (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 79) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 2 REDACTED 79) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Davis A. Snider in further support of Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/Memo dated 11/23/2010 from the Government to Judge Glasser (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/Memo dated 11/23/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 76, # 2 REDACTED 79) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 2 REDACTED 76) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 11/16/2010 from Kelly Moore to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment to Stipulated Standstill and ORDER.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/27/2010. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 9/27/2010 from Kelly Moore to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter dated 8/6/2010 from Kelly Moore to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER dated 7/27/2010 extending TRO until 8/3/3010.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/27/2010. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 7/19/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Felix Sater held on June 14, 2010, before Judge HONORABLE I. LEO GLASSER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anthony M. Mancuso, Telephone number (718) 613-2419. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Richard E. Lerner in opposition to all relief sought in otsc. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 2 REDACTED 68 main, # 3 REDACTED 68-1) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER DIRECTING NON-PARTY JOSHUA BERNSTELN TORETURN PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT AND COMPLY WITHEXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 6/25/2010. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 7/2/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 6/24/2010 from Richard Lerner and exhibits. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOVANT JOHN DOE'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 64) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Brian A. Herman in support of permanent injunction. (Attachments: # 1 1 Part 1, # 2 1 Part 2, # 3 1 Part 3, # 4 1 Part 4, # 5 1 Part 5, # 6 2-4, # 7 5-8 Part 1, # 8 5-8 Part 2, # 9 5-8 Part 3, # 10 5-8 Part 4, # 11 9-11) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 12 REDACTED 63 Main, # 13 REDACTED 63-2, # 14 REDACTED 63-3, # 15 REDACTED 63-4, # 16 REDACTED 63-5, # 17 REDACTED 63-6, # 18 REDACTED 63-7, # 19 REDACTED 63-8, # 20 REDACTED 63-9, # 21 REDACTED 63-10, # 22 REDACTED 63-11, # 23 REDACTED 63-12) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 6/21/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser and attachments as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 62) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 6/18/2010 from Kelly Moore to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated 6/14/2010 from Richard Lerner to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 6/14/2010 from Kelly Moore to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 6/11/2010 from Robert Lerner to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANT FELIX SATER'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OF SEALED AND CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 REDACTED 57) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Stamatios Stamoulis in support of Fred M Oberlander Opposition and cross motion (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 6/8/2010 from Kelly Moore to Judge Glasser as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 6/8/2010 from Judge Glasser to Thomas W. Hyland as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 5/25/2010 from Lauren J. Rocklin to Judge Glasser and endorsed order dated 6/11/2010 (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Felix Sater. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 5/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Felix Sater MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OFSEALED AND CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion filed by Fred Oberlander for an order granting Oberlander leave to contact the third -person who gave the documents at issue as to Felix Sater (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B Part 1, # 3 B Part 2, # 4 B Part 3, # 5 B Part 4, # 6 B Part 5, # 7 B Part 6, # 8 B Part 7, # 9 B Part 8, # 10 B Part 9, # 11 B Part 10, # 12 B Part 11, # 13 B Part 12, # 14 B Part 13, # 15 B Part 14, # 16 B Part 15, # 17 C) (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 18 REDACTED 50 Main, # 19 REDACTED 50-2, # 20 REDACTED 50-18) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 21 REDACTED 50 B) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Felix Sater held on June 21, 2010, before Judge I. Leo Glasser. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mickey Brymer, RPR, Telephone number 718 613-2255. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Felix Sater held on July 20, 2010, before Judge I. Leo Glasser. Court Reporter/Transcriber Henry Shapiro, Telephone number 718 613-2509. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NNOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by Fred M Oberlander. otice is hereby given that non-party respondent Frederick M. Oberlander, Esq. appeals to theUnited States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit from that aspect of the July 20, 2010 order of the Honorable District Judge Israel Leo Glasser which issued a TRO against him. Non-party respondentOberlander reserves his rights to contend that a final, appealable paper must be issued to begin the running of his time to appeal, and further reserves his rights to raise all other procedural and substantive objections, including that such order, regardless whether a TRO or not, was without legal significance. Filing fee $ 455. Receipt Number:4653018481 (Brown, Marc) Modified on 1/28/2011 (Brown, Marc). (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, as to Felix Sater. ORDERED that the docket sheet in the above-captioned case be unsealed for the limited purpose of allowing the government to review it while it otherwise remains under seal. So Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 1/20/2011. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Letter dtd. 11/23 from AUSA T. Kaminsky as to whether the Court has authority to order F. Oberlander, Esq. to return sealed doc's in possession and to enjoin him from disseminating said doc's. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Envelope containing Letter as to Felix Sater. Ordered sealed by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/27/2010. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Felix Sater: The TRO is extended to 8/3/2010 on which date, if agreement referenced is not reached prior to that date, parties to provide status report in writing. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/27/2010. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice is hereby given that non-party respondents Jody Kriss and Michael Ejekam hereby appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit from that aspect of the TRO issued by the Honorable District Judge Israel Leo Glasser dated May 18, 2010, which by operation of law may haveconverted to a preliminary injunction at or after any of the hearings which were held on June 11, 14 and 21, 2010. Non-party respondents Jody Kriss and Michael Ejekam reserve their rights to contend that the TRO was not converted to a preliminary injunction by operation of law, and that their rights to contend that a final appealable paper must be issued to begin the running of his time to appeal. Non-party respondents Jody Kriss and Michael Ejekam further appeal from that aspect of the oral order, stated on the record on June 21, 2010, that issued a permanent injunction as to a certain presentencing report. Non-party respondents further reserve their rights to contend that the oral order was rescinded, by further statement on the record by Judge Glasser that further testimony would be heard and that the TRO would thus be continued, and that in any event the oral order is not appealable, but will only become appealable upon the issuance of a formal written order. Receipt Number: 4653017685 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by Fred M Oberlander as to Felix Sater Filing fee $ 455.appeals to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit from that aspect of the May 28, 2010 TRO (including all of the subsequent versions, extensions and renewals of this order) issued by the Honorable District Judge Israel Leo Glasser, which by operation of law may have converted to a preliminary injunction at or after any of the hearings which were held on June 11, 14 and 21, 2010. Non-party respondent Oberlander reserves his rights to contend that the TRO was not converted to a preliminary injunction by operation of law, and that his rights to contend that a final appealable paper must be issued to begin the running of his time to appeal.Non-party respondent Oberlander further appeals from that aspect of the oral order, stated on the record on June 21, 2010, that issued a permanent injunction as to a certain presentencing report. Non-party respondent Oberlander further reserves his rights to contend that the oral order was rescinded, by further statement on the record by Judge Glasser that further testimony would be heard and that the TRO would thus be continued, and that in any event the oral order is not appealable, but will only become appealable upon the issuance of a formal written order. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt of Filing fee 4653017263) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Unavailability from Nov. 19-26, 2000, filed by Myles Malman. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Unavailability from June 27, 2005 through July 11, 2005, filed by Myles Malman. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adjournment Letter as to Felix Sater. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ENVELOPE CONTAINING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PLACE IN VAULT. (Greene, Donna) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Reasons by Felix Sater Copies distributed. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to Felix Sater (1), Count(s) 1, Receives Fine $25,000. All payments should be made to the Clerk of Court. $100 Special Assessment. (Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 10/23/2009) C/M (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser:Sentencing held on 10/23/2009 for Felix Sater (1), Count(s) 1, Receives Fine $25,000. All payments should be made to the Clerk of Court. $100 Special Assessment.. AUSA Todd Kaminsky/Marshall Miller; Defense Counsel, Kelly Moore. (Court Reporter Fred Guerino.) (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER adjourning sentencing to 10/23/2009 as to Felix Sater. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/30/2009. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter as to Felix Sater to Judge Glasser filed by Defense Counsel. (Piper, Francine) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leslie R Caldwell appearing for Felix Sater (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kelly Anne Moore appearing for Felix Sater (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order to Unseal Document as to Felix Sater in order to provide copies to the Government.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/16/2009. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Felix Sater allowing travel.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/3/2005. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Felix Sater allowing travel.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9-1-2004. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Felix Sater allowing travel.. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 10/2/01. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Unavailability as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address of firm by Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Unavailability as to Felix Sater (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Felix Sater. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/8/2009. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Felix Sater. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3-4-1999. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Felix Sater. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/17/1999. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter as to Felix Sater in regards to Notice of Change of Firm Name (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INFORMATION as to Felix Sater (1) count(s) 1. (Marziliano, August) Modified on 7/16/2009 (Marziliano, August). Originally docketed as document number 3. Needed to be re docketed since it was an information (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT PLACED IN VAULT (Sica, Michele) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 09/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT PLACED IN VAULT. (Sica, Michele) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dtd 7/19/04 from Myles H. Malman to Ms. Johnson, confirming that the sentencing of the defendant has been rescheduled for 09/09/04 at 3:30 before Judge Glasser. (Sica, Michele) (Vaughn, Terry). (Entered: 07/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of unavailability: Counsel Myles H. Malman, Counsel will be unavailable from 06/28/04 through 07/09/04. (Sica, Michele) (Vaughn, Terry). (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT as to John Doe in 1:98-cr-01101. (Rodriguez,Angela) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 03/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated June 20, 2002 from AUSA David B. Pitofsky to Clerk of the Court: Enclosed are documents relating to Mr. Weisenfeld's claim, which are asked to be included with prior submission. (Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT as to John Doe in 1:98-cr-01101. (Rodriguez,Angela) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 01/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to John Doe in 1:98-cr-01101 unsealing the guilty plea transcript. ( Signed by Senior Judge I. L. Glasser , on 11/15/01) (Sica, Michele) (Vaughn, Terry). (Entered: 11/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 7/20/01 from Counsel Melinda Sarafa to Judge Glasser confirming conversation with Louise Schillat that Mr. Paul's sentencing has been adjourned to 7/31/01 at 10:30 a.m. (Drayton, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Letter dated 5/15/00 as to John Doe in 1:98-cr-01101. (Greene, Donna) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 05/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Letter dated 1/26/00. (Greene, Donna) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 01/28/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED LETTER as to John Doe. (Greene, Donna) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 10/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT (letter) as to John Doe (Gonzalez, Mary) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 03/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED CALENDAR as to John Doe. Date of sealing 1/6/99. (Greene, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2009: # 1 Order Setting Cinditions of Release and Bond) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 2 REDACTED 4 Main, # 3 REDACTED 4-1) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 01/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED LETTER as to John Doe placed in vault. (Greene, Donna) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 12/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of intent to proceed under FRCrP 7(b) as to John Doe. (Greene, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2010: # 1 Criminal Case Information Sheet) (Vaughn, Terry). (Entered: 12/08/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 745 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?