Canonsburg General Hospital v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-5370

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 4:16 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 01207714265 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1559140], on the court's own motion, that the order filed on June 16, 2015, directing supplemental briefing be vacated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that in light of Perez v. Mortgage Bankers Ass’n, 135 S. Ct. 1199 (2015), the parties electronically file, on or before July 6, 2015, new final briefs removing the portions of their previously-filed final briefs that rely on the applicability of the Paralyzed Veterans doctrine. [13-5370]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207712420 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1557903] scheduling oral argument on Monday, 09/21/2015. [13-5370]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207712055 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1557704] [13-5370], on the court’s own motion, that the parties file supplemental briefs addressing the effect of Perez v. Mortgage Bankers Ass’n, 135 S. Ct. 1199 (2015), on this case. The following briefing schedule and format will apply: Supplemental Brief for Appellant - July 6, 2015 (not to exceed 12 pages); Supplemental Brief for Appellee - July 27, 2015 (not to exceed 12 pages); Supplemental Reply Brief for Appellant - August 6, 2015 (not to exceed 5 pages). In addition to electronic filing, the parties are directed to deliver paper copies of the supplemental briefs to the court on the date due.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207691578 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1546540] granting motion for other relief [1546443-2], removing case from abeyance. The Clerk is directed to issue an appropriate scheduling order [13-5370]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207691405 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          JOINT MOTION filed [1546443] by Canonsburg General Hospital Regarding Further Proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/23/2015) [Service Date: 04/08/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207643536 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1520619], on the court’s own motion, that this case be removed from the November 14, 2014 oral argument calendar and held in abeyance pending disposition by the Supreme Court of Perez v. Mortgage Bankers Ass’n, No. 13-1041 and Nickols v. Mortgage Bankers Association, No. 13-1052 (oral argument on Dec. 1, 2014). The parties are directed to file motions to govern future proceedings within 30 days of the date of the Supreme Court’s decision. Before Judges: Garland, Wilkins and Randolph. [13-5370]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207623323 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1509647] scheduling oral argument on Friday, 11/14/2014. [13-5370]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608541 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1501109] filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ] Length of Brief: 9030 words. [13-5370] (Shultz, Benjamin)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207607908 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  LETTER FILED [1500788] by Canonsburg General Hospital regarding requested revisions for acronyms in final briefs. [Service Date: 07/03/2014 ] [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207607895 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPELLANT FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1500783] filed by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 07/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,922 words. [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207607890 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1500780] filed by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 07/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 11,678 words. [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207604260 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                        LETTER FILED [1498826] by Canonsburg General Hospital allowing counsel 7 days from the date of docketing to submit revised briefs that eliminate any uncommon acronyms used in the previously filed briefs. [Service Date: 06/20/2014 ] [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207604256 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                          JOINT APPENDIX [1498825] filed by Canonsburg General Hospital. [Volumes: 2] [Service Date: 06/20/2014 ] [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207602623 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                            LETTER FILED [1497842] by Kathleen Sebelius pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 06/16/2014 ] [13-5370] (Shultz, Benjamin)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207602521 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                              LETTER SENT [1497745] to counsel concerning the use of uncommon acronyms and abbreviations in briefs. [13-5370]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 01207602327 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1497637] filed by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 06/13/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6985. [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207600845 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                  LETTER FILED [1496873] by Kathleen Sebelius regarding oral argument matter [Request regarding oral argument scheduling] [Service Date: 06/10/2014 ] [13-5370] (Shultz, Benjamin)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207599252 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE FILED [1495995] by Canonsburg General Hospital of Change of Law Firm Affiliation. [Service Date: 06/04/2014 ] [13-5370] (Collins, Sven)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207594918 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1493585] granting appellant's unopposed motion to extend time to file the reply brief [1492872-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Reply Brief due 06/13/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 06/20/2014. Final Briefs due 07/07/2014. [13-5370]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207593694 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1492872] by Canonsburg General Hospital to extend time to file reply to 06/13/2014. Pages: 1-10. [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207593301 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                          APPELLEE BRIEF [1492634] filed by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 05/12/2014 ] Length of Brief: 9030 Words. [13-5370] (Shultz, Benjamin)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586051 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1488659] granting appellee's unopposed motion to extend time to file its brief [1488505-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 05/12/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/27/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 06/03/2014. Final Briefs due 06/17/2014. [13-5370]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585815 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1488505] by Kathleen Sebelius to extend time to file brief to 05/12/2014. [Service Date: 04/15/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5370] (Shultz, Benjamin)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207582185 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                APPELLANT BRIEF [1486516] filed by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 04/01/2014 ] Length of Brief: 11,912. [13-5370] (Collins, Sven)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207581979 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                  CLERK'S ORDER filed [1486412] granting appellant's unopposed motion to utilitze a deferred appendix [1486350-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 04/01/2014 (unchanged). APPELLEE Brief due on 05/01/2014 (unchanged). APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/15/2014 (unchanged). DEFERRED APPENDIX due 05/22/2014. Final Briefs due 06/05/2014. [13-5370]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207581848 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1486350] by Canonsburg General Hospital concerning appendix deferral Pages: 1-10. [13-5370] (Collins, Sven)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207571867 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1480809] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 04/01/2014. APPENDIX due 04/01/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 05/01/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/15/2014 [13-5370]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563781 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                        TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1475977] by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563778 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1475976] by Stephen P. Nash, Sven Collins on behalf of Appellant Canonsburg General Hospital. [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563775 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                            STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1475975] by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563772 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                              UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1475974] by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ] [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563769 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1475973] by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ] [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563766 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1475972] by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ] [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563763 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1475971] by Canonsburg General Hospital [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ] [13-5370] (Nash, Stephen)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563707 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1475953] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ] [13-5370] (Shultz, Benjamin)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207563703 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1475951] by Benjamin M. Shultz and co-counsel Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee Kathleen Sebelius. [13-5370] (Shultz, Benjamin)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207556588 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE [1471780] filed from Clerk, District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 13-5370: Fee Paid] [13-5370]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207556577 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1471776] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/21/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/03/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/21/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/21/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/21/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/03/2014 [13-5370]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207556574 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1471774] by Canonsburg General Hospital seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:09-cv-02385-BAH. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-5370]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?