Timothy Olson v. Midland Funding LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1040

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 4:51 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
Mandate issued. Referencing: [25] Judgment Order , [24] Unpublished per curiam Opinion. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-01882-CCB.. [14-1040] (JB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 14-1040 opn.u.sub. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-01882-CCB. Entered on Docket Date: 07/15/2014. [999395536] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [14-1040] (SAW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
      UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-01882-CCB. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [999395533].. [14-1040] (SAW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE ISSUED RE: Rule 34 pre-argument review. [14-1040] (TO)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
          BRIEF by Appellant Timothy Olson in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/11/2014. [999335247] [14-1040] Edwin Hoskins
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
            BRIEF by Appellees Lyons Doughty & Veldhuis, P.C., Midland Credit Management Incorporated and Midland Funding LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2014. [999326758] [14-1040] James Ulwick
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
              FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Timothy Olson. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/21/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999301432] [14-1040] Edwin Hoskins
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                BRIEF by Appellant Timothy Olson in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/21/2014. [999301424] [14-1040] Edwin Hoskins
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Midland Funding LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999283125] [14-1040] Amy Askew
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Midland Credit Management Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999283124] [14-1040] Amy Askew
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-1040] (LP)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Lyons Doughty & Veldhuis, P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999278736] [14-1040] Ronald Canter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ronald S. Canter for Lyons Doughty & Veldhuis, P.C..[999278732] [14-1040] Ronald Canter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Amy E. Askew for Midland Credit Management Incorporated and Midland Funding LLC.[999278397] [14-1040] James Ulwick
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James P. Ulwick for Midland Credit Management Incorporated and Midland Funding LLC.[999278396] [14-1040] James Ulwick
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Timothy Olson. [14-1040] Edwin Hoskins
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Timothy Olson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999278209] [14-1040] Edwin Hoskins
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Max F. Brauer for Timothy Olson.[999278206] [14-1040] Edwin Hoskins
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by E. David Hoskins for Timothy Olson.[999278205] [14-1040] Edwin Hoskins
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                        BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/24/2014. Response Brief due 03/31/2014 [14-1040] (DL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-01882-CCB.. [14-1040] (DL)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                            Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-01882-CCB. Case manager: DLett. [14-1040] (DL)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?