Red Pine Point LLC v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00274
District Judge James F. Holderman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 4:06 AM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Red Pine Point LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ronald Marc Wawrzyn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Michael Wawrzyn +1 312 283 8330 +1 312 283 8331 mwawrzyn3@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siprut, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie K. Nelson +1 312 236 0603 mnelson@siprut.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Jeremy Siprut , +1 312 588 1440 +1 312 427 1850 jsiprut@siprut.com
Space Joseph Jeremy Siprut , +1 312 588 1440 +1 312 427 1850 jsiprut@siprut.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wawwrzyn LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Charles Jarvis +1 312 283 8332 stephen@wawrzynlaw.com
Space Matthew Michael Wawrzyn +1 312 283 8330 +1 312 283 8331 mwawrzyn3@gmail.com
v.
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Audible, Inc.
No Logo Magnolia Pictures, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office Chicago
Filed 1/15/2014
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside the State of IL
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags AO279,GILBERT
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California in San Francisco the electronic case file via email. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
    MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: # 1 Patent Closing Order). (ph, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER Transferring Cases to Northern District of California. Having considered all the factors presented by the parties, as to these related cases, Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 13 is granted. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim 25 is mooted by this transfer and may be presented to the transferee court. Counsel need not appear before this court on July 29, 2014. These related and consolidated cases are transferred to the Northern District of California in San Francisco. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/16/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) Modified on 7/16/2014 (ntf, ). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Motion by Adam K Mortara for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 25 before Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/29/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM by Amazon.com Inc, Magnolia Pictures LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 25 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Magnolia Pictures LLC by Daniel C. Taylor (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Magnolia Pictures LLC by Adam K Mortara (Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon.com Inc by Daniel C. Taylor (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: Defendant Amazon.com's application for leave to appear pro hac vice 20 is granted. Attorney Daniel C. Taylor is given leave to appear as counsel for Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9645470. (Taylor, Daniel) Modified on 7/8/2014 (ntf, ). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: Parties' agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond 16 is granted to 7/15/14. Motion hearing date of 6/5/14 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                          REPLY by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Magnolia Pictures LLC to motion to transfer case 13 to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U, # 2 Exhibit V, # 3 Exhibit W)(Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Charles Jarvis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 16 before Honorable James F. Holderman on 6/5/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION by Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC for extension of time to file answer (AGREED MOTION) (Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE by Red Pine Point LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Magnolia Pictures LLC to transfer case to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 13 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM by Amazon.com Inc, Magnolia Pictures LLC in support of motion to transfer case 13 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Magnolia Pictures LLC to transfer case to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon.com Inc by Adam K Mortara (Mortara, Adam) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: Status hearing held. Defendants' motion to transfer shall be filed by 5/8/14. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 5/15/14. Defenants' reply in support shall be filed by 5/22/14. The court will rule electronically. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to consolidate cases 8 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/1/14 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Summons Issued
                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Magnolia Pictures LLC (pg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Charles Jarvis for presentment of motion to consolidate cases 8 before Honorable James F. Holderman on 4/29/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Summons Issued
                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Amazon.com Inc (pg, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC to consolidate cases through claim construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Stephen Charles Jarvis (Jarvis, Stephen)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Matthew Michael Wawrzyn (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Report
                                                        MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ea, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Case Assigned
                                                          CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable James F. Holderman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (meg, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Joseph J Siprut (Siprut, Joseph)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Melanie K. Nelson (Nelson, Melanie)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                                                CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nelson, Melanie)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Red Pine Point LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9107254. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Melanie)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Space Space

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?