Red Pine Point LLC v. Apple Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00292
District Judge James B. Zagel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:44 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Red Pine Point LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ronald Marc Wawrzyn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Michael Wawrzyn +1 312 283 8330 +1 312 283 8331 mwawrzyn3@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siprut, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie K. Nelson +1 312 236 0603 mnelson@siprut.com
Space Joseph Jeremy Siprut , +1 312 588 1440 +1 312 427 1850 jsiprut@siprut.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Jeremy Siprut , +1 312 588 1440 +1 312 427 1850 jsiprut@siprut.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wawwrzyn LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Charles Jarvis +1 312 283 8332 stephen@wawrzynlaw.com
Space Matthew Michael Wawrzyn +1 312 283 8330 +1 312 283 8331 mwawrzyn3@gmail.com
v.
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Magnolia Pictures, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office Chicago
Filed 1/15/2014
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 145 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside the State of IL
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags AO279,BROWN,PATENT PROGRAM
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California in San Francisco the electronic case file via email. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
    MAILED Patent report with certified copy of order dated 7/16/2014 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER Transferring Cases to Northern District of California. Having considered all the factors presented by the parties, as to these related cases, Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 14 is granted. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim is mooted by this transfer and may be presented to the transferee court. Counsel need not appear before this court on July 29, 2014. These related and consolidated cases are transferred to the Northern District of California in San Francisco. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/16/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magnolia Pictures LLC (Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Magnolia Pictures LLC(Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Apple Inc.(Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing date of 7/1/2014 before Judge Zagel is stricken.Mailed notice (jms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                  REPLY by Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC to motion to transfer case 14 To the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U, # 2 Exhibit V, # 3 Exhibit W)(Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM by Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC in support of motion to transfer case 14 To the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION by Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC to transfer case To the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC by Marc Andrew Cavan (Cavan, Marc) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable James F. Holderman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/29/14.(rp, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue the Status Hearing 9 is granted. Status and motion hearing set for 4/24/14 are stricken. Status hearing reset for 7/1/14 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Charles Jarvis for presentment of motion to continue 9 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/24/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Set/Reset Hearings
                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing set for 4/24/2014 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC to continue Status Hearing (UNOPPOSED MOTION) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Summons Issued
                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC (pg, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Stephen Charles Jarvis (Jarvis, Stephen)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Matthew Michael Wawrzyn (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Report
                                          MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (et, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Case Assigned
                                            CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable James B. Zagel. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (meg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Joseph J Siprut (Siprut, Joseph)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Melanie K. Nelson (Nelson, Melanie)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nelson, Melanie)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT filed by Red Pine Point LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9107394. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Melanie)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 235 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?