Interactive Virtual Reality Performance Theater Entertainment System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09617388
Examiner John M Hotaling, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner John M Hotaling
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Randy T. Sprout, Wildwood, MO, Applicant

Represented by STEVE COHEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ARI M. BAI +1 314 889 8000
Space Kelly Burris +1 734 302 6043
Space Peter S. Gilster +1 314 241 9090
Space Linda Lewis +1 314 989 0458
Space K. SCOTT O'BRIAN +1 717 237 5492
Space Glenn II Robbins +1 314 863 7733
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Randy T. Sprout, Wildwood, MO, ()
Filing Date July 17, 2000
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 43339-88004
Confirmation Number 8481
Group Art Unit 3713
Class / Sub-Class 463 / 31
Timeline
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Assignments (3) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.DEC.AUTO
Petition auto-grant letter from EFS (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.AUTO
Petition automatically granted by EFS (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Dismissed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Dismissed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow -Received 85b - Unmatched
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (11 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
New or Additional Drawing Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CFILE
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (7 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (40 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (11 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Pacr - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (64 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?