Mann v. Oceanic Ship Co., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00110-HG-LEK
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yvonne Mann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
v.
No Logo Defendants 1-50, Defendant
No Logo MS Patriot, Defendant
No Logo Oceanic Ship Co., Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 3/10/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 340 - Personal Injury: Marine
Cause Section 46 U.S.C. § 688 Jones Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Honolulu
Terminated 3/1/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: that the case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to "Order Adopting Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation" filed February 28, 2005 and "Findings and Recommendation that Case be Dismissed Without Prejudice" filed on January 12, 2005 re [24-1], re [23-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (emt)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor adopting magistrate's findings and recommendation that case be dismissed without prejudice [23-1] (cc: all counsel) (emt)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Findings and RecommendationsCourt Filing
      FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that Case be Dismissed Without Prejudice [22-1] by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (gab)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP : Status Conference [Plaintiff Pro Se to be physically present]; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference [to follow, if necessary] - Plaintiff Pro Se Yvonne Mann, not present. Three calls made, no response. Findings and Recommendation to Dismiss Case without prejudice to be issued by the Court. ( Ct Rptr : C7 no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
          "Order Granting Law Offices of Richard Turbin's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Yvonne Mann" RETURN OF SERVICE unexecuted by certified mail- attempted to Yvonne Mann - moved left no address; unable to forward (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER Granting Law Offices of Richard Turbin's Motion For Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record For Plaintiff Yvonne Mann by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi re [19-1] (mailed to Plaintiff on 12/10/04 by Certified Mail) (gs)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004, Terminated: 12/10/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EP : Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff - Plaintiff not present. Motion Granted. Status Conference set for 9:00 1/10/05, LEK. Plaintiff is to be physically present at Status Conference. Failure by Plaintiff to be physically present may result in sanctions being imposed which may include dismissal of the action. Atty Richard Turbin to provide plaintiff's last known address and phone number so that the Clerk's Office can enter the information into the Court's docket. Turbin to prepare Order Granting the Motion and also include the above information regarding the Status Conference. The Clerk's Office is directed to serve a copy of the Order on the Plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested. ( Ct Rptr : FTR C7) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EO: Motion for Leave to withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff set for 11/29/04 10:30 a.m. before LEK [17-1] by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004, Terminated: 11/29/2004 Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                  MOTION by plaintiff Yvonne Mann for leave to withdraw as counsel of record affidavit of Richard Turbin; certificate of service; before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO: continued: [Rule 16 scheduling conference] from 11/1/04 9:00 a.m. to 1/10/05 9:00 a.m. before LEK by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 08/30/2004 09:00:00 AM to 11/01/2004 09:00:00 AM before LEK. Richard Turbin to notify defendants. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/1/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi () JUDGE Mag Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EO : rule 16 Scheduling conference continued from 6/28/2004 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 8/30/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi Richard Turbin to notify defendants. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EO :Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 03/22/2004 09:00:00 AM to 06/28/2004 09:00:00 AM before LEK. () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 12/15/03 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 3/22/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi Carl Soto to notify defendants. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              EO : rule 16 conference continued from 9/15/03 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 12/15/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi Carl D. Soto to notify defendants. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sealed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                Plaintiff's Requst for Entry of Default against defendant Oceanic Ship Co., defendant MS Patriot, In Rem; affidavit in support; exhibits A-C; Entry of Default and certificate of service (gab)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Oceanic Ship Co. on 6/27/03 (gab)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant MS Patriot on 6/27/03 (gab)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Oceanic Ship Co. on 6/27/03 (gab)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant MS Patriot on 6/27/03 (gab)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 7/21/03 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 9/15/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi Anna of Richard Turbin's office to notify defendants. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 6/20/03 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 7/21/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi Anna of Richard Turbin's office to notify defendants. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 6/9/03 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 6/20/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 6/9/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT; jury demand; (Summons(es) issued) (gab)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                    FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 214496 (gab)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Space Space

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?