Rivera v. England, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00142-ACK-BMK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elizabeth Rivera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clayton C. Ikei +5333 533 533 3777 CCIOffice@hawaii.rr.com
v.
No Logo Gordon R. England, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark J. Mellett +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 3/28/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Honolulu
Terminated 11/30/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that the action be dismissed with prejudice, each to bear its own cost; dismissing case - on behalf of defendant (lmg) (dat, ).
    LREF
    Blank 121 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : Settlement conf held between 9 a.m. -2:15 p.m.; settlement placed on the record @ 2:15 p.m; status conf re dismissal set for 12/12/05 @ 9 am., KSC; Helper to prepare settlement documents; if a stipulation for dismissal is not filed, the court will retain jurisdiction and issue an order of dismissal; all other dates vacated; settlement conference held 10/21/05 ; status conference set for 9:00 12/12/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C5F 9-2:19) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
      LREF
      Blank 120 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
      OBJECTIONS by plaintiff to defendant's supplemental jury instructions; certificate of service [108-1] (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 119 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO : Settlement Conference set for Friday, October 21, 2005@9:00 a.m. before Judge Chang. Plaintiff's Counsel is to provide Defendant's Counsel with a Demand Amount by October 19, 2005 by 4:30 p.m. Settlement Conference statements to be submitted to Judge Chang's Chambers by October 20, 2005 by noon. cc: All Counsel of Record by Fax ;Settlement conference set for 9:00 10/21/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 118 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO : ; Settlement conference set for 9:00 AM 10/21/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; Leslie Sai to notify all parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 117 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Jury Instructions
            Parties' JOINT proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS (sterile) (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 116 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Jury Instructions
              Parties' JOINT proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 115 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                Plaintiff's proposed CONCISE STATEMENT of the case (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 114 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Special Verdict Form
                  Plaintiff's PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 113 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Jury Instructions
                    Plaintiff's supplemental proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS (sterile); certificate of service (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 112 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Jury Instructions
                      Plaintiff's supplemental proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS; certificate of service (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 111 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in opposition defendant's objections to plaintiff's designation of witness testimony; certificate of service [88-1] (lmg)
                          LREF
                          Blank 110 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          MEMORANDUM by plaintiff's in opposition to defendant's motion in limine to preclude the testimony of Damon Martin [90-1]; the testimony of Damon Martin; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; exhibits A-B; certificate of service (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 109 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Jury Instructions
                            Proposed Supplemental JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated Version) submitted by defendant Gordon R. England (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 108 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Jury Instructions
                              Proposed Supplemental JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Clean Version) submitted by defendant Gordon R. England; certificate of service (gab)
                                LREF
                                Blank 107 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                OBJECTIONS by defendant Gordon R. England to Plaintiff's proposed exhibits; certificate of service (gab)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 106 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  Defendant's MEMORANDUM in opposition to plaintiff's motions in limine to (1) admit evidence regarding workforce composition of the office of general counsel; and (2) to admit graphs reflecting the office of general counsel's workforce; and (3) to admit evidence regarding the promotional history of the office of general counsel; declaration of Dr. Julie Frizell; certificate of service [87-1][84-1] (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 105 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                    Defendant's counter DESIGNATION of deposition testimony; certificate of service (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 104 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                      Defendant's proposed CONCISE STATEMENT of the case; certificate of service [1-1] (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 103 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Defendant's MEMORANDUM in opposition to plaintiff's motion in limine to exclude the oral testimony of Capt Gigette Caldwell; certificate of service [84-1] (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 102 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Jury Verdict
                                          Defendant's proposed SPECIAL VERDICT FORM; certificate of service (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 101 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Trial Brief
                                            Defendant's TRIAL brief; certificate of service (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 100 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                              Defendant's OBJECTIONS to plaintiff's designation of witness testimony; certificate of service [82-1] (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 99 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                Defendant's PROPOSED SPECIAL VOIR DIRE questions; certificate of serivce (lmg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  EO : On April 29, 2005 a Notice of Hearing setting Hearing on Motions' in Limine, PreTrial Conference and a new Jury Selection/Jury Trial Date of November 01, 2005 was issued by this Court. This notice did not contain new Trial related Deadlines. Listed below are Trial Related Deadlines as to the Trial Date of November 01, 2005- Motions in Limine on behalf of the Plaintiff and Defendant were filed on April 26, 2005 and April 27, 2005. Opposition to Filed Motions in Limine to be filed by October 11, 2005. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by October 18, 2005 Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by October 4, 2005. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by October 11, 2005. File objections to the Exhibits by October 18, 2005. File Deposition Excerpr Designations by October 11, 2005. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by October 18, 2005. File Trial Brief by October 18, 2005. Please note-PreTrial Statements on behalf of the Plaintiff (filed-3/29/05) and the Defendant (filed 3/28/05), Witness Lists on behalf of the Plaintiff (filed-4/26/05) and the Defendant (filed 4/26/05) and Plaintiff's Designation of deposition transcript (filed 4/26/05). Jury Information Cards are to be ordered from the Jury Clerk by calling 541-3115 by October 25, 2005. Trial Exhibits are to be placed in a Three Ring Binder and Tabbed. The Court is requesting the Original and 2 Copies of the Trial Exhibits. Counsel are to provide the Judge's and LawClerk's Copy by October 25, 2005. Please call Leslie Sai, Courtroom Manager at 541-3089 to drop off these Exhibits. cc: All Counsel of Record ; Jury selection/Trial date of 11/1/05 was issued by the court () JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Trial Brief
                                                    Plaintiff's TRIAL brief; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defendant's motion in limine to bar plaintiff from testifying about matters based on hearsay, not her personal knowledge; certificate of service [89-1] (lmg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE of hearing setting hearing: 1) pretrial conference, 2) plaintiff's motion in limine and defendant's motions in limine 3) jury selection and jury trial; setting new hearings on motion in limine to admit evidence of regarding workforce composition of the office of general counsel [83-1] 10:00 10/27/05 ACK, setting hearing on motion in limine to preclude the testimony of Damon Martin [90-1] 10:00 10/27/05 ACK, setting hearing on motion in limine to bar plaintiff from testifying about matters based on hearsay, not her personal knowledge [89-1] 10:00 10/27/05 ACK, setting hearing on motion in limine to graphs reflecting the office of general counsel's workforce [87-1] 10:00 10/27/05 ACK, setting hearing on motion in limine to admit evidence of regarding the metrics of the NAVSUP field offices [86-1] 10:00 10/27/05 ACK, setting hearing on motion in limine to admit evidence of regarding the promotional history of the office of general counsel [85-1] 10:00 10/27/05 ACK setting hearing on motion in limine to exclude the oral testimony of Capt Gigette Caldwell [84-1] 10:00 10/27/05 ACK ; Jury selection/jury trial set for 9:00 11/1/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; pretrial conference set for 10:00 10/27/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (cc: Clayton Ikei, Esq., Thomas Helper, Esq., AUSA) (lmg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff's in limine to admit evidence of regarding workforce composition of the office of general counsel ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Eric C. Schmidt; certificate of service - set for 9:00 AM 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Witness List
                                                                  WITNESS list submitted by defendant's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant's in limine to preclude the testimony of Damon Martin ; memorandum in support of defendant's motion in limine preclude the testimony of Damon Martin; declaration of Thomas A. Helper; exhibit A; certificate of service - set for 9:00 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant's in limine to bar plaintiff from testifying about matters based on hearsay, not her personal knowledge ; memorandum in support of defendant's motion in limine to bar plaintiff from testifying about matters based on hearsay, not her personal knowledge; certificate of service - set for 9:00 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                        Plaintiff's DESIGNATION of deposition transcript; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff's in limine to admit graphs reflecting the office of general counsel's workforce ; declaration of Eric C. Schmidt; certificate of service - set for 9:00 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff's in limine to admit evidence of regarding the metrics of the NAVSUP field offices ; memorandum of law in support of motion; certificate of service- set for 9:00 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff's in limine to admit evidence of regarding the promotional history of the office of general counsel ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Eric C. Schmidt; certificate of service - set for 9:00 AM 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff's in limine to exclude the oral testimony of Capt Gigette Caldwell ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; exhibit A; certificate of service - set for 9:00 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Witness List
                                                                                  Plaintiff's final comprehensive WITNESS list; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Supplement
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT by plaintiff's to her final pretrial statement; certificate of service [75-1] (lmg)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                      EP : ;Further settlement conference; settlement held; no settlement ( Ct Rptr : In chambers - no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        EP : Further Settlement Conference-Court and Counsel discussed Settlement of this Action. No Settlement at this time. Further Settlement Conference on call; further settlement conference on call M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : none) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          EO : ;Continued: further settlement conference from 04/04/05 3:30 PM to 10:00 AM 4/5/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; parties notified ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                            EO : ;Further settlement conference set for 3:30 PM 4/4/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; Tom Helper to notify all parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                              EP : Settlement Conference/Final PreTrial Conference-Court and Counsel discussed Settlement. Further Settlement Conference continued to April 01, 2005 @2:30 p.m. before this Court. The Final PreTrial Conference was not held. ; further settlement conference continued to 2:30pm 4/1/05 before this court ( Ct Rptr : None) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                Plaintiff' Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Elizabeth Rivera (gs)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                  PRETRIAL STATEMENT; certificate of service - by defendant Gordon R. England (afc)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Amended rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                      EO : Court to prepare an amended scheduling order; ;Jury Trial set for 9:00 court to prepare an Amended Scheduling Order. 1. Jury trial on May 17, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on March 30, 2005 @ 3 p.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by March 29, 2005 5. 6. 7. 8a. File Motions in Limine by April 26, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by May 3, 2005 11a. 11b. 12. Discovery deadline March 18, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for March 30, 2005 at 3 p.m. before BMK. 14. Settlement Conference statements by March 29, 2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by May 3, 2005 21. File Final witness list by April 26, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 19, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by April 26, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by May 3, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by April 26, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by May 3, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by May 3, 2005 30. cc: Tammy Kimura 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; final pretrial conference set for 3:00 3/30/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; settlement conference set for 3:00 3/30/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Discovery ddl set for 3/18/05 ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment [42-1] (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                          EP : Defendant Secretary of the Navy's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Timely Exhaust Administrative Remedies and Motion for Summary Judgment: Arguments made. Defendant Secretary of the Navy's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Timely Exhaust Administrative Remedies and Motion for Summary Judgment taken under advisement. Court to issue written ruling. taking under advisement on the motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and for summary judgment [42-1] ( Ct Rptr : ESR (B.B.)) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                            EO : ; Settlement conference continued from 2/7/05 to 3:00 p.m. 3/30/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; final pretrial conference moved from 4/05/05 to 3:00 p.m. 3/30/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; notified: Clayton C. Ikei, Thomas Helper ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              EO : ;Continued settlement conference from 12/17/04 10:00 AM to set for 2:00 PM 2/7/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; confidential statements due 01/31/05; Chang to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                Defendant's REPLY to plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment [42-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to continue hearing date of defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment filed on July 7, 2004 and filing date July 7, 2004 and filing date of defendant's reply memorandum; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - approved and so ordered - re [42-1] 9:30 2/14/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by plaintiff's in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [42-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's SEPARATE CONCISE STATEMENT of facts in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment filed July 7, 2004; declaration of Elizabeth Rivera; declaration of Clayton C. Ikei; declaration of Eric C. Schmidt; exhibits A-JJ; certificate of service [42-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        EO :Continued defendant Secretary of the Navy's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment [42-1] from 12/06/04 10:30 AM to 02/14/05 9:30 AM before ACK; Clayton Ikei to prepare stipulation ( Ct Rptr : CRT Reporter needed) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to continue hearing date of defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment filed on July 7, 2004 and trial; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - approved and so ordered, the new defendant's motion [42-1] set for 10:30 12/6/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay; ; Jury trial set for 9:00 5/17/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay - on behalf of plaintiff (sealed)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    EO : ;Final pretrial conference continued from 10/26/04 9:00 AM to 4/5/05 9:00 AM before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; settlement conference continued from 09/20/04 2:00 PM to 12/17/04 10:00 AM before Mag Judge Barry Kurren ; cc: Clayton Ikei, Thomas Helper ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery on her second request for Answers to Interrogatories by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren re [54-1] (gs)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Compliance and Sanctions on the Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren re [54-1] (gs)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004, Terminated: 8/25/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          EP : Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery on Her Second Request for Answers to Interrogatories - DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Compliance and Sanctions on the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery Filed March 29, 2004 set for 08/13/2004 - GRANTED. Helper to inquire if information can be obtained. Request for sanctions denied. Helper to prepare order. denying motion to compel discovery on her second request for answers to interrogatories [40-1] granting motion to enforce compliance and sanctions on the order granting in part and denying in part, without prejudice, plaintiff's second motion to compel discovery filed March 29, 2004 [41-1] ( Ct Rptr : C6 CD 9 2:03-2:11) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to continue hearing date of defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment filed on July 7, 2004 [42-1]; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - hearing set for 9:30 11/1/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              EO :Continued: [Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery on Her Second Request for Answers to Interrogatories and Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Compliance and Sanctions on the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery Filed March 29, 2004] from 08/06/2004 02:00:00 PM to 08/13/2004 02:00:00 PM before BMK. setting hearing on motion to compel discovery on her second request for answers to interrogatories re [40-1] re [41-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                EO : Defendant Secretary of the Navy's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Timely Exhaust Administrative Remedies and Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for hearing on Tuesday, September 7, 2004 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Alan C. Kay, continued to Monday, November 1, 2004 at 9:30 a.m. Clayton Ikei to prepapre Stipulation. setting hearing on motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment [42-1] 9:30 11/1/04 ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Reply MEMORANDUM in support of her motion to enforce compliance and sanctions on the order granting in part and denying in part, without prejudice, plaintiff's second motion to compel discovery filed March 29, 2004; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service [41-1] (gs)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Reply MEMORANDUM in support of motion to compel discovery on her second request for to interrogatories; Certificate of Service [40-1] (gs)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      defendant Gordon R. England's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel discovery on her second request for to interrogatories [40-1]; exhibit a; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        defendant Gordon R. England's opposition to plaintiff's motion to enforce compliance and sanctions on the order granting in part and denying in part, without prejudice, plaintiff's second motion to compel discovery filed March 29, 2004 [41-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of defendant's non-opposition to plaintiff's motion to extend the deadline to submit her memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment by forty five (45) days; certificate of service [45-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of defendant' motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment [42-1] previously set for 08/30/04 9:30am is now set for 9/7/04 9:30am before the Honorable Alan C. Kay (cc: Clayton Ikei, Esq., AUSA Mark J. Mellett) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                              Table of CONTENTS and table of authorities to memorandum in support of defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment filed July 7, 2004 [42-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                CONCISE STATEMENT in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment; exhibits A through N; certificate of service [42-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004, Terminated: 2/17/2005 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION; defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust administrative remedies and motion for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to timely exhaust adminstrative remedies and motion for summary judgment; certification re: word count; certificate of service - set for 9:30 8/30/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004, Terminated: 7/23/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION; plaintiff's motion to enforce compliance and sanctions on the order granting in part and denying in part, without prejudice, plaintiff's second motion to compel discovery filed March 29, 2004 ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; exhibits A-B; certificate of compliance of local rule 37.1; certificate of service - set for 2:00 8/6/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004, Terminated: 8/4/2004 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION; plaintiff's motion to compel discovery on her second request for answers to interrogatories ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; exhibits A-B; certificate of compliance of local rule 37.1; certificate of service - set for 2:00 8/6/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of plaintiff and defendant to allow production of certain documents; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : re [36-1] - on behalf of the defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Hansford T. Johnson (sm)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren granting in part and denying in part, without prejudice, plaintiff's second motion to compel discovery [30-1] - on behalf of plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                EP : Plaintiff's second motion to compel discovery granted in part [30-1]; Chang to prepare order ( Ct Rptr : C6 CD 3 1:56-2:16) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's REPLY memorandum to her second to motion to compel discovery [30-1]; exhibits A and B; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION by defendant to plaintiff's second motion to compel discovery; exhibits A and B; certificate of service [30-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004, Terminated: 3/29/2004 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and SECOND MOTION by plaintiff to compel discovery ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; exhibits A - G; certificate of compliance of LR 37.1; certificate of service - set for 2:00 3/19/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren denying plaintiff's motion to compel discovery [20-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                EP : Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery DENIED w/o prejudice. Pltf did not comply with the meet and confer rule prior to filing this motion. Parties to meet and confer on remaining disputes. Mellett to prepare order. denying motion to compel discovery [20-1] ( Ct Rptr : C6 tape 1486) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to continue the trial date and all related deadlines and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : Jury trial set for 9:00 12/7/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay , final pretrial conference set for 9:00 10/26/04 ; Discovery ddl set for 7/7/04 ; Motion filing ddl set for 10/8/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 9/20/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of plaintiff and defendant to allow production of certain documents; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - filed by deft (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiff to plaintiff's motion to compel discovery [20-1]; certificate of service (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/4/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to plaintiff's motion to compel discovery [20-1]; certificate of service - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER for information protected under the privacy act by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - it is hereby ordered, adjudged and decreed - on behalf of plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            EP : Discovery conference - re deposition ; Ikei to prepare protective order ( Ct Rptr : C6 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003, Terminated: 11/21/2003 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION; plaintiff's motion to compel discovery ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; exhibits A-C; certificate of compliance of local rule 37.1; certificate of service - set for 2:00 11/21/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to extend dispositive motions deadline; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - the new dispositive motion deadline is 11/14/03; all other dates, including the scheduled trial date, remain the same - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Elizabeth Rivera (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Hansford T. Johnson (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Elizabeth Rivera (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Jury trial set for 9:00 3/16/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay; Final pretrial conference set for 9:00 2/3/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP : EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on March 16, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on February 3, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by January 27, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 14, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 17, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 15, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by February 24, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by March 2, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 15, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 15, 2003 12. Discovery deadline January 16, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for January 13, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by January 6, 2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by March 2, 2004 21. File Final witness list by February 24, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 17, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by February 24, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by March 2, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by February 24, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by March 2, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by March 2, 2004 Other: The government will file a Motion to Change Venue by 8-4-03. ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 3/16/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 2/3/04 ; settlement conference set for 2:00 1/13/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; file dispositive motions by 10/15/03 ; Discovery ddl 1/16/04 ( Ct Rptr C7 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO :Continued: rule 16 scheduling conference from 06/27/03 9:00AM to 07/02/03 9:00 AM before BMK ; notified: Jerry Chang's secretary, and Mark Millett ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of defendant Hansford T. Johnson; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by Federal defendant Hansford T. Johnson to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EO :Continued: rule 16 scheduling conference from 06/23/03 9:00 AM to 9:00 AM 6/27/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Clayton Ikei to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Hansford T. Johnson thru United States Attorney thru Stephen Lehto, clerk, authorized agent on 4/3/03 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 6/23/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief and damages; demand for jury trial; summons (issued) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 214821 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?