Funai v. Brownlee, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00160-ACK-BMK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joyce R. Funai, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clayton C. Ikei +5333 533 533 3777 CCIOffice@hawaii.rr.com
v.
No Logo R. L. Brownlee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 4/7/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Jury Verdict
County Honolulu
Terminated 9/1/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (141) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 131 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 USCA Order
CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: voluntarily dismissing the appeal [126-1] (emt)
    LREF
    Blank 130 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Miscellaneous Document
    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL without prejudice plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and nontaxable expenses [107-1]; certificate of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (emt)
      LREF
      Blank 129 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO :Subject to the finalization of the settlement agreement, Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Nontaxable Expenses, filed 9-14-04, is withdrawn per Attorney Jerry Chang. [107-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (emt)
        LREF
        Blank 128 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
        APPEAL number 5-15161 received from 9CCA regarding [126-1] (gs)
          LREF
          Blank 127 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Designation of Record on Appeal
          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form : re [126-1] Defendant has already ordered and obtained copies of witness trial testimony and does not presently intend to order any additional portions of transcripts. (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 126 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005, Terminated: 5/5/2005 Appeal - Miscellaneous
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant R. L. Brownlee from Dist. Court decision, [105-2]; representation statement; certificate of service (cc: all counsel) (gab)
              LREF
              Blank 125 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for Post Verdict relief [106-1] (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 124 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                JUDGMENT In A Civil Case: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff as to Count II of her complaint pursuant to the, "Order Denying Defendant's Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law and Denying Defendant's Alternative Motion For New Trial", by the Honorable Senior U.S. District Judge Alan C. Kay, and filed on, November 23, 2004 re [123-1] by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk, by G. Santos, Deputy (gs)
                  LREF
                  Blank 123 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004, Terminated: 11/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay Denying Defendant's Motion for judgment as a matter of law and Denying Defendant's alternative Motion for New Trial [109-1] (gs)
                    LREF
                    Blank 121 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Original Signature submitted
                    SUBMISSION by plaintiff of original trial exhibit 3B; exhibit 3B; certificate of service (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 122 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP: Settlement Conference (Attorneys' Fees) - held; Parties close to settlement; will call the court in two days re settlement before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (Ct Rptr: no record) by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                        LREF
                        Blank 119 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                        NOTICE of hearing settlement conference (Attorney's Fees) continued from 11/10/04 to 11:00 11/17/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Costs Taxed
                          COSTS taxed for plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in the amount of $ 10,390.72 against defendant R. L. Brownlee (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 118 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            Reply MEMORANDUM by defendant R. L. Brownlee in support of Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law on count II, or in the alternative, for a new trial on count II [109-1] (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 117 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              EP : Status Conference Re Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees held. Helper to submit an informal opposition to the Motion for Attorneys' Fees by 10-25-04. Court stayed the government's time to file a formal opposition. Ikei to submit an informal reply by 11-1-04. settlement conference set for 10:30 11/10/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Transcript
                                ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 08/27/2004 pp.51 (bbb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Transcript
                                  ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 08/26/2004 pp. 86 (bbb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Transcript
                                    ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 08/25/2004 pp. 141 (bbb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Transcript
                                      ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 08/24/2004 pp. 174 (bbb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Transcript
                                        ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 08/19/2004 pp. 179 (bbb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Transcript
                                          ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 08/18/2004 pp. 196 (bbb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Transcript
                                            ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 08/17/2004 pp.53 (bbb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 116 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Description not available
                                              BILL OF COSTS submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai re [105-2] (gab)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 115 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                Amended CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in opposition to Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law on count II, or in the alternative, for a new trial [109-1] exhibits 13, 25, 26, and 36; declaration of Clayton C. Ikei; certificate of service (gab)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM by defendant R. L. Brownlee in partial opposition to Plaintiff's motion for Post Trial relief [106-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      Amended CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Reply
                                                        plaintiff Joyce R. Funai's statement of consultation as to her motion for attorneys' fees and nontaxable expenses [107-1] (gab)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          EO : status conference re Plaintiff's motion for Attorneys' fees set for 10:00 10/13/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of LawCourt Filing
                                                            MOTION by defendant R. L. Brownlee for judgment as a matter of law on count II, or in the alternative, for a new trial on count II table of contents; table of authorities; memorandum in support of defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law on count II, or in the alternative, for a new trial on count II; certificate of compliance; certificate of service; before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay referring to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren the motion for attorneys' fees and nontaxable expenses [107-1] (gab)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai for attorneys' fees and nontaxable expenses memorandum of law in support of motion; declarations of Clayton C. Ikei; Jerry P.S. Chang; Eric C. Schmidt; Michael F. Nauyokas, and Elbridge W. Smith; exhibits A to L; certificate of service before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004, Terminated: 11/29/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai for Post Verdict relief before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Judgment*
                                                                    JUDGMENT: by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/gb that Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $110,000.00 re [104-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Jury Verdict
                                                                      Special VERDICT Form - for plaintiff Joyce R. Funai against defendant R. L. Brownlee as to Count 2 - $110,000.00 for Emotional Pain and Suffering caused by defendant's conduct (gab) Modified on 09/01/2004
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        EP : Further Jury Deliberation: Jury returned at 9:00 a.m. to resume further deliberation. Jury returned with verdict at 3:55 p.m. Verdict in favor of plaintiff. Jury polled. Verdict unanimous. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          STIPULATED Protective ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay : (gab)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                            JURY INSTRUCTIONS (gab)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Jury Notes
                                                                              JURY NOTES 3:00 p.m. & response from the Court (gab)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                EP : Jury Trial: 8th day Plaintiff presented opening argument. Defendant presented closing argument. Plaintiff presented closing argument. Jury instructions read to the jury. Jury retired to deliberate (1:40 p.m.) 3:50 p.m. Hearing held without the presence of the jury regarding "Note From The Jury" #1. Courts response attached. Further jury deliberation continued to Tuesday, August 31, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ( Ct Rptr : Steve Platt 9:00-12:00 / Cynthia Fazio 1:00 - 1:40 p.m. / Steve Platt: 3:50 - 3:55 p.m.) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  EP : Jury Trial: 7th day Defendant rest. Plaintiff called no rebuttal witnesses. Exhibits Admitted: Plaintiffs - 2. Defendants Rule 50B motion argued and DENIED. Plaintiffs Rule 50A motion argued and DENIED. Settling of jury instructions - 2:00 - Further jury trial continued to Monday, August 30, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    EP : Jury Trial: 6th day Further viewing of videotape of Laurel Waters. Videotaped deposition of Juan Caires viewed. Videotaped deposition of Jacqueline Boyce viewed. CST: William Kalilikane, Jr. Barbara Kula Stanley Alama Mark Motokane Exhibits Admitted: Defendants - 225A, 225B, 226A, 227A. Further trial continued to Friday, August 27, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                      Amended DESIGNATION of Deposition testimony of Juan Carias by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                        Amended DESIGNATION of Deposition Testimony of Jacqueline Boyce by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant R. L. Brownlee (gab)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                            EP : Jury Trial: 5th day Further cross-examination of David Poppert by Mr. Ikei. CST: Joel Tanaka Katherine Auxer Linda McBain Videotaped deposition of Laurel Waters viewed. Exhibits Admitted: Defendants - 216. Further trial continued to Thursday, August 26, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant R. L. Brownlee to compel Plaintiff to make attorney Jerry S. Chang available for deposition and trial testimony exhibits A and B; certificate of service; before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                EP : Jury Trial: 4th day Further direct examination of Joyce Funai by Mr. Ikei; cross-examination by Mr. Helper. CST: Michael Bressen, Ph.D Plaintiff rest. Defendants motion for Rule 50 argued and DENIED. Exhibits Admitted: Plaintiff - 9. Defendant - 223. CST: David Poppert Further trial continued to Wednesday, August 25, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Transcript
                                                                                                  ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Tando Fazio) taken on 8/18/04 (gab)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in opposition to Defendant's motion for order directing Plaintiff not to use her religion to bolster her credibility [89-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant R. L. Brownlee for order directing Plaintiff not to use her religion to bolster her credibility memorandum in support of motion for order directing plaintiff not to use her religion to bolster her credibility; certifiate of service; before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                        EP :Jury Trial: 3rd day CST: Lt. Col David Gilbertson (Defendants witness taken out of order to accommodate his schedule) CST: Debra Amaral Richard Cummings Joyce Funai Exhibits Admitted: Defendants - 207, 208, 210. Further trial continued to Tuesday, August 24, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                          EP :Jury Trial: 2nd day Further cross-examination of Sharon Amoy by Mr. Helper, redirect by Mr. Ikei. CST: Shirley Okamoto Esperidion Cortel Joselyn Sanders Exhibits Admitted by Stipulation: Plaintiffs: 1, 3A, 3B, 4, 5, 6, 7,10, 11, 12, 13, 16, 17, 19, 20, 21, 23, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31, 32, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38. Defendants: 203, 204, 212, 214, 215, 219. Further trial continued to Thursday, August 19, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (sealed)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                            EP :Jury Trial: 1st day 37 jurors present for selection. 8 jurors selected. Jurors sworn. Preliminary instructions given by Court. Plaintiff presented opening statements. Defendant presented opening statements. CST: Sharon Amoy Further trial continued to Wednesday, August 18, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. ; Jury trial held 8/17/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay , , ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                              Concise Argument by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in support of her proposed supplemental jury instructions [69-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of law by defendant R. L. Brownlee in support of proposed jury instructions; certificate of service [79-1] [78-1] (sealed)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER on Motions in Limine by Judge Alan C. Kay granting motion in limine to exclude any evidence of race, national origin, and gender discrimination; [56-1], denying motion in limine to exlude evidence of coworkers' expressions of discomfort with plaintiff's religious beliefs [53-1], denying motion in limine to exlude evidence regarding Plaintiff's attempts to have her days off changed so that she could attend church [52-1] (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    EP 1) Pretrial Conference 2) Motions in Limine: Defendant's Motion to Exclude All Evidence Of Race, National Origin, And Gender Discrimination - GRANTED. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Evidence Of Coworkers' Expressions of Discomfort With Plaintiff's Religious Beliefs - DENIED. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Attempts to Have Her Days Off Changed So That She Could Attend Church - DENIED. Discussion held regarding voir dire questions, jury instructions. Parties informed the Court that they do not have any evidentiary problems. Plaintiff to call approximately 11 witnesses. Defendant's 2 days. Trial to take approximately 7-8 days. :granting motion in limine to exclude any evidence of race, national origin, and gender discrimination; [56-1], denying motion in limine to exlude evidence of coworkers' expressions of discomfort with plaintiff's religious [53-1], denying motion in limine to exlude evidence regarding Plaintiff's attempts to have her days off changed so that she could attend church [52-1] ( Ct Rptr : ESR (lg)) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay - Clayton Ikei and Thomas Helper present. (sm)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                      Defendant's OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Proposed Supplemental Jury Instructions; Certificate of Service by defendant R. L. Brownlee to [69-1] (gs)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Proposed Supplemental Jury Instructions; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai to [79-1], to [78-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                          Proposed Supplemental JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated Version) submitted by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                            Proposed Supplemental JURY Instructions (Clean Version) by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab) Modified on 08/09/2004
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                              PROPOSED VOIR DIRE Questions submitted by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                Agreed Concise STATEMENT of the case by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                  TRIAL brief submitted by defendant R. L. Brownlee, Secretary of the Army; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS by defendant R. L. Brownlee to Plaintiff's designation of deposition testimony; exhibits A and B; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Special Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                      Defendant's PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM by defendant R. L. Brownlee (Supplemental to Agreed Special Verdict Form); certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by defendant R. L. Brownlee to Second Amended Complaint [48-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Special Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                          Parties Joint PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                            TRIAL brief submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Proposed Supplemental JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Sterile); certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                Parties' Joint Proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Sterile) submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Special Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Supplement to the parties Joint PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in opposition to Defendant's motion in limine to exlude evidence regarding Plaintiff's attempts to have her days off changed so that she could attend church [52-1]; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; exhibit A; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in opposition to Defendant's motion in limine to exlude evidence of coworkers' expressions of discomfort with plaintiff's religious beliefs [53-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Supplemental JURY INSTRUCTIONS submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                          Parties' Joint Proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant R. L. Brownlee (gab)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                              Second Supplemental Final Comprehensive WITNESS list submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                plaintiff Joyce R. Funai's statement of no opposition to Defendant's motion in limine to exclude any evidence of race, national origin and gender discrimination [56-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Final Comprehensive WITNESS list submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                    WITNESS list submitted by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                      DESIGNATION of of Deposition testimony of Laurel Waters by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004, Terminated: 8/13/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant R. L. Brownlee in limine to exclude any evidence of race, national origin, and gender discrimination; certificate of service; set for 10:00 8/12/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION of Deposition testimony of Jacqueline Boyce by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                            DESIGNATION of Deposition Testimony of Juan Carias by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant R. L. Brownlee in limine to exlude evidence of coworkers' expressions of discomfort with plaintiff's religious beliefs exhibits A and B; certificate of service; set for 10:00 8/12/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant R. L. Brownlee in limine to exlude evidence regarding Plaintiff's attempts to have her days off changed so that she could attend church memorandum in support; exhibit A; certificate of service; set for 10:00 8/12/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION of Deposition Transcripts by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                    Final Comprehensive WITNESS list submitted by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief and damages [37-1] by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; demand for jury trial; summons (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Evidentiary STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay Regarding Proceedings before the Merit Systems Protection Board (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION by Judge Alan C. Kay Regarding Admissibility of Trial Exhibits; Order (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of hearing 1) final pretrial conference 2) Motions in Limine set for 10:00 8/12/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to amend scheduling order; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  EP: Settlement Conference held. ; settlement/status conference held 6/24/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL STATEMENT by defendant R. L. Brownlee; certificate of service (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by USM of Subpoena w/attachments (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay Granting Defendant's motion for Partial Dismissal and Denying Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO : Settlement Conference and Final Pretrial Conference continued from 6-16-04 to 6-24-04 @ 2 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages [1-1] by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; demand for jury trial; summons (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO : settlement conference continued from 6/7/04 to 10:00 6/16/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Confidential Settlement Conference statements due 6/14/04; Final Pretrial Conference moved from 7/7/04 to 6/16/04 @ 10 a.m. BMK. Pretrial Statements due 6/14/04 ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EO : settlement conference continued from 6/7/2004 2:00 p.m. to 10:00 6/16/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Confidential Settlement Conference Statements due 6/14/2004. Notified: Clayton Ikei and Thomas Helper. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP : Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal and for Partial Summary Judgment: Arguments made. Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal and for Partial Summary Judgment. Court will allow Mr. Ikei to file a amended complaint within 10 days from today. Count 2 DISMISSED without prejudice. Motion for Partial Dismissal of Count 3 DENIED. Court to prepare Order. [24-1] ( Ct Rptr : Steve Platt) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE of Subpoena w/attachments served uponJacqueline Boyce by USM on 5/14/04 (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant R. L. Brownlee (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY Brief by defendant R.L. Brownlee in support of defendant's motion for partial Dismissal and partial summary judgment [24-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in opposition to Defendant's motion for partial dismissal and partial summary judgment [24-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Separate and Concise STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai in opposition to Defendant's motion for partial dismissal and partial summary judgment [24-1]; declaration of Clayton C. Ikei; exhibits A to BB; certificate of service (SEALED) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai to file under seal her separate and concise statement of facts and attached exhibits in opposition to defendant's motion for partial dismissal and partial summary judgment; declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on motion for partial dismissal and partial summary judgment [24-1] continued from 5/17/04 to 10:30 5/24/04 before the Honorable Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Concise STATEMENT of Uncontested facts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by defendant Thomas E. White [24-1]; Declaration of Thomas A. Helper; Exhibits 1-3; Certificate of Compliance; Certificate of Service (sm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 5/24/2004 Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant for partial dismissal and partial summary judgment ; table of contents; table of authorities; memorandum in support of defendant's motion; certificate of service - set for 10:30 5/17/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Thomas E. White (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Thomas E. White (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Thomas E. White (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Thomas E. White (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Protective ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren as to Disclosure of Information Protected by the Privacy Act (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare order. 1. Jury trial on August 17, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on July 7, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by June 30, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by January 16, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by May 19, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by March 17, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by July 27, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by August 3, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by February 16, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 17, 2004 12. Discovery deadline June 18, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for June 7, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by June 1, 2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by August 3, 2004 21. File Final witness list by July 27, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by July 20, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by July 27, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by August 3, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by July 27, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by August 3, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by August 3, 2004 30. ; rule 16 conference held on 9:00 7/21/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 8/17/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Pretrial conference set for 9:00 7/7/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 6/7/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; ddl set for 6/18/04 ; Motion filing ddl set for 3/17/04 ( Ct Rptr : C6 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Thomas E. White certificate of service (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff Joyce R. Funai (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by defendant R.L. Brownlee [1-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 7/7/2003 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 7/21/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Clayton Ikei to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Thomas E. White on 4/10/03 (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/7/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages; Demand for Jury Trial; (Summons(es) issued) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 214961 (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?