Roman v. Aloha Airlines Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00188-SPK-LEK
District Judge SAMUEL P KING, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roderick Roman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E.H. Tagupa +2247 278 988 2897
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
No Logo Rollins Asato, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 4/23/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Honolulu
Terminated 9/17/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV03-1-0640-03[Circuit Ct 1st Cir]
Def Custody Status
Flags REMAND, TERMED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice as to all claims against defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Rollins Asato and ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King : dismissing case , terminating case - pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) and 41(a)(2) FRCP; with each of the parties to bear its own fees, costs and expenses of suit, there are no remaining parties and/or issues (fe)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Transmittal of Documents
    TRANSMITTAL of documents: certified copy of case docket, Docket #9 and #10 mailed to Circuit Court of the First Circuit (letter cc'd to all counsel) (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by David Alan Ezra for Judge Samuel P. King adopting Magistrate's FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION [9-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003, Terminated: 9/17/2003 Findings and RecommendationsCourt Filing
        FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION grantin motion to remand complaint [4-1] by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: counsel) (fe)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO :Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 07/21/2003 09:00:00 AM to 09/22/2003 09:00:00 AM before LEK. Parties notified via conference call. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 9/22/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc in opposition to plaintiff's motion to remand complaint [4-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibit a; declaration of Michael J. Conroy; exhibit b; certificate of service (fe)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EO : Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint filed on 5/20/03 was referred by Judge Samuel P. King to Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi for consideration on 5/20/03. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint will be considered by Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi as a Non Hearing Motion. Memorandum in Opposition is due 6/4/03. Reply Memorandum is due 6/18/03. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint will be taken under advisement by Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi thereafter. re [4-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King referring to Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi the motion to remand complaint [4-1] (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Motion to RemandCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Roderick Roman to remand complaint ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - referred to Judge Samuel P. King (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Answer
                    ANSWER by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc to plaintiff's complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/21/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Notice of Removal
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.; exhibit a; certificate of service - from Circuit Ct 1st Circuit Case Number: CV 03-1-0640-03 (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Filing Fee Received
                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 215398 (fe)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 135 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?