Parrilla v. Aloha Airlines Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00202-SOM-LEK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Luis Parrilla, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ivey Fosbinder Fosbinder LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James H. Fosbinder +1 808 242 4956 +1 808 249 0668 jfosbinder@iff-law.com
Space Rhonda M. Fosbinder +1 808 242 4956 +1 808 249 0668 rfosbinder@iff-law.cm
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
No Logo Does 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Elden Loeffelholz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/1/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 8/23/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 104 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Judgment*
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/A.F. Chang, Deputy Clerk - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS ENTERED in favor of Defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Defendant Elden Loeffelhoz and against Plaintiff Luis Parilla, pursuant to the "Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment" filed on March 19, 2004, and pursuant to the "Order Amending March 19, 2004, Order; Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed on June 18, 2004." terminating case (cc: all counsel) (afc)
    LREF
    Blank 103 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER AMENDING March 19, 2004, ORDER; ORDER granting defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed on June 18, 2004 by Judge Susan Oki Mollway - [court modifies analysis but not the result set forth in the order filed on 03/19/04, and grants SJ in favor of Aloha Airlines on the remaining claims. Clerk to enter judgment in favor of both defendants and to close case] [33-1] [95-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
      LREF
      Blank 102 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP : Defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s Liability on Count I-Oral Argument Held. This Motion is hereby taken under submission. Court will issue a Ruling by Written Order sometime next week; taking under advisement on the motion for summary judgment on defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s liability on count 1 [95-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 101 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s in support of motion for summary judgment on defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s liability on count 1, filed June 18 2004 [95-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 100 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Description not available
          DECLARATION of James H. Fosbinder in support of opposition to defendant Aloha Airlines' motion for summary judgment on count 1; exhibits 1-5; certificate of service [95-1] - on behalf of plaintiff (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 99 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Miscellaneous Document
            Plaintiff's STATEMENT of genuine issues in opposition to defendants Aloha Airlines' motion for summary judgment on count 1; certificate of service [95-1] (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 98 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM by plaintiff's in opposition to defendant Aloha Airlines' motion for summary judgment on count 1 [95-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 97 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Description not available
                Submission of original DECLARATION of Yvonne Boissoneau in support of defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s concise statement of facts in support of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment on defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s liability on count 1, filed June 18, 2004 [95-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 96 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                  Concise STATEMENT of facts in support of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment on defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s liability on count 1; declaration of counsel; exhibits A through C; declaration of Jayson Omura; certificate of service [95-1] (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 95 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment on defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s liability on count 1 ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 10:30 8/9/04 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 94 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EO: All motions in limine are deemed withdrawn and will be considered by the court before the new trial only if counsel submit new notices of hearing of those motions. Only new notices of hearing are necessary; counsel need not refile the actual motions, memo, exhibits, etc. cc: Rhonda Fosbinder, Roman Amaguin, and Judge Mollway's Chambers. :withdrawing motion in limine to exclude evidence regarding second, fourth, sixth, eight, and ninth affirmative defenses [57-1], withdrawing motion in limine exclude defense exhibits 202-204 and 207-208 and related testimony [56-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude defendants' evidence not disclosed in discovery [55-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude reference to and admission of police report [53-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude documents never produced to defendant [52-1], withdrawing motion in limine to amend case caption and delete Elden Loeffelholz as named defendant [51-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude witnesses insufficiently identified by plaintiff [50-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude evidence/litigation of claims longer at issue [49-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude time-barred incidents [48-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude hearsay documents [47-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude expert testimony [46-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude EAP employees from testifying [45-1], withdrawing motion in limine to prohibit plaintiff from amending his pleadings [44-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude plaintiff's testimony that Bishop Kahalehau and Santiago Baroidan subjected him to racial harassment [43-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude plaintiff's testimony that Jason Omura called him a "dumb monkey" [42-1], withdrawing motion in limine to exclude testimony from witnesses not named prior to the discovery deadline, March 29, 2004 [41-1] () JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (sm)
                        LREF
                        Blank 93 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EO : All motions in limine are deemed withdrawn and will be considered by the court before the new trial only if counsel submit new notices of hearing of those motions; Only new notices of hearing are necessary; counsel need not refile the actual motions, memorandums, exhibits, etc., cc: all counsel of record ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                          LREF
                          Blank 92 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EP : Status Conference Re: Trial Date and Deadlines held. All parties participated by phone. Jury Selection/Trial is continued to 9:00 10/5/04, SOM. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/29/04. Cc: all counsel ;Status conference re trial date and deadlines held , ; Jury selection/trial is contined to 9:00 10/5/04, SOM , ; dispositive motions to be filed by 6/29/04 ( Ct Rptr : Courtroom 7-No record 9:11-9:11) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 91 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            EO : ;Trial re-setting conference set for 5/25/04 9:00 AM before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; parties notified ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 90 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              EO : ; Jury selection/trial to follow set for 05/25/04 9:00 AM before SOM is take off calendar Ms. Fosbinder directed to contact Warren Nakamura, Courtroom Manager to Magistrate Kobayashi, to schedule a trial resetting conference. Notified: Ms. Fosbinder and Mr. Amaguin. cc: Judge Mollway's Chambers. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 89 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Jury Instructions
                                Plaintiff's proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS (lmg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 88 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                  Plaintiff's proposed STATEMENT of the case [1-1] (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 87 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Exhibit
                                    Plaintiff's EXHIBITS list (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 86 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Trial Brief
                                      Plaintiff's TRIAL brief (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 85 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude time-barred incidents [13] [48-1] (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 84 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude plaintiff's testimony that Bishop Kahalehau and Santiago Baroidan subjected him to racial harassment [12] [43-1] (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 83 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude hearsay documents [11] [47-1] (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 82 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude testimony from witnesses not named prior to the discovery deadline, March 29, 2004, [10] [55-1] (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 81 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude reference to and admission of police report [9] [53-1] (lmg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude documents never produced to defendant [8] [52-1] (lmg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to amend case caption and delete Elden Loeffelholz as named defendant [7] [51-1] (lmg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude witnesses insufficiently identified by plaintiff [6] [50-1] (lmg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to prohibit plaintiff from amending his pleadings [5] [44-1] (lmg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude EAP employees from testifying [4] [45-1] (lmg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude plaintiff's testimony that Jason Omura called him a "dumb monkey" [3] [42-1] (lmg)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant' s motion in limine to exclude evidence/litigation of claims no longer at issue [2] [49-1] (lmg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to defendant's motion in limine to exclude expert testimony [1] [41-1] (lmg)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                  Plaintiff's PROPOSED VOIR DIRE (lmg)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Jury Verdict
                                                                    Plaintiff's proposed special VERDICT form (lmg)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                      Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to admissibility of defendants' proposed trial exhibits (lmg)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                        Defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s OBJECTIONS to plaintiff Luis Parrilla's exhibits certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Special Verdict Form
                                                                          PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM; certificate of service - by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc (afc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Jury Instructions
                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS; certificate of service - submitted by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc (afc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                              PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS to the jury panel; certificate of service - submitted by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc (afc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                PROPOSED CONCISE STATEMENT of case; certificate of service - by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc (afc)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Trial Brief
                                                                                  TRIAL brief; certificate of service - submitted by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc (afc)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc in opposition to plaintiff's motion in limine to exclude evidence regarding second, fourth, sixth, eight, and ninth affirmative defenses [57-1]; certificate of service (afc)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc in opposition to plaintiff's motion in limine to exclude defense exhibits 202-204 and 207-208 and related testimony [56-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits A through F; certificate of service (afc)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc in opposition to plaintiff's motion in limine to exclude defendants' evidence not disclosed in discovery [55-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits A and B; certificate of service (afc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          EO: COURT ORDER: Denying Defendant's Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline - The court having reviewed Defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s ("Defendant") Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline filed on April 12, 2004, Plaintiff Luis Parilla's ("Plaintiff") opposition memorandum filed on April 29, 2004, and Defendant's reply memorandum filed on May 6, 2004, finds this matter appropriate for disposition without a hearing. As this matter is currently scheduled to commence trial on May 27, 2004, permitting an additional motion for summary judgment to be filed at this time would not be an economical use of the parties' and the court's resources, and the court therefore DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this Motion. In the event the parties are unable to commence trial on or near the current trial date due to the court's criminal trial calendar, the parties should request an additional dispositive motions deadline at the trial re-setting conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. cc: all counsel [36-1] () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                            EO: Defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline set for 05/17/2004 10:30:00 AM before LEK is Vacated. Court to issue Order. cc: all counsel [36-1] () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              REPLY memorandum by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s in support of its motion to extend dispositive motions deadline, filed April 12, 2004 [36-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits A and B; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 6/15/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                Plaintiff's NOTICE OF MOTION and motion in limine to exclude evidence regarding second, fourth, sixth, eight, and ninth affirmative defenses ; memorandum of points and authorities; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 6/15/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Plaintiff's NOTICE OF MOTION and motion in limine to exclude defense exhibits 202-204 and 207-208 and related testimony ; memorandum of points and authorities; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 6/15/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Plaintiff's NOTICE OF MOTION and motion in limine to exclude defendants' evidence not disclosed in discovery ; memorandum of points and authorities; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                      Amended final WITNESS list; certificate of service - by plaintiff Luis Parrilla (lmg)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to exclude reference to and admission of police report ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits A and B; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to exclude documents never produced to defendant ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; certificate of service - referred Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to amend case caption and delete Elden Loeffelholz as named defendant ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to exclude witnesses insufficiently identified by plaintiff ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to exclude evidence/litigation of claims no longer at issue ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to exclude time-barred incidents ; memorandum in support of motion; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits A and B; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to exclude hearsay documents ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits A through P; certificate of service - referred Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to exclude expert testimony ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits A and B; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s in limine to exclude EAP employees from testifying ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits A and B; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s motion in limine to prohibit plaintiff from amending his pleadings ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s in limine to exclude plaintiff's testimony that Bishop Kahalehau and Santiago Baroidan subjected him to racial harassment ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibit A; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF hearing MOTION; defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s in limine to exclude plaintiff's testimony that Jason Omura called him a "dumb monkey" ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibit A; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc.'s in limine to exclude testimony from witnesses not named prior to the discovery deadline, March 29, 2004 ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                  Defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s final comprehensive WITNESS list; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's final WITNESS list; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by plaintiff Luis Parrilla to defendants' motion to extend dispositive motions deadline [36-1]; certificate of service (eps)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        EP : final pretrial conference held 4/13/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi James H. Fosbinder and Rhonda M. Fosbinder participated by phone. Trial days: Plaintiff - 2, Defendants - 2; Witnesses: Plaintiff - 8 to 10 live, (all from outer island), none by deposition, Defendants - 3 to 4 live, (1 from outer island), none by deposition; Exhibits: Plaintiff - 1 thru 100, Defendants - 200 to 220. Motions in Limine: Plaintiff - 1, Defendants - 10. ( Ct Rptr : C7 no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004, Terminated: 5/10/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc to extend dispositive motions deadline memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibit A; certificate of service; set for 10:30 5/17/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gab)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL STATEMENT by plaintiff Luis Parrilla (gab)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                              Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004, Terminated: 8/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion for summary judgment by Judge Susan O. Mollway - granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion for summary judgment [19-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                  EP : s Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Elden Loeffelholz's Motion to Dismiss and/or Summary Judgment - Arguments. Defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Elden Loeffelholz's Motion to Dismiss and/or Summary Judgment - taken under advisement. Court to issue a written ruling this week. (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                    Amended CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Aloha Airlines Inc, and Elden Loeffelholz (fe) Modified on 03/08/2004
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Reply MEMORANDUM by defendants Aloha Airlines Inc, and Elden Loeffelholz in support of their motion to dismiss and/or summary judgment [19-1]; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of James H. Fosbinder in support of opposition to defendants' Aloha Airlines and Elden Loeffelholz's motion for summary judgment; request for continuance if warranted; exhibits 1-22; certificate of service [19-1] - on behalf of plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's STATEMENT genuine issues in opposition to defendants' Aloha Airlines and Elden Loeffelholz's motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [27-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in opposition to motion defendants' Aloha Airlines and Elden Loeffelholz's motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [19-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to continue discovery motion hearing cutoff; ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi - a continuance of the discovery motion hearing cutoff date to and including 03/29/04 - on behalf of plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                        Submission of original DECLARATION of Terry Tolzmann and exhibits G and H in support of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Elden Loeffelholz's concise statement of facts in support of defendants Alosh Airlines, Inc. and Elden Loeffelholz's motion for summary judgment, filed December 23, 2003; certificate of service [19-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                          CONCISE STATEMENT of facts in support of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Elden Loeffelholz's motion to dismiss and/or summary judgment [19-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits a-b and 1; declaration of Michael J. Conroy; exhibits c-f and J; declaration of Elden Loeffelholz; declaration of Shannon Kamaka; declaration of Santiago Baroidan; declaration of Laurence Taylor; exhibit i; declaration of Bishop Kahalehau; declaration of Felix Tabisola; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003, Terminated: 3/19/2004 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF hearing MOTION; defendants Aloha Airlines Inc, & Elden Loeffelholz's MOTION to dismiss and/or summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of compliance; certificate of service; motion set for 11:15 3/15/04 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL expert witness designation [FRCP 26(a)(2)] by plaintiff re [17-1]; exhibit c; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's DESIGNATION of expert witness [FRCP 26(a)(2)]; exhibits A-B; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      EO :Further ;settlement conference [with counsel only] set set for 1:30 12/15/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi cc: all counsel ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        EP : ; settlement conference held ( Ct Rptr : In chambers-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL DISCLOSURES by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Elden Loeffelholz's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Rhonda M. Fosbinder participated by phone. 1. Jury trial on May 25, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on April 13, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by April 6, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by October 24, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by February 25, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by December 24, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by May 4, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by May 11, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 24, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 24, 2003 12. Discovery deadline March 29, 2004 13. Settlement Conference [with Counsel only] set for September 24, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by September 17, 2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by May 11, 2004 21. File Final witness list by May 4, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 27, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by May 4, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by May 11, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by May 4, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by May 11, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by May 11, 2004 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: LR 56.1 Memorandum given and mailed to parties. Judge Susan Oki Mollway's Trial Procedures given and mailed to parties. ; rule 16 scheduling conference held on 9:00 7/28/03 , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 5/25/04 before Judge Susan O. Mollway , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 4/14/04 ; settlement conference set for 2:00 9/24/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi , ; file discovery by 03/29/04; file dispositive motions by 12/24/03 ( Ct Rptr : Courtroom record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                EO : Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 7/28/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Parties notified by phone ( Ct Rptr : ) Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint REPORT OF EARLY MEETING [Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 26(f)] - by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., and Elden Loeffelholz's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Report [L.R. 16.2(b)] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER on behalf of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Elden Loeffelholz to [1-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE on summons and complaint executed by express mail to designated agent for service of process, David Lum, of Char Sakamoto Ishii Lum & Ching, Davies Pacific Center, Ste. 850, 841 Bishop St., Honolulu, HI 96813 for ALL DEFENDANTS on 6/6/03 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 7/28/03 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of interested parties - by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for injunctive and declaratory relief and damages; demand for jury trial; summons (issued) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 215547 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?