Ajifu v. Intl Assoc of Machin, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00212-HG-KSC
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Geraldine L.C. Ajifu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Venetia K. Carpenter-Asui +5236 523 523 6446 vkcarpenter1@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
No Logo Doe Entities 1-20, Defendant
No Logo International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers (AFL-CIO) District Lodge 141, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Kim +5381 538 538 1812 +5994 599 599 4623 seankimlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush Gottlieb Singer Lopez Kohanski Adelstein & Dickinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A Bush +1 818 973 3200 rbush@bushgottlieb.com
Space Ira Lawrence Gottlieb +1 818 973 3200 +1 818 973 3201 igottlieb@bushgottlieb.com
Space Kathleen M. Jorgenson +1 818 973 3200
No Logo Jane Does 1-20, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-20, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/6/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 11/26/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned: Clerk's file 1 volume, Reporter's transcript 1 volume. [CA #04-15039] (bbb, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
    COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [43] Judgment on Bill of Costs has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 11/14/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Judgment on Attorney Fees
      9CCA JUDGMENT on Bill of Costs. Fees awarded to Appellee against Appellant in the amount of $92.00; # (1) Bill of Costs;# (2) Proof of Service by Mail;# (3) Memorandum ;# (4) 9CCA Court Certificate of Service. (cc: HG) (bbb, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Correspondence
      Return Receipt of Records by 9CCA on 9/5/2006 (gab, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Correspondence
        APPEAL RECORD SENT TO USCA ( Clerk's File - 1, Transcript - 1) (ecs, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [40] USCA Order has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 6/15/06. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ecs, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 USCA Order
            [Certified] ORDER of USCA - Motion to dismiss this appeal with respect to defendant-appellee Aloha Airlines, Inc. is granted. [Attest date: 6/12/06] (Attachments: # (1) Docket Sheet)(ecs, )(cc: HG KSC and respective CRMs)
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Designation of Record on Appeal
            CERTIFICATE of Record Transmitted to 9th CCA (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Transcript
              ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Stephen Platt) taken on 09/08/03 (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 38 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
                APPEAL number 04-15039 received from 9CCA regarding [37-1] (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 37 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                  plaintiff-appellant's NOTICE OF APPEAL; exhibit a; certificate of service: from Dist. Court decision [35-2] (9CCA No. 04-15039) (bbb) Modified on 01/21/2004
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 1/6/2004 USCA Appeal Fees
                    RECEIVED re [37-1] fee in amount of $ 255.00 ( Receipt # 220043) (bbb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 36 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Designation of Record on Appeal
                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for dates: 09/08/03 court reporter: Steve Platt (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 35 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Judgment*
                        Civil JUDGMENT: that judgment is entered pursuant to the order granting defendants' motion to dismiss filed on October 14, 2003; it is further ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the minute order filed on November 24, 2003 - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/Laila M. Geronimo, Deputy Clerk - terminating case (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
                          LREF
                          Blank 34 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EO : MINUTE ORDER On October 14, 2003, the Court filed an Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and granted Plaintiff 30 days from the filing of the Order to amend her complaint. As of November 24, 2003, Plaintiff has failed to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. cc: Above counsel Judge Gillmor's chambers re [33-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003, Terminated: 11/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting defendants' motion to dismiss by Judge Helen Gillmor - granting motion to dismiss [6-1]; plaintiff has 30 days from the filing of this order to amend her complaint (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 32 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION to dismiss count IV (punitive damages) of plaintiff's complaint with prejudice; ORDER - approved and so ordered by Judge Helen Gillmor [30-1] - on behalf of plaintiff (lmg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 31 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 30 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EP : DEFENDANT IAMAW DISTRICT LODGE 141'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND OR TO STRIKE - JOINDER OF DEFENDANT ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. IN DEFENDANT IAMAW DISTRICT LODGE 141'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR TO STRIKE filed June 4, 2003 - Ms. Carpenter-Asui informed the Court that Count 3 of the Complaint is dismissed and a Stipulation for Dismissal of Count 4 of the Complaint will be submitted. Arguments made. Counsel for Plaintiff and Union are placed on notice that noncompliance with LR 10.2 in the future may result in the striking of their documents. The motion is taken under advisement. that the motion to dismiss and/or to strike [6-1] is taken under advisement ( Ct Rptr : Stephen Platt) JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. 1. Jury trial on October 5, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before HG 2. Final Pretrial Conference on August 24, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge Helen Gillmor on September 24, 2004 at 8:30a.m. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by August 17, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by March 5, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by July 7, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by May 5, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by September 14, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by September 21, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 5, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by May 5, 2004 12. Discovery deadline August 6, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2004 at 2:00pm before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by 6/9/2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by September 21, 2004 21. File Final witness list by September 14, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by September 7, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by September 14, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by September 21, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by September 14, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by September 21, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by September 21, 2004 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: None. ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 10/5/04 before Judge Helen Gillmor , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 8/24/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; Pretrial conference for 8:30 9/23/04 before Judge Helen Gillmor , ; settlement conference set for 2:00 6/16/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; Discovery ddl 8/6/04; file dispositive motions by 5/5/04 ( Ct Rptr : C5 - no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      EO : The time for the rule 16 scheduling conference currently set for 09/08/03 at 2:30 PM has been moved to 3:30 PM 9/8/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; all parties notified by phone ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s; certificate of service (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY by defendant IAMAW District Lodge 141's to opposition to motion to dismiss and/or to strike [6-1] (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            EO :The time for the rule 16 scheduling conference currently set for 9/08/03 at 9:30 AM has been changed to 09/08/03 at 2:30 PM before before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; cc: all parties via fax ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss and/or to strike; declaration of counsel; exhibit 1; certificate of service [6-1] (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Joinder
                                                JOINDER of defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc. in defendant IAMAW District Lodge 141's motion to dismiss and/or to strike filed June 4, 2003; certificate of service [6-1] (lmg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Geraldine L.C. Ajifu (fe)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for admission pro hac vice and Order by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang by defendant Intl Assoc of Machin for attorney Kathleen M. Jorgenson to appear pro hac vice ; declaration of Sean Kim; order granting application (fe)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION for admission pro hac vice and Order by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang by defendant Intl Assoc of Machin for attorney Robert A. Bush to appear pro hac vice ; declarationof Sean Kim; Order Granting application (fe)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                        STIPULATION to dismiss count III (intentional infliction of emotional distress) of plaintiff's complaint with prejudice and ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor : dismissing Count III of plaintiff's complaint with prejudice (fe)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 217370- for PHV attorney Kathleen M. Jorgenson (fe)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                            FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 217369 - for PHV attorney Robert Bush (fe)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Initial Disclosure
                                                              IAMAW District Lodge 141's INITIAL DISCLOSURES (lmg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                IAMAW District Lodge 141's SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT (lmg)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Initial Disclosure
                                                                  Plaintiff's INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                    PARTIES PLANNING MEETING REPORT; certificate of service - by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                              APPLICATION for admission pro hac vice; declaration of Ira Gottlieb; exhibit a; declaration of Sean Kim; ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang - granting application for admission pro hac vice of attorney Ira Gottlieb - on behalf of Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers (lmg)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                EP : Status Conference. Discussion held regarding Plaintiff's question as to when formal discovery should begin. Defendants wish to hold off discovery pending the 9/8/03 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff wishes to serve interrogatories, production of documents and admissions just to the Union. Court will allow Plaintiff to serve the Union only with discovery. ; status conference held 6/9/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C5 - no JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  EO : Status Conference is set for 6/09/2003 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Venetia Carpenter-Asui to participate by phone, 523-6446; Richard Rand to participate by phone, 523-5348; Sean Kim to participate by phone, 538-1812; and Ira Gottlieb to participate by phone, (818) 973-3200. cc: all parties via fax ; status conference set for 9:00 6/9/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    EO :Pursuant to Defendant's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/04/2003 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 9/08/2003 at 9:30 AM before Judge Chang. Sean Kim to notify all parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:30 9/8/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003, Terminated: 10/14/2003 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant IAMAW District Lodge 141's Machin to dismiss and/or to strike ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Ira Gottlieb; exhibits a-c; certificate of service - set for 10:30 9/8/03 before Judge Gillmor (lmg) Modified on 11/26/2003
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Answer
                                                                                        ANSWER of defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc. to [1-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed, served personally upon defendant Intl Assoc of Machin on 5/16/03 (lmg)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon David Lum, Esq. on 5/12/03 (gab)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/14/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (sealed)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; summons (Summons(es) issued) (sealed)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document -- Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                  FILING fee paid - 215618 (sealed)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?