Allen, et al v. Scottsdale Insurance, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00233-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Al Saunders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Dori Conroy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Elbio Calace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Gilbert Jacoby, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Hollis Barnett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo James E. Fackrell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo James Proctor, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo John D. McCormick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Jonathan M. Faulk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Keith Lawyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Mark Holland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Richard Krinke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Sam Holland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Theodore Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo William Brian Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
v.
No Logo Doe Defendants 1 - 30, Defendant
No Logo Scottsdale Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Burgos, III

Toggle Switch Represented by Ayabe Chong Nishimoto Sia & Nakamura LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney K. Ayabe +1 808 537 6119 +1 808 526 3491 sidney.ayabe@hawadvocate.com
Space Jeffrey H.K. Sia +5376 537 537 6119 +5263 526 526 3491 jeffrey.sia@hawadvocate.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Selman Breitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan B Yuter +1 310 445 0800 +1 310 473 2525 ayuter@selmanbreitman.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/13/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 3/5/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 04-15973[], 03-1-0789-04[FIRST CIRCUIT COURT]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 USCA Order
CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: dismissing the appeal [33-1] (gs)
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
    Plaintiff Daniel Bartholomew's NOTICE of Withdrawal of His Notice of Appeal; Certificate of Service (gs)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
      NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 04-15973 (gs)
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Designation of Record on Appeal
        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for dates: 2/23/04 Cynthia Fazio re [33-1] (gs)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
          Plaintiffs William Brian Allen's, James Proctor's and Mark Holland's NOTICE of Withdrawal of Their Notice of Appeal; Certificate of Service (gs)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Filing Fee Received
            FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 255.00, receipt # 222705 (gs)
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff William Brian Allen, plaintiff Hollis Barnett, plaintiff Theodore Brown, plaintiff Elbio Calace, plaintiff Dori Conroy, plaintiff James E. Fackrell, plaintiff Jonathan M. Faulk, plaintiff Mark Holland, plaintiff Sam Holland, plaintiff Gilbert Jacoby, plaintiff Richard Krinke, plaintiff Keith Lawyer, plaintiff John D. McCormick, plaintiff James Proctor Jr., plaintiff Al Saunders from Dist. Court decision [30-2] (gs)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Order
                ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal [31-1] by JUDGE David A. Ezra [pltfs may file NOA on or before 05/05/04] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/26/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiffs for extension of time to file notice of appeal ; memorandum in support of motion; affidavit of Richard Turbin; exhibit A; certificate of service - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT in a civil case: that Summary Judgment is GRANTED in its entirety in favor of Defendant pursuant to "Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment" filed on March 2, 2004 - by WALTER A.Y.H. CHINN, Clerk/Barbara Yamada terminating case (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra denying Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment [19-1]; granting defendant's motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, for partial summary judgment [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EP : Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference held. Settlement Conference on call. Parties awaiting Judge Ezra's decision on summary judgment. settlement conference held 2/23/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EP :: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. [19-1], [17-1] ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Reply
                            REPLY memorandum by plaintiffs re defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company's memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment [23-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                              LREF
                              Blank 25 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              Reply MEMORANDUM by defendant Scottsdale Insurance in support of motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, for partial summary judgment [17-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in opposition to defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company's motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, for partial summary judgment [17-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                  Separate concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Scottsdale Insurance in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment [19-1]; page length certification; certificate of service (fe)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM by defendant Scottsdale Insurance in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment [19-1]; page length certification; certificate of service (fe)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                      PRETRIAL STATEMENT by plaintiffs; certificate of service (fe)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        EO :At Plaintiff's request, the Settlement Conference currently set for 2/03/2004 at 2:00 PM has been continued to 2/23/2004 at 2:00 PM before Judge Chang. Gene from Mr. Turbin's office to notify all parties. settlement/status conference set for 2:00 2/23/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003, Terminated: 3/2/2004 Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff for partial summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; separate concise statement of facts; declaration of Carl D. Soto; exhibits a-d; certificate of servicei - set for 9:00 2/23/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                            Separate and concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Scottsdale Insurance in support of its motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, for partial summary judgment [17-1]; page length certification; declaration of Thomas A. Burgos III; declaration of Kent L. Riggs; exhibits a-v; certificate of service (fe)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Scottsdale Insurance for summary judgment or, in the alternative, for partial summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; page length certification; certificate of service - set for 9:00 2/23/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/11/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiffs (afc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/11/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                  STIPULATIONS to postpone designation of experts and exchange of expert reports and for the filing of joint dispositive motions; declaration of Carl D. Soto; (proposed) ORDER - by Judge David A. Ezra - filed by plaintiffs - [(1) Pltfs & Defts deadline for designations of experts and disclosure of expert reports is postponed until after a ruling is made on their respective dispositive motions; (2) Pltfs & Defts shall jointly file their respective dispositive motions on or before 12/08/03 & shall receive a joint hearing date for their dispositive motions; (3) Following this court's ruling on the parties respective dispositive motions a status conference will be set, during which new dates will be set for the parties designations of experts and disclosure of expert reports] (afc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Original Signature submitted
                                                    SUBMISSION by plaintiffs of original signature(s) of Thomas A. Burgos to the joint report of meeting of counsel [5-1]; exhibit a; certificate of service (fe)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      EP :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. 1. Non-jury trial on May 4, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on March 23, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by March 16, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by October 3, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by February 4, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by December 3, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by April 13, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by April 20, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 3, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 3, 2003 12. Discovery deadline March 5, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2004 at 2:00pm before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by 1/27/2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by April 13, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 6, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by April 13, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by April 20, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by April 13, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by April 20, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by April 20, 2004 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by April 20, 2004 Other Matters: None. rule 16 conference held on 9:00 8/11/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , Trial set for 9:00 5/4/04 before Judge David A. Ezra , final pretrial conference set for 9:00 3/23/04; Discovery ddl set for 3/5/04; Motion filing ddl set for 12/3/03; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 2/3/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          EO :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 8/11/2003 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Alan Yuter or Thomas Burgos to participate by phone. Audrey from Jeffrey Sia's office to notify all parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/11/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Scottsdale Insurance (fe)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Scottsdale Insurance; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiffs; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Scottsdale Insurance (fe)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Scottsdale Insurance (fe)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                      Joint REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING (fe)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                        EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang by defendant Scottsdale Insurance for attorney Alan B. Yuter and Thomas A. Burgos, III to appear pro hac vice ; declaration of Jeffrey H.K. Sia; declaration of Alan B. Yuter; declaration of Thomas A. Burgos, III; Order {GRANTING}; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 215996 - for PHV attorney Thomas A. Burgos, III (fe)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                            FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 215996 - for PHV attorney Thomas A. Burgos (fe)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Answer
                                                                              ANSWER by defendant Scottsdale Insurance to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/11/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Notice of Removal
                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendants; removal from Circuit Court of the First Circuit State of Hawaii, Case No. 03-1-0789-04 (afc)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                    FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 215726 (afc)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 207 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?