Blas v. Wal-Mart Associates
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00249-BMK
Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Phillip Blas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by thegrid.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Ireijo +1 530 885 4133 waikikilawyer@thegrid.net
v.
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Wal-Mart Associates, Inc."
Officer/Director, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com
No Logo Riki M. Amano, Mediator
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/19/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hawaii
Terminated 11/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice as to all claims and all parties by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - filed by deft Wal-Mart terminating case (afc)
    LREF
    Blank 53 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EO : Status Conference Re Dismissal set for 11/22/2004 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Case settled per James Ireijo. All other dates vacated. Notified: Roman Amaguin ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Original Signature submitted
      SUBMISSION of original Declaration of Doreen Soares in Support of Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, filed October 28, 2004; Certificate of service to statement [46-1] (gs)
        LREF
        Blank 51 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Original Signature submitted
        SUBMISSION of original Declaration of Boyd Schneider in Support of Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, filed October 28, 2004; Certificate of Service to statement [46-1] (gs)
          LREF
          Blank 50 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Original Signature submitted
          SUBMISSION of original Declaration of Daniele Dang in Support of Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, filed October 28, 2004; Certificate of service to statement [46-1] (gs)
            LREF
            Blank 49 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Original Signature submitted
            SUBMISSION of original Declaration of Dawn Enos in Support of Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, filed October 28, 2004; Certificate of Service to statement [46-1] (gs)
              LREF
              Blank 48 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Original Signature submitted
              SUBMISSION of original Declaration of Desiree Aganu in Support of Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, filed October 28, 2004; Certificate of Service [46-1] (gs)
                LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EO : ; settlement conference continued from 12/7/2004 10:00 a.m. to 10:30 12/16/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                  LREF
                  Blank 46 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                  CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by defendant Wal-Mart Associates in support of defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc's motion for summary judgment [45-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits a through c; and c-1 and 1 through 6; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 45 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Wal-Mart Associates to dismiss and/or for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of compliance; certificate of service - set for 9:30 12/3/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 44 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER re: September 9, 2004 discovery conference - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - filed by deft Wal-Mart Stores (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 43 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EP: Discovery Conference - held. Good cause found for allowing the following to be dicovered: Any document pltf submitted for the claims or appeals hearing. Copy of tape recordings of these hearings. Roman Amaguin to prepare discovery order. (Ct Rptr: No Record Taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EO : ; Discovery conference set for 11:00 AM 9/9/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; notified: Roman Amaguin, Frances Lum ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Wal-Mart Associates (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 40 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Wal-Mart Associates (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 39 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Wal-Mart Associates (afc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE by defendant of issuance of subpoena duces tecum; exhibit A; certificate of service (afc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                    WITHDRAWAL and SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - filed by Mr. Amaguin - Shawn M. Nakoa & Elizabeth A. Stance of the law firm Strance & Nakoa WITHDRAW AS COUNSEl for deft Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., dba Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; attorney ROMAN F. AMAGUIN of Torkildson Katz Fonseca Moore & Hetherington, is substituted and enters his APPEARANCE as retained counsel for deft Wal-Mart] (afc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER appointing mediator by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren adding party mediator Riki M. Amano (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                        Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sealed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          EP : Status Conference Re Mediation - parties to notify court within 2 weeks if mediation will go forward. If parties cannot select a mediator, the court will appoint one. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Pleadings, set for hearing on 4-27-04, is withdrawn per Strance. Parties' request to continue trial granted. New dates given. Court to prepare an amended scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on February 1, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on December 21, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by December 14, 2004 5. 6. 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 29, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by January 11, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by January 18, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by August 2, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 1, 2004 12. Discovery deadline September 30, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for December 7, 2004 at 10:00 a.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by November 30, 2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by January 18, 2005 21. File Final witness list by January 11, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by January 4, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by January 11, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by January 18, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by January 11, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by January 18, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by January 18, 2005 30. [24-1] ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 2/1/05 ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 12/21/04 ; Discovery ddl set for 9/30/04 ; Motion filing ddl set for 10/29/04 ; settlement conference set for 10:00 12/7/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : C6 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            EO : ;status conference re mediation set for 4/19/04 9:00 AM before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Ireijo to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant to plaintiff's amended memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment [24-1]; declaration of Elizabeth A. Strance; exhibit A; declaration of Doreen K. Soares; exhibit A; declaration of Dawn Enos; exhibit A; declaration of Cassie M. Leopoldino; exhibit A; declaration of Daniele Dang; exhibit A; certificate of service (afc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 31 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                                Plaintiff's AMENDED SEPARATE CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS in opposition to defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment [24-1]; declaration of James Ireijo; exhibits A-C; certificate of service (afc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Plaintiff's AMENDED MEMORANDUM in opposition to defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s motion for judgment on the pleadings or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment [24-1]; declaration of Phillip M. Blas; certificate of service (afc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    EO: Continued : [Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment] from 04/20/2004 09:00:00 AM to 04/27/2004 10:00:00 AM before BMK. Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to be refiled by 4-9-04. Reply to Opposition due 4-16-04. Notified: James Ireijo, Elizabeth Strance [24-1] () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                                      SEPARATE AND CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment [24-1]; certificate of service (afc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s motion for judgment on the pleadings or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment [24-1]; declaration of Philip M. Blas; certificate of service (afc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Wal-Mart Associates (sm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                            Separate anc concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Wal-Mart Associates in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment [24-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Motion for Judgment on the PleadingsCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Wal-Mart Associates for judgment on the pleadings or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment ;memorandum in support of motion; affidavit of Desiree Aganus; affidavit of Terrance Crowley; exhibits a-k; certificate of service - set for 10:00 4/20/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Initial Disclosure
                                                                INITIAL DISCLOSURE by defendant Wal-Mart Associates; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Initial Disclosure
                                                                  INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Wal-Mart Associates (afc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      STIPULATED Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : re [9-1] - motion to join or amend by 2/27/04; Dispositive motions 3/17/04; comply with FRCP 26(a) by 2/27/04; experts disclosures: pltf by 2/227/04, deft by 3/15/04 (fe)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        EP :Jury Selection/Trial to Follow continued from 6-15-04 to 6-16-04 @ 9 a.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Jury Trial set for 9:00 6/16/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            EP: Further Settlement Conference held. Parties to continue to work on settlement (Ct Rptr: No Record Taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                              EP :Status Conference held. Settlement Conference set for 1-13-04 @ 4:30 p.m., BMK. Confidential Statements due by noon on 1-12-04. set for 01/08/2004 09:00:00 AM before BMK status conference held 1/8/04 ; settlement conference set for 4:30 1/13/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , settlement/status conference set for 9:00 1/8/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                EP : status conference held 12/16/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; close to settlement; further status conference set for 9:00 1/8/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Wal-Mart Associates (fe)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    EP: Settlement Conference - held. Status conference set for 10:30 12/16/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (Ct Rptr: No Record Taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Wal-Mart Associates (sealed)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE, consent and ORDER of reference - exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties this case transferred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren for final disposition (cc: all counsel, CRMS) (eps)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          EP: Status/Settlement Conference held. Further Settlement Conference set for 12-2-03 @ 11 a.m., BMK. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements due 12-1-03. (Ct Rptr: No Record Taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                              EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare order. 1. Jury trial on June 15, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on May 4, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by April 27, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by November 14, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by March 17, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by January 14, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by May 25, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by June 1, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 15, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by January 14, 2004 12. Discovery deadline April 16, 2004 13. Status/Settlement Conference set for September 25, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 14. 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by June 1, 2004 21. File Final witness list by May 25, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by May 18, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by May 25, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by June 1, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by May 25, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by June 1, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by June 1, 2004 rule 16 conference held on 9:00 8/18/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 6/15/04 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 5/4/04 ; Discovery ddl set for 4/16/04 ; filing ddl set for 1/14/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 9/25/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (afc)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Answer
                                                                                                    ANSWER by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (afc)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Wal-Mart Associates on 6/9/03 through it's agent CSC Service of Hawaii, Inc. accepted by Warren Kaneshiro, secretary (fe)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/18/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                          SUMMONS issued (fe)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; exhibit a (fe)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                              FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 215851 (fe)
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 335 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?