Markham v. USA, The, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00257-SOM-KSC
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Markham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Shaw +1 808 521 0800 +1 808 531 2129 shawy001@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Doe Entity 1 to 10, Defendant
No Logo Doe Partnership 1 to 10, Defendant
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Elaine L. Chao"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Unknown Role, News Corporation
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
Officially listed as "John Doe 2 to 10"
No Logo Labor, U.S. Department of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Melanie Galen, Defendant
No Logo Two Unknown OWCP Claims Examiners, Defendant
No Logo Two Unknown OWCP Nurses, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States of America, The"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/23/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 1/29/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned: (1) Clerk's File and (1) Transcript: Notice of Appeal CA #04-15616. (bbb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006, Terminated: 5/26/2006 USCA Judgment
    USCA JUDGMENT - AFFIRMED as to Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Letter from USCA) (cc: SOM) (bbb, )
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
    Original Record transmitted to Clerk, 9CCA (on 10/17/05) 1 Vol Clerk's; 1 Vol Reporter's Transcripts (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004, Terminated: 4/10/2006 Designation of Record on Appeal
      CERTIFICATE of Record Transmitted to 9th CCA: CA #04-15616 (bbb)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Transcript
        ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Debra Chun) taken on 12/22/2003 - 16 pages (bbb)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Designation of Record on Appeal
          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for date: 12/22/03 reporter: Debra Chun [18-1] (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
            APPEAL number 04-15616 received from 9CCA regarding [18-1] (afc)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 4/10/2006 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL and copy of docket sheet sent to 9th CCA [18-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff James Markham from Dist. Court decision [17-2] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 USCA Appeal Fees
                  RECEIVED re [18-1] fee in amount of $ 255.00 ( Receipt # 221880) (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                    JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the motion to dismiss is GRANTED. It is further ordered that Judgement is entered in favor of Defendants pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss" filed December 22, 2003. by Judge Susan O. Mollway re [6-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (bbb) Modified on 01/29/2004
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting defendants' motion to dismiss [6-1] by Judge Susan O. Mollway (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EP : Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint - Arguments. Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint - Granted. Court to prepare a written order. [6-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          Federal Defendants' reply MEMORANDUM in support of motion to dismiss first amended complaint [6-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                            plaintiff James Markham's SEPARATE CONCISE STATEMENT in support of counter-motion for summary judgment against defendants [10-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER striking "counter motion" filed on December 2, 2003 by Judge Susan Oki Mollway [10-1] - [because plaintiff's counter motion does not raise the same subject matter as original motion and because it was not filed at least 28 days before hearing date, court strikes counter motion without prejudice to its being refiled as a motion with at least 28 days before the hearing; Markham's filing on 12/2/03 shall be considered to be only an opposition to the Federal defts' M/dismiss] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff James Markham of First Amended Complaint (bbb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  plaintiff James Markham's MEMORANDUM in opposition to Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss first amended complaint [6-1]; counter motion for summary judgment; declaration of counsel; exhibits a-b; certificate of service (bbb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/17/2003 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 1/05/2004 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. cc: all parties by phone; rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/5/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                      plaintiff James Markham's LR 16.2(b) STATEMENT; certificate of service (bbb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by Federal defendants (afc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003, Terminated: 12/22/2003 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION; Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss first amended complaint ; table of contents; table of authorities; federal defendants' memorandum in support of motion to dismiss first amended complaint; appendix; declaration of Edward Duncan, exhibits 1-18; certificate of service set for 9:45 12/22/03 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (bbb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Amended Complaint
                                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT as of course [1-1] by plaintiff James Markham; adding Melanie Galen, Two Unknown OWCP Cla, Two Unknown OWCP Nur; exhibits a-c; summons issued (fe)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway denying plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                EX PARTE MOTION by plaintiff James Markham for temporary restraining order ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of James Markham; declaration of counsel; exhibits a-e; proposed order; certificate of service - referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (fe)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/17/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT; exhibits a and b; (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 215945 (fe)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?