Bank of Hawaii v. Lindsey, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00335-HG-BMK
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bank Of Hawaii, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine G. Leonard +5232 523 523 2500 kgl@carlsmith.com
No Logo Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. McCorriston +5248 524 524 8293 mccorriston@m4law.com
v.
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Ser"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith S. Blair +1 202 307 6413 +1 202 307 0054
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. McCorriston +5248 524 524 8293 mccorriston@m4law.com
No Logo Bank Of Hawaii, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine G. Leonard +5232 523 523 2500 kgl@carlsmith.com
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Ser"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith S. Blair +1 202 307 6413 +1 202 307 0054
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. McCorriston +5248 524 524 8293 mccorriston@m4law.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 6/27/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 1/12/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/17/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION to Disburse Funds and Dismiss all Claims with prejudice and ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor : terminating case (gs)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP: USA's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint - USA's Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim; The motions are taken under submission pending global settlement of the case; The parties have agreed to file a stipulation for dismissal by December 31, 2003 [17-1], [14-1] (Ct Rptr : Stephen Platt) by Judge Helen Gillmor (gs)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey aka Lokelani Lindsey's opposition to United State's motion to dismiss cross-claim, filed October 16, 2003; certificate of service [17-1] (gs)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
        Defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey aka Lokelani Lindsey's Opposition to United State's motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint, Filed August 29, 2003; Certificate of Service [14-1] (gs)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Plaintiff Bank of Hawaii's MEMORANDUM in opposition to United States' motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint filed August 29, 2003; Declaration of Gordon D. Nelson; Declaration of Katherine G. Leonard; Exhibits 1 to 6; certificate of service [14-1] (gs)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Answer to Counterclaim
            Plaintiff Bank of Hawaii's ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM of Defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey, AKA Lokelani Lindsey filed September 25, 2003; Certificate of Service [16-2] by counter-defendant Bank of Hawaii (gs)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant USA to dismiss cross-claim ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 9:45 11/17/03 before Judge Helen Gillmor (afc)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Crossclaim
                CROSSCLAIM by defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey against defendant Internal Revenue Ser (gs)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Answer
                  Defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey, aka Lokelani Lindsey's ANSWER to First Amended Complaint for Interpleader filed on August 25, 2003 [11-1]; Defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey, aka Lokelani Lindsey's COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Bank of Hawaii; Defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey, aka Lokelani Lindsey's CROSS-CLAIM against defendants Internal Revenue Service, Department of the Treasury, United States of America; Certificate of Service (gs)
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO: Continued: [Rule 16 scheduling conference] from 9/22/03 9:00 a.m. to 1/12/04 9:00 a.m. before BMK by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF MOTION; United States' Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint ; Memorandum in Support of United States' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Certificate of Service set for 9:45 11/17/03 before Judge Helen Gillmor (gs)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Acknowledgment of Service
                        Return and ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE by defendant Internal Revenue Ser and USA on 8/27/03 (gs)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Order
                          Plaintiff Bank of Hawaii's Ex Parte Motion for an Order for Deposit of Registry Account Funds into an interest-Bearing Account; Affidavit of Katherine G. Leonard; Exhibits A-C; ORDER GRANTING plaintiff Bank of Hawaii's Ex Parte Motion for an Order for Deposit of Registry Account Funds into an interest-Bearing Account by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR (gs)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Amended Complaint
                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Interpleader [1-1]; Exhibits A-E; Summons issued by plaintiff Bank of Hawaii (gs)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Marion Mae Lokelani Lindsey on 7/2/03 (gs)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Ex Parte Motion and order
                                Plaintiff Bank of Hawaii's EX PARTE MOTION for an Order for Deposit of Registry Account funds into an interest-Bearing Account; Affidavit of Katherine G. Leonard; Exhibits A-C; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Bank of Hawaii's Ex Parte Motion for an Order for Deposit of Registry Account Funds into an interest-bearing account by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Bank of Hawaii (gs) Modified on 08/26/2003
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                  RETURN and Acknowledgment OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Internal Revenue Service and the United States of America on 6/30/03 (gs)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 RemarkCourt Filing
                                    Case Reassignment; case reassigned to Judge Gillmore and Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway of recusal, reassigned to Judge Helen Gillmor (gs)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER of Recusal by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang - referred to the Chief Judge for reassignment (gs)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 RemarkCourt Filing
                                          Case Reassignment: Judge Mollway assigned case per random selection (gs)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER of Recusal by Judge Samuel P. King (gs)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang rule 16 conference set for 9:00 9/22/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT for Interpleader; Exhibit A - C; (Summons(es) issued) (gs)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                  FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 216608 (gs)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?