Beatty v. Warner, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00338-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Stanton Beatty, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Betty Lou Beatty, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas D. Farrell +5244 524 524 4854
No Logo Betty Ruffley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E.T. Koshiba +5233 523 523 3900 jkoshiba@koshibalaw.com
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
No Logo John Ruffley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E.T. Koshiba +5233 523 523 3900 jkoshiba@koshibalaw.com
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
No Logo Mark Warner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by bchlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia D. Quinn +5245 524 524 5644 cquinn@bchlaw.net

Represented by Bronster Hoshibata, Attorneys at Law

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Virginia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Robert Messitt +1 804 786 2071 pmessitt@oag.state.va.us
No Logo Michael F. Easley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by bchlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia D. Quinn +5245 524 524 5644 cquinn@bchlaw.net

Represented by Bronster Hoshibata, Attorneys at Law

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emery E. Milliken +1 919 716 6840
Office Hawaii
Filed 6/30/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 5/5/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV04-15965[]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned: 3 files on 9/27/06 (ecs, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 82 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/5/2006 Correspondence
    USCA Transmittal form & 9CCA service list re: [81] USCA Judgment (afc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 81 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/5/2006 Order
      USCA JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM - affirming [78] Judgment of the District Court re [77] Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Stanton Beatty, (afc)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/5/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
        COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [81] USCA JUDGMENT, will be served on August 7, 2006 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record, including those addresses as reflected on the 9CCA transmittal service list. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Interoffice delivery: Judges Ezra and Chang; respective CRM's. (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 80 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          Original Record transmitted FEDEX to Clerk, 9CCA: Clerk's files 3 - CA #04-15965 (bbb) Modified on 10/12/2004
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
            NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number CV 04-15965 (sm)
              LREF
              Blank 79 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Designation of Record on Appeal
              TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for dates: (does not intend to designate any portion of transcript) [77-1] (sm)
                LREF
                Blank 78 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                JUDGMENT in a Civil Case - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is hereby dismissed pursuant to the "Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant Betty Beatty and Order Denying Defendant Betty Beatty's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for FRCP 56(F) Continuance as Moot" filed on January 21, 2004, the "Order Granting Defendant Nathanael Beatty's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings" filed on January 20, 2004, and the "Order Granting Defendant Governor Mark Warner's Motion to Dismiss, Defendant Governor Michael F. Easley's Motion to Dismiss, and Defendant John Ruffley and Defendant Betty Ruffley's Motion to Dismiss" filed on January 6, 2004 by Judge David A. Ezra cc: all parties on record all counsel) (sm)
                  LREF
                  Blank 77 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty (sm)
                    LREF
                    Blank 76 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra denying plaintiff's motion to reconsideration of January 20, 2004 order [65-1] [72-1] all counsel) (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 75 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra denying plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of January 21, 2004 order [66-1] [74-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 74 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty for reconsideration of January 21, 2004 order [66-1] ; memorandum in support; certificate of service - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 73 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang denying motion for reconsideration of entry of default based on LR 60.1(c) [64-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                            LREF
                            Blank 72 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty for reconsideration of January 20, 2004 order [65-1] ; memorandum in support; declaration; certificate of service - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                              LREF
                              Blank 71 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra denying motion plaintiff's for reconsideration of 12b order [62-1] [67-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                LREF
                                Blank 69 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                MEMORANDUM by defendant Mark Warner in opposition to plaintiff Mark Beatty's motion for reconsideration of 12b order [62-1] [67-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 68 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EO :Defendant Nathanael Beatty's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Betty Beatty's Motion for Summary Judgment These motions set for 02/09/2004 09:00:00 AM before DAE-to be decided on the papers without a hearing. re [37-1], re [49-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 67 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty for reconsideration of 12b order [62-1] ; memorandum in support; declaration as to documents; declaration concerning Nathanael Beatty; certificate of service - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 66 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004, Terminated: 3/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra dismissing plaintiff's claims against defendant Betty Beatty and order denying defendant Betty Beatty's motion for summary judgment [49-1], and plaintiff's motion for FRCP 56(f) continuance [54-1] as moot. (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 65 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004, Terminated: 3/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra granting defendant Nathanael Beatty's motion for judgment on the pleadings [37-1] terminating party Nathanael James Beatty, (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 64 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004, Terminated: 2/4/2004 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                          MOTION by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty for reconsideration of entry of default based on LR 60.1(c) ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - referred to Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 63 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM by defendants Betty Lou Beatty, and Nathanael James Beatty in support of motion for judgment the pleadings [37-1], and motion for summary judgment [49-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 62 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004, Terminated: 2/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra granting Governor Mark Warner's motion to dismiss, defendant Governor Michael F. Easley's motion to dismiss, and defendant John Ruffley and Defendant Betty Ruffley's motion to dismiss [26-1], [25-1], [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 61 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying plaintiff's ex parte motion to shorten time according to Local Rule 6.2 and motion to strike according to Local Rule 7.4 by Judge David A. Ezra (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 1/2/2004, Entered: 1/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang denying motion for FRCP 55(a) entry of default as to Betty Lou Beatty, Nathanael Beatty, John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley [46-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/2/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    EO :Defendants John Ruffley's and Betty Ruffley's Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Of Governor Mark Warner; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Governor Michael F. Easley set for 01/05/2004 09:45:00 AM before DAE; MOTIONS TO BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT A HEARING [17-1] [25-1] [26-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                      Reply MEMORANDUM by defendant Michael F. Easley in support of motion to dismiss defendant Governor Michael F. Easley [26-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Reply
                                                        REPLY by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty re defendants John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley's memorandum in support of plaintiff's opposition to defendant Ruffley's 12(b)2 Motion to dismiss [53-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Reply
                                                          REPLY by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty to defendant Betty Beatty's Memorandum in opposition re [52-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            Reply MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty in support of motion for entry of default against defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty [33-1]; certificate of service (fe) Modified on 12/29/2003
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Request
                                                              REQUEST by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty for FRCP 56(f) continuance; memoramdum in supporr; affidavit; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                Reply MEMORANDUM by defendants Betty Ruffley and John Ruffley in support of Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss [17-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  MEMORANDUM by defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty in opposition to plaintiff's motion for FRCP 55(a) entry of default as to Betty Lou Beatty, and Nathanael Beatty [46-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference not held. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference continued to 3/8/04 at 9:00am before Judge Chang after the dispositive motions set before Judge Ezra. rule 16 conference held on 9:30 12/17/03; rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/8/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM by defendants John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley in opposition to plaintiff's motion for FRCP 55(a) entry of default as to Betty Lou Beatty, Nathanael Beatty, John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley [46-1]; certificate of service (fe) Modified on 12/12/2003
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003, Terminated: 1/21/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Betty Lou Beatty for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; concise statement of facts; declaration of Betty Beatty; exhibits a through c; certificate of service - set for 9:00 2/9/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendants Betty Ruffley, and John Ruffley; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003, Terminated: 1/2/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff for FRCP 55(a) entry of default as to Betty Lou Beatty, Nathanael Beatty, John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley ; memorandum in support; certificate of service - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (fe) Modified on 12/12/2003
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by defendant Michael F. Easley; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiff to defendant Nathanael Beatty's FRCP 12(c) motion [37-1]; memorandum in support; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                    REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                        REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by defendant Mark Warner; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Mark Warner; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Michael F. Easley; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra adopting magistrate's findings and recommendation [35-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty withdrawing motion for default judgment against defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty [33-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003, Terminated: 1/20/2004 Motion for Judgment on the PleadingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Nathanael James Beatty for judgment on the pleadings ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 9:00 2/9/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty in opposition to plaintiff's motion for default judgment against defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty [33-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003, Terminated: 12/3/2003 Findings and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                      FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION denying plaintiff's motion for default judgment against John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley [21-1] by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Reply
                                                                                                        Certificate of word count; Memorandum in REPLY by plaintiff to defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for default judgment re [30-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty for default judgment against defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty ; memorandum in support; declaration; proof of service for defendant Betty Beatty; proof of service for defendant Nathanael Beatty; copy of 122 A.L.R. 624; copy of 153 A.L.R. 449; certificate of service - set for 9:30 12/17/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                            EO :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2003 9:00 AM is rescheduled to 9:30:00 AM before KSC. rule 16 conference set for 9:30 12/17/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty to the 12(b) motion to dismiss defendant Governors Mark Warner and Michael Easley [25-1], [26-1]; certification of word count; memorandum in support; declaration; documents in support; certification of service (eps) Modified on 11/10/2003
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by defendants Betty Ruffley and John Ruffley in opposition to motion for default judgment against John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley [21-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 ERRATA
                                                                                                                  ERRATA by defendants Betty Ruffley and John Ruffley to Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss [17-1]; exhibit a; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 ERRATA
                                                                                                                    ERRATA by defendant Mark Warner to motion to dismiss Governor Mark Warner [25-1]; exhibit a; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      EX PARTE MOTION and Order {GRANTING} by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang by defendant Michael F. Easley for attorney Emery E. Milliken to appear pro hac vice ; declaration of Emery E. Milliken; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2004 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Michael F. Easley to dismiss defendant Governor Michael F. Easley ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 9:45 1/5/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2004 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Mark Warner to dismiss ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 9:45 1/5/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            First STIPULATION changing time for hearing of defendants John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley's Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss and ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra : setting hearing on motion Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss [17-1] 9:45 1/5/04 (fe)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              EO :Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley filed on October 24, 2003 will be treated as a non-hearing motion. Opposition due November 7, 2003 Reply due November 20, 2003 - that the motion for default judgment against John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley [21-1] is submitted ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty to defendants John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley's Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss [17-1]; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Mark Beatty; documents in support of response; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty for default judgment against John Ruffley and Betty Ruffley ; memorandum in support of motion; scheduling conference declaration; proof of service for defendant John Ruffley; proof of service for Defendant Betty Ruffley; certificate of service - referred to Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                    FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 218982 - for PHV attorney Emery E. Milliken for deft Governor Michael F. Easley (fe)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      EO : Defendants John Ruffley's and Betty Ruffley's Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss has been continued from 12/01/2003 10:30:00 AM to 01/05/2004 09:45:00 AM before DAE - setting hearing on motion Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss [17-1] 9:45 1/5/04 ( Ct Rptr : ) Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by defendants Betty Lou Beatty and Nathanael James Beatty to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE MOTION and Order {GRANTING} by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang by defendant Mark Warner for attorney Peter R. Messitt to appear pro hac vice ; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                            FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 218901 - for Pro Hac Vice attorney Peter R. Messitt (fe)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Betty Ruffley, defendant John Ruffley Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of John Ruffley; declaration of Betty Ruffley; certificate of service - set for 10:30 12/1/03 before Judge David A. Ezra (eps)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                FIRST STIPULATION extending time for defendants Governor Mark Warner and Governor Michael F. Easley to file and answer or otherwise plead and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : extending time to answer to 10/27/2003 (eps) Modified on 10/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  EO : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/28/03 at 9:00am has been continued to 12/17/2003 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Mr. Beatty to notify all parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued as to defendant Nathanael James Beatty at 5915 Dinwiddie Street, Springfield, VA 22150-3723 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS issued as to defendant Betty Lou Beatty (fe)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to defendant Nathanael James Beatty (fe)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          EO :At Defendant's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/29/2003 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 11/28/2003 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Defendant to notify all parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/28/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Mark Stanton Beatty (fe)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS issued as to defendant Nathanael James Beatty, Worcester, MA (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS issued as to defendant Nathanael James Beatty (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS issued as to defendant John Ruffley (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued as to defendant Betty Lou Beatty (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS issued as to defendant Betty Ruffley (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to defendant Michael F. Easley (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS issued as to defendant Governor Mark Warner (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 9/29/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT; jury request (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 216634 (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 2/2/2003, Entered: 2/3/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of no position by defendant Michael F. Easley to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of 12b order [62-1] [67-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?