Takeno v. United Public Worker, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00366-BMK
Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dwight Takeno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Glickstein +5213 521 521 3336 hglickstei@aol.com
Space Michael Jay Green +5213 521 521 3336 +1 808 566 0347

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise M. Hevicon +5235 523 523 5751 +5322 532 532 2164 dhsangster@hawaii.rr.com
v.
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Peter Trask, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E.T. Koshiba +5233 523 523 3900 jkoshiba@koshibalaw.com
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
No Logo United Public Workers, American Federation of State, County, Municipal Employees, Local 646, AFL-CIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E.T. Koshiba +5233 523 523 3900 jkoshiba@koshibalaw.com
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 7/11/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 730 - Labor: Reporting/Disclosure
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Honolulu
Terminated 10/7/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice of all claims and all parties by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : terminating case - pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) (emt)
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EO : ;Continued : [Final Pretrial Conference] from 09/27/2005 09:05:00 AM to 10/07/2005 10:00:00 AM before BMK. Parties working on settlement. Charles Price to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (emt)
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : Continued : [Further Settlement Conference] from 09/27/2005 10:00:00 AM to 10/18/2005 10:00:00 AM before LEK. Charles Price to notify all parties. ; ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
        LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP : Further Settlement Conference held. Further Settlement Conference set for 10:00 9/27/05, LEK. ; ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Miscellaneous Document
          DEFENDANTS'PRETRIAL STATEMENT; certificate of service by defendant (ecs)
            LREF
            Blank 43 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Miscellaneous Document
            PLAINTIFF'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT; certificate of service by plaintiff Dwight Takeno (ecs)
              LREF
              Blank 42 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EO : Further Settlement Conference set for 09/23/2005 09:00:00 AM before LEK. cc: all counsel ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
                LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EP : Settlement Conference held. ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
                  LREF
                  Blank 40 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Dwight Takeno (emt)
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendants (emt)
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendants (emt)
                        LREF
                        Blank 37 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendants (emt)
                          LREF
                          Blank 36 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Dwight Takeno (emt)
                            LREF
                            Blank 35 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            EO: Continued : [Settlement Conference] from 08/11/2005 02:00:00 PM to 08/25/2005 02:00:00 PM before LEK. cc: all counsel () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                              Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication; upon consent of parties this case transferred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren for final disposition (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                                LREF
                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EP: Status Conference Re Settlement-No Settlement at this time. Trial Date and other Scheduling Deadlines will be reset. Counsel will be submitting for Judge Mollway's approval the Consent to have this case assigned to U.S. Magistrate Barry M. Kurren. 1. Jury trial on November 8, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on September 27, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by September 20, 2005 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by April 8, 2005 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by August 10, 2005 7. File Dispositive Motions by June 8, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by October 18, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by October 25, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by May 9, 2005 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by June 8, 2005 12. Discovery deadline September 9, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for August 11, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by August 4, 2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by October 25, 2005 21. File Final witness list by October 18, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by October 11, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by October 18, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by October 25, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by October 18, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by October 25, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by October 25, 2005 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A [status conference held 1/13/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 11/8/05 before Judge Susan Oki Mollway ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 9/27/05; Discovery ddl set for 9/9/05; Motion filing ddl set for 6/8/05; settlement conference set for 2:00 8/11/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren] (Ct Rptr: None) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United Public Worker, defendant Peter Trask (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                      Amended CERTIFICATE of service by defendants (sm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendants (sm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          EO :Continued : [Status Conference Re Settlement] from 11/22/2004 09:00:00 AM to 01/13/2005 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Tawnya from Price's office to notify parties. ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 1/13/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendants (sm)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Initial Disclosure
                                              INITIAL DISCLOSURE; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Dwight Takeno (sm)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 25 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare a scheduling conference order. 1. Jury trial on May 3, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on March 22, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. Final Pretrial Statement by March 15, 2005 4. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by October 1, 2004 5. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by February 2, 2005 6. File Dispositive Motions by December 1, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by April 12, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by April 19, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 1, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 1, 2004 12. Discovery deadline March 4, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for February 28, 2005 at 10:00 a.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by February 22, 2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by April 19, 2005 21. File Final witness list by April 12, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 5, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by April 12, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by April 19, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by April 12, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by April 19, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by April 19, 2005 30. Other Matters: Status Conference Re Settlement set for 11-22-04 @ 9 a.m., BMK. ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 5/3/05 before Judge Susan O. Mollway , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 3/22/05 ; Discovery ddl set for 3/4/05 ; Motion filing ddl set for 12/1/04 ; , ; settlement/status conference set for 10:00 2/28/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 11/22/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct : C6, no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                    defendants United Public Worker, Peter Trask and John Does 1-10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service by plaintiff Dwight Takeno (eps)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Answer
                                                        Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint; Certificate of Service [1-1] (sm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway denying motion to dismiss [9-1] (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                            EP: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - Arguments. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - taken under advisement. Court to issue a written ruling within the next 10 days or so. :taking under advisement on the motion to dismiss [9-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (sm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Defendants' reply memorandum in support of defendants' motion to dismiss, filed November 26, 2003; certificate of service [9-1] (sm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Plaintiff Dwight Takeno Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Moti on to Dismiss Filed Novermber 26, 2003; Declaration of Dwight Takeno; Declaration of Wayne R. Kruse; Declaration of Susan Young; Declaration of Scot Seo; Certificate of Service [9-1] (sm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                  EO :Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 05/06/2004 09:30:00 AM to 07/12/2004 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Pat from Glickstein's office to notify parties. () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Filed November 26, 2003; ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway [9-1] hearing continued to 6/15/04 at 2:15 SOM (sm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                      EO Continued : Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from 04/12/2004 11:15:00 AM to 06/15/2004 02:15:00 PM before SOM. All parties notified by Mr. Glickstein's office. Mr. Glickstein to prepare the stipulation. cc: Judge Mollway's Chambers. :setting hearing on motion to dismiss [9-1] 2:15 6/15/04 () JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (sm) Modified on 03/25/2004
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        EO :Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 03/15/2004 09:00:00 AM to 05/06/2004 09:30:00 AM before BMK. Tanya from Price's office to notify parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:30 5/6/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                          First Amended NOTICE by plaintiff Dwight Takeno of hearing setting motion to dismiss [9-1] 11:15 4/12/04 SOM; Certificate of Service (sm)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            EO : Continued : Defendants' Motion to Dismiss From 02/23/2004 10:30:00 AM to 04/12/2004 11:15:00 AM before SOM. All parties notified by Mr. Glickstein's office. Mr. Glickstein to prepare an amended notice of hearing. cc: Judge Mollway's Chambers; setting hearing on motion to dismiss [9-1] 11:15 4/12/04 () JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (sm)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                              EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 12/19/2003 09:00:00 AM to 03/15/2004 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Tanya from Price's office to notify parties. () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/28/2003, Terminated: 6/17/2004 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendants to dismiss ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Elizabeth Ho; exhibits A-D; certificate of service - set for 10:30 2/23/04 before Judge Susan Oki Mollway (afc)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 12/08/2003 09:00:00 AM to 12/19/2003 09:00:00 AM before BMK to allow time for parties to meet prior to the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Pat from Glickstein's office to notify parties.rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/19/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Peter Trask on 11/10/03 (sm)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant United Public Worker on 10/27/03 thru Elizabeth C. Ho (sm)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant AFSCME 646, AFL-CO by Elizabeth C. Ho (sm)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 11/05/2003 09:00:00 AM to 12/08/2003 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Pat from Glickstein's office to notify parties.rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/8/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                            EP :Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 10/06/2003 09:00:00 AM to 11/05/2003 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Michael Green to notify parties. cc: Michael Green rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/5/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 10/6/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; (Summons(es) issued) (sm)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 217022 (sm)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 211 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?