Kaaumoana v. Potter, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00473-SOM-KSC
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roberta Kaaumoana, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by attyandrewooten.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre S. Wooten +5454 545 545 4165 Andre@AttyAndreWooten.com
v.
No Logo John E. Potter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Space Edward H. Kubo, Jr. +5412 541 541 2850 Ed.Kubo@usdoj.gov
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Postal Service, United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Space Edward H. Kubo, Jr. +5412 541 541 2850 Ed.Kubo@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 9/4/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Honolulu
Terminated 1/27/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Judgment*
CIVIL JUDGMENT: that judgment is entered in favor of defendants' United States Postal Service and John E. Potter and against Plaintiff Roberta Kaaumoana, pursuant to the "order granting defendants' motion for summary judgment" filed on January 24, 2005 - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/ Laila M. Geronimo, Deputy Clerk re [19-1] terminating case (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting defendants' motion for summary judgment by Judge Susan O. Mollway - granting motion for summary judgment [19-1] (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP : Motion for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Court to View Exhibits - Denied as untimely. Arguments. Motion for Summary Judgment - Granted. This case shall be terminated. Court to issue a written order this week. granting motion for summary judgment [19-1] denying order [31-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 1/17/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Ex Parte Motion and order
        Plaintiff Kaaumoana's EX PARTE MOTION for court to review exhibits filed in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgement; declaration of counsel; exhibits 1-5; order; certificate of service [19-1] (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 1/16/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Description not available
          DECLARATION of plaintiff in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment - on behalf of plaintiff [19-1] (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Description not available
            Supplemental DECLARATION by plaintiff of counsel, exhibit A & B; certificate of service [1-1] (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Description not available
              DECLARATION of counsel; exhibits A-E; certificate of service - on behalf of plaintiff [1-1] (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY memorandum by defendants in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [19-1] (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 12/31/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff's in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [19-1] (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 12/31/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                    Plaintiff's SEPARATE AND CONCISE STATEMENT of facts in opposition to defndants' motion for summary judgment; declaration of plaintiff; certificate of service [19-1] (no original signature on document - note states "original signature to be provided for Hilo plaintiff") (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP : Settlement Conference. Counsel to await Judge Mollway's ruling on the 1/18/05 Motion for Summary Judgment. Settlement Conference continued to 2/1/05 at 2:00pm before Judge Chang. ;settlement conference continued to 2:00 2/1/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang counsel to await Judge Mollway's rulingon the 01/18/05 motion for summary judgment [19-1] ( Ct Rptr : In chambers-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Initial Disclosure
                        Plaintiff's INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service (lmg)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EO :The time for ;the settlement conference set for 12/10/04 at 10:00 AM has been moved to 11:00 AM on 12/10/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; cc: all counsel of record ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                            STIPULATION to extend discovery due date and dispositive motion deadline; ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang - plaintiff's discovery responses due 10/19/94; dispositive motions deadlines extended to 10/27/04 - on behalf of USA (lmg) Modified on 10/28/2004
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                              Defendants' separate and concise STATEMENT of material facts in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment; declaration of Rae Katano; exhibits A-G; certificate of service [19-1] (lmg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004, Terminated: 1/18/2005 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF MOTION; defendants' motion for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment; certificate of service - set for 9:45 1/18/05 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg) Modified on 10/28/2004
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting defendants' motion to dismiss [12-1] - by Judge Susan Oki Mollway [court grants USPS's M/dismiss all claims except Count V; USPS brings no motion with respect to Count V, and the Title VII claim asserted in Count V is the only claim that remains pending] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        EP: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment - Arguments. Government's Motion to Dismiss - Granted. The only count remaining is count 5. Court to prepare a written ruling. [12-1] (Ct Rptr: Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan Oki Mollway (afc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Defendants' REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of motion to dismiss; withdrawal of motion for Summary Judgment on count V; certificate of service [12-1] (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in opposition to Defendant U.S. Postal Services' motion to dismiss Complaint filed June 9, 2004; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service [12-1] (gs)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004, Terminated: 8/23/2004 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION; Defendants' Motion to dismiss and for Summary Judgment ; Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Declaration of Robert J. Barnhart; Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert J. Barnhart; Certificate of Service set for 11:15 8/23/04 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (gs)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  EP :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. 1. Jury trial on March 22, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on February 8, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by February 1, 2005 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 23, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 22, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 20, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by March 1, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by March 8, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 20, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 20, 2004 12. Discovery deadline January 21, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2004 at 10:00am before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by 12/3/2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by March 8, 2005 21. File Final witness list by March 1, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 22, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by March 1, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by March 8, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by March 1, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by March 8, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by March 8, 2005 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: None. rule 16 conference held on 9:00 3/22/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 3/22/05 before Judge Susan O. Mollway , ; final pretrial set for 9:00 2/8/05 ; Discovery ddl set for 1/21/05 ; filing ddl set for 10/20/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 10:00 12/10/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    EO :At defendant's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/15/2004 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 3/22/2004 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Tom Helper to notify all parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/22/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      EO :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/01/2004 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 3/15/2004 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Mr. Wooten to notify all parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/15/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendants; certificate of service (fe)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Postal Service, U S on 12/29/03 through U.S. Attorney Office, Price Kuhio Federal Building (fe)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                            EO :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/05/2004 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 3/01/2004 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Mr. Wooten to notify all parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/1/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                              First AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1]; jury demand; summons issued (fe)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                EO :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/01/2003 at 9:00 AM is hereby continued to 1/05/2004 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/5/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/1/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT; jury demand; (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 217952 (fe)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 664 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?