Lesane v. Aloha Airlines, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00477-SPK-BMK
District Judge SAMUEL P KING, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Reza Lesane, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by attyandrewooten.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre S. Wooten +5454 545 545 4165 Andre@AttyAndreWooten.com
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
No Logo John Employees, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 9/8/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Honolulu
Terminated 8/5/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 04-16793[]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record CA# 04-16793 Returned: Clerk's Files and Reporter's Transcripts (number of files/transcripts returned - not indicated, just "x". (ecs, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
    COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [55] USCA JUDGMENT has been served to Registered Participants of CM/ECF who received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ecs, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Order
      USCA JUDGMENT (File and Entered on 3/20/2007; Certified/Attest date 4/27/07) re [48] Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum # (2) Service List)[Judgment of the said District Court in this cause be, and hereby is AFFIRMED. ](ecs, )(cc: SPK, LS) Modified on 5/4/2007 (ecs, ).
      LREF
      Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Transmittal of Documents
      TRANSMITTAL of Records to USCA as to Appeal No: 04-16793 [48].(2 Clerk's Files, 1 Reporter's Transcript) (ecs, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Order
        USCA [uncertified] ORDER re [48] Appeal - Miscellaneous filed by Reza Lesane CA #04-16793. (bbb, )
          LREF
          Blank 52 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 USCA Order
          CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: "September 28, 2005 order was entered in error and the motion to reinstate is denied as moot." [48-1] Attest date: 11/02/05 (cc: all counsel) (bbb) Modified on 11/07/2005
            LREF
            Blank 51 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 USCA Order
            CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: dismissing the appeal for failure to respond to the order by the 9CCA dated 09/28/05 [48-1] CA #04-16793 (bbb)
              LREF
              Blank 50 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Designation of Record on Appeal
              CERTIFICATE of Record Transmitted to 9th CCA re: CA # 04-16793 (bbb) Modified on 01/18/2005
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Transcript
                ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 07/23/2004 pp. 34 (bbb)
                  LREF
                  Blank 49 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Designation of Record on Appeal
                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for dates: 07/23/2004 Cynthia Fazio re [48-1] CA# 04-16793 (bbb)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                    NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 04-16793 (bbb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 48 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL; exhibit a; certificate of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane from Dist. Court decision, [43-1] (bbb) Modified on 11/07/2005
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Filing Fee Received
                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 255.00, receipt # 224827 (bbb)
                          LREF
                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Judgment*
                          JUDGMENT: by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/gb re [43-1] that judgment is issued in favor of Defendant, pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or For Summary Judgment" filed on August 3, 2004. terminating case (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 46 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Remark
                            Letter from Andre Wooten (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 45 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Remark
                              Letter from Andre Wooten (gab)
                                LREF
                                Blank 43 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King granting Defendants' motion to dismiss and/or for summary judgment [30-1] (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EP : Settlement Conference-Court and Counsel discussed Settlement of this Action. No Settlement at this time. Further Settlement Conference on call. ( Ct Rptr : none) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sealed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 42 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EP: Defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., and John Brom's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment: Plaintiff Reza Lesane present. Arguments made. Defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., and John Brom's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment taken under advisement. [30-1] ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Samuel P. King (bbb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 41 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (eps)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 40 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (bbb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 39 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Description not available
                                          DECLARATION of Saresa Kimball by plaintiff Reza Lesane (bbb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 38 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and John Browm's MOTION to compel production of documents from plaintiff Reza Lesane ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits a thorught c; certificate of service; motion set for 2:00 8/13/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 37 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and John Browm's reply MEMORANDUM in support of their motion to dismiss and/or for summary judgment [30-1] filed June 1, 2004; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 36 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                plaintiff Reza Lesane's MEMORANDUM in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss and/or for summary judgment [30-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 7/3/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  plaintiff Reza Lesane's CONCISE COUNTER-STATEMENT of facts in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss and/or for summary judgment [30-1]; exhibits 1-20; deposition of Reza Lesane, Deposition of Brian Bile, deposition of Seresa Kimball; declaration of counsel (bbb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    EO: Defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and John Brom's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment set for hearing on July 21, 2004 is hereby continued to July 23, 2004 @l0:00 a.m. before Judge S. King. All Counsel Notified of this continued hearing date. [30-1] () JUDGE Judge Samuel P. King (bbb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Mike Conroy and John Browm (bbb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Original Signature submitted
                                                        defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc. and John Brom's SUBMISSION of original declaration oof Jennifer Jamme and exhibit L in support of the concise statement of facts in support of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and John Brom's motion to dismiss and/or for summary judgment [30-1] [31-1] filed June 1, 2004; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                          Concise STATEMENT of facts in support of defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., and John Browm's motion to dismiss and/or for summary judgment [30-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits a-b and 1; declaration of Michael J. Conroy; exhibits c- e-1; and h-j; declaration of Alton Higa; exhibits f and g; declaration of Beau Tatsumura; exhibit j-1; declaration of Rich Haron; exhibits k and k-1; declarationo f Candace Tawara; declaration of Dave York; declaration of John Brom; declaration of Arthur Mangosing; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 8/3/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF hearing on MOTION; defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc. and John Browm's MOTION to dismiss and/or for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of compliance; certificate of service; motion set for 10:00 7/21/04 before Judge Samuel P. King (bbb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Mike Conroy, defendant John Browm (gs)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., John Browm (bbb)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., John Browm (bbb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (bbb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (bbb)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant John Browm (gs)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION to extend dispositive motions deadline; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : ; Motion filing ddl set for 6/1/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , extending (bbb)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (bbb)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (bbb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Mike Conroy (eps)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant John Browm (eps)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                    INITIAL DISCLOSURE by plaintiff Reza Lesane; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (fe)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                        INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service - by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant John Browm (eps)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATION for dismissal of (1) plaintiff's claims asserted under 42 USC 1985 and 1986 and (2) defendant Michael J. Conroy as an individual defendant and ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King : dismissing party Mike Conroy on behalf of defts Aloha Airlines, Michael Conroy and John Bown (eps)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (bbb)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Mike Conroy, & John Browm (bbb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Mike Conroy, John Browm (bbb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Reza Lesane (gs)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                      EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare order. 1. Jury trial on October 13, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before SPK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on August 31, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by August 24, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by March 12, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by July 14, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by May 12, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by September 21, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by September 28, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 12, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by May 12, 2004 12. Discovery deadline August 13, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for July 29, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by July 23, 2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by September 28, 2004 21. File Final witness list by September 21, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by September 14, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by September 21, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by September 28, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by September 21, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by September 28, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by September 28, 2004 30. cc: Tammy Kimura ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 10/13/04 before Judge Samuel P. King , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 8/31/04 ; Discovery ddl set for 8/13/04 ; Motion filing ddl set for 5/12/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 7/29/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : C6 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Mike Conroy, & Johannes Brom, misidentified as John Browm (SIC); certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Answer
                                                                                                            ANSWER of defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Mike Conroy, John Browm misidentified as John Browm (SIC; certificate of service [1-1] (bbb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc. on 9/10/03 (bbb)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant John Browm on 9/11/03 (bbb)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Mike Conroy on 9/10/03 (bbb)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/8/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT for damages; demand for jury trial; (Summons(es) issued) (bbb)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 217982 (bbb)
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 496 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?