Universal Leather, LLC v. KORO AR, S.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-2241

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 3:22 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3150 - Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellee KORO AR, S.A. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/24/2014. [999302208] [13-2241] Christopher Browning
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999267830] granting Motion to extend filing time [16], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 02/24/2014. Copies to all parties.. [13-2241] (CB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION by Appellee KORO AR, S.A. to extend filing time for response brief. Date and method of service: 12/30/2013 ecf. [999267719] [13-2241] Christopher Browning
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Appellant Universal Leather, LLC. [13-2241] Norman Smith
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
          BRIEF by Appellant Universal Leather, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/16/2013. [999260201] [13-2241] Norman Smith
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
            FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Universal Leather, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 12/16/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999260195] [13-2241] Norman Smith
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
              ORDER filed [999237771] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/18/2013. Response brief due 01/24/2014. Copies to all parties.. [13-2241] (CB)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-2241] (LP)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                  BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/09/2013. Response Brief due 01/10/2014 [13-2241] (CB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Universal Leather, LLC. [13-2241] Norman Smith
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Universal Leather, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999222945] [13-2241] Norman Smith
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Norman B. Smith for Universal Leather, LLC.[999222944] [13-2241] Norman Smith
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee KORO AR, S.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999216648] [13-2241] Garrick Sevilla
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by C. Elizabeth Hall for KORO AR, S.A..[999216640] [13-2241] Carrie Hall
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Garrick A. Sevilla for KORO AR, S.A..[999216588] [13-2241] Garrick Sevilla
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher G. Browning, Jr. for KORO AR, S.A..[999216577] [13-2241] Christopher Browning
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00604-WO-JLW.. [13-2241] (CB)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00604-WO-JLW. Case manager: CBennett. [13-2241] (CB)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?