Diode Isolated Thin Film Array Addressing Method

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09660135
Examiner Evan T Pert, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Evan T Pert
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Donald C. Mayer, Palos Verdes Estates, CA, Applicant

Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid 1 +1 +1 +1
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Donald C. Mayer, Palos Verdes Estates, CA, ()
Filing Date September 12, 2000
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-393
Confirmation Number 6547
Group Art Unit 2829
Class / Sub-Class 327 / 365
Timeline
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow -Received 85b - Unmatched
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/19/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 6 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?