Ranger, et al v. State Farm Insurance, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00565-DAE-LEK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Lydia Ranger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Colletti, Jack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WOODRUFF K. SOLDNER soldner@lyslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yunker & Schneider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Leavitt, Jr. +5217 521 521 7474 +5217 521 521 7749 jim@lyslaw.com
Space John D. Yamane +5217 521 521 7474 +5217 521 521 7749 yamane@lyslaw.com
No Logo William Ranger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Colletti, Jack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WOODRUFF K. SOLDNER soldner@lyslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yunker & Schneider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Leavitt, Jr. +5217 521 521 7474 +5217 521 521 7749 jim@lyslaw.com
Space John D. Yamane +5217 521 521 7474 +5217 521 521 7749 yamane@lyslaw.com
v.
No Logo DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Doe Entities 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Doe Partnerships 1-20, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
State Farm Insurance Companies State Farm Insurance Companies, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tom Petrus & Miller LLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard B. Miller +7925 792 792 5809 rmiller@tpm-hawaii.com
Space Patricia K. Wall kwall@tpm-hawaii.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/20/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Honolulu
Terminated 10/6/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV03-1-1882-09[1st Circuit Court]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Scheduling Conference Statement
Scheduling Conference Statement by William Ranger, Lydia Ranger. (gls, )
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT In A Civil Case: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered pursuant to the, Order Granting Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment; Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment, by the Honorable Chief U.S. District Judge David A. Ezra, and filed on, August 24, 2004 re [20-1] terminating case by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk, by Gary Santos, Deputy (gs)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO: Settlement conference set for 10/6/04 2:00 p.m. before LEK is VACATED; Case closed by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
        LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004, Terminated: 10/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Order DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment [15-1], [13-1] (sealed)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP: Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies' Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Deft State Farm Insurance Companies' Motion for Summary Judgment - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT [15-1], [13-1] (Ct Rptr: Stephen Platt) by Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Reply MEMORANDUM in support of Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies' motion for summary judgment filed July 7, 2004; Certificate of Service [13-1] (gs)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Plaintiffs' MEMORANDUM in opposition to Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies' motion for summary judgment filed on July 7, 2004 and Certificate of Service [13-1] (sealed)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies' MEMORANDUM in opposition to Plaintiffs William Ranger and Lydia Ranger's motion for summary judgment; Certificate of Service [15-1] (gs)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004, Terminated: 8/24/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                  Plaintiffs' MOTION for summary judgment ; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Affidavit of John D. Yamane; Exhibits A through E; Notice of Hearing on Motion and Certificate of Service set for 9:45 8/23/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                    Defendant's Separate Concise STATEMENT of Undisputed facts in support of motion for summary judgment; Declaration of Richard Pritts; Exhibits A and G; Declaration of Dean Hosni; Exhibits B-F; Certificate of Service [13-1] (gs)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF Hearing MOTION; Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies' Motion for summary judgment ; Certificate of Service set for 9:45 8/23/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EO: continued [Settlement conference] from 7/1/04 2:00 p.m. to 10/6/04 2:00 p.m. before LEK; Patricia Kehau Wall to notify John D. Yamane by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                            STIPULATED PROTECIVE ORDER; exhibit A - by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi - approved and so ordered as modified by the court - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant State Farm Insurance (gs)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff William Ranger, plaintiff Lydia Ranger (gs)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                  Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EP: Rule 16 Scheduling conference held ; 1. Non-jury trial on December 7, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on October 26, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by October 19, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by May 7, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by September 8, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by July 7, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by November 16, 2004 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by November 23, 2004 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by June 7, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by July 7, 2004 12. Discovery deadline October 8, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for July 1, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by June 24, 2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by November 16, 2004 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by November 9, 2004 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by November 16, 2004 26. File objections to the Exhibits by November 23, 2004 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by November 16, 2004 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by November 23, 2004 29. File Trial Brief by November 23, 2004 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by November 23, 2004 Other Matters: LR 56.1 Memorandum given to parties. A copy of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties (Ct Rptr: no record) by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                      Plaintiffs' SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT and Certificate of Service by plaintiff William Ranger, plaintiff Lydia Ranger (gs)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                        Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies' SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Certificate of Service (sealed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Report of Planning Meeting
                                          REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING; Certificate of Service by plaintiff William Ranger, plaintiff Lydia Ranger (gs)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                            FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 218921 (gs)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/12/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Notice of Removal
                                                Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies' NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Verification; Exhibits A - B; Certificate of Service from Fist Circuit Court Case Number: CV 03-1-1882-09 (gs)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?