Bruno, et al v. Au, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00567-JMS-BMK
District Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Gahr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eve M. Green +1 808 249 2474 +1 808 244 4021
Space Michael Jay Green +5213 521 521 3336 +1 808 566 0347
Space Debra Akemi Kagawa +5213 521 521 3336
Space G. Todd Withy +5212 521 521 2500 Withylawcourt@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise M. Hevicon +5235 523 523 5751 +5322 532 532 2164 dhsangster@hawaii.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhode Island Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Moises Alcides Aviles +1 909 383 2333 +1 909 383 9550 aviles.associates@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joyce H. Vega +1 888 616 5762 +1 888 616 5762 vegaattorneys@gmail.com
No Logo Frank Robert Paulson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eve M. Green +1 808 249 2474 +1 808 244 4021
Space Michael Jay Green +5213 521 521 3336 +1 808 566 0347
Space Debra Akemi Kagawa +5213 521 521 3336

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise M. Hevicon +5235 523 523 5751 +5322 532 532 2164 dhsangster@hawaii.rr.com
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas J. Ridge, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eve M. Green +1 808 249 2474 +1 808 244 4021
Space Michael Jay Green +5213 521 521 3336 +1 808 566 0347
Space Debra Akemi Kagawa +5213 521 521 3336

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaii.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise M. Hevicon +5235 523 523 5751 +5322 532 532 2164 dhsangster@hawaii.rr.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/20/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 4/26/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (211) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 206 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Stipulation for Dismissal and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for Dismissal With Prejudice As To All Claims And Parties; Order. Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). (gls, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
    EP: Jury Trial: 2nd day: Plaintiff Christopher Gahr present with counsels Moises Avile and Joyce Vega. Plaintiff presented opening statement. Defendant presented opening statement. CST: Christopher Gahr. Exhibits Admitted: Plaintiffs - 213. Parties reached a settlement. Settlement placed on record.Mr. Helper to prepare stipulation for dismissal. (Court Reporter Lisa Groulx.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 204 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
      Defendant's Proposed Supplemental Jury Instructions and Certificate of Service Proposed Jury Instructions by Department of Homeland Security. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
        LREF
        Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
        EP: Jury Selection held on 4/24/2007. Plaintiff Christopher Gahr present. 53 jurors present for selection. 8 jurors selected. Jurors sworn. Preliminary instructions given by Court.Further trial continued to 09:00 AM on 4/25/2007 before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (Court Reporter Debra Chun.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 199 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on MotiCourt Filing
          ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Continue Trial filed April 12, 2007. Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/23/07. (gls, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
            EP: Hearing held on 4/23/2007: Plaintiff Christopher Gahr present.Motions terminated: [181] MOTION re [171] Order, Defendant's Proffer of Evidence Regarding Personnel Actions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. [149] Plaintiff's Deposition Designations and Defendant's objections:Discussion held regarding remaining pretrial matters (exhibits, stipulations to be filed, etc.).[18l] Court ruled that defendant's can offer evidence with cut-off date of 12/31/2004. [149] Plaintiff's Deposition Designations and Defendant's Objections: Court went through all of the depositions that Plaintiff wanted to use for trial that Defendant objected to (Tom Young, Patti Igarashi, Filbert Carvalho) and ruled as to which deposition excerpts Plaintiff will be able to present.(Court Reporter Lisa Groulx.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 201 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Jury Instructions
              Stipulated Jury Instructions; Certificate of Service. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(gls, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 200 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Stipulation
                STIPULATION Regarding Exhibits; Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. (gls, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 197 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                  ORDER Granting Plaintiff Christopher Gahr's [183] Motion For Appearance of Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/19/07. Attorney Joyce H. Vega is permitted to appear and participate as co-counsel for plaintiff Christopher Gahr (gls, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 198 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Supplement
                    Defendant's Proffer of Evidence Potentially Covered By Sensitive Security Information Protections; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. [SEALED] (gls, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 196 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                      EP: Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2007 re [123] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Personnel Decisions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. Motion GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Further hearing on pretrial conference on deposition designations and exhibits continued to Monday, April 23, 2007 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Lisa Groulx.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 195 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Amended Document
                        AMENDED Offer of Proof Re Order of April 11, 2007 by Christopher Gahr. to [185]. (gls, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Objection
                          Opposition to Defendant's Offer of Proof regarding Personnel Decisions of Others filed by Christopher Gahr. (gls, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 ERRATA
                            Errata to Exhibit List by Christopher Gahr. (gls, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 192 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                              EP: Motions terminated: [144] MOTION in Limine filed by Christopher Gahr, [143] MOTION in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Patrick Collins Regarding Derogatory Racial Statements and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security, Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2007.Plaintiffs presence waived. Arguments made. Further pretrial conference on deposition designations and exhibits continued to Friday April 20, 2007 at 1:30 PM. (Court Reporter Lisa Groulx.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 191 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Supplement
                                SUPPLEMENT re [171] Order, by Department of Homeland Security Defendant's Supplemental Proffer of Evidence Regarding Personnel Actions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service. (Helper, Thomas)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 190 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Return of Service on Subpoena
                                  Return of Service on Subpoena (gls, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 189 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Objection
                                    OBJECTION re [166] Errata Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits Containing Sensitive Security Information and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Helper, Thomas)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 188 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Exhibit
                                      Exhibit List Defendant's Second Amended Exhibit List by Department of Homeland Security.. filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Helper, Thomas)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 187 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Reply
                                        REPLY re [171] Order, Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Proffer of Evidence Regarding Personnel Decisions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Helper, Thomas)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 186 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                          EP: Motions terminated: [182] MOTION to Shorten Time to hear Motion re[175] MOTION to Continue filed by Christopher Gahr. Motion hearing held 4/17/2007.Motion to Continue Trial filed by Christopher Gahr DENIED. Mr. Helper to prepare Order. (Court Reporter Lisa Groulx.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Corrective Entry
                                            CORRECTIVE ENTRY. The entry docket number [186] EP on Motion to Shorten time was entered incorrectly in this case. The PDF image will be deleted. Disregard the PDF image. The text will suffice. No action is required by any party. (gls, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 185 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Response
                                              Offer of Proof re [171] Order, filed by Christopher Gahr. (gls, ) Modified on 4/18/2007 to modify caption(emt, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 184 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Memorandum
                                                MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities Re Items covered by re [171] Order, filed by Christopher Gahr. (gls, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 183 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007, Terminated: 4/23/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Application to Admit Joyce H. Vega Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Gahr. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joyce H. Vega# (2) Certificate of Service)(gls, ) Modified on 4/18/2007 modify caption (emt, ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 182 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Motion to Shorten Time to hear Motion
                                                    Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time to hear Motion re[175] MOTION to Continue Trial by Christopher Gahr. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate# (2) Affidavit of Joyce H. Vega# (3) certificate of service)(gls, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 181 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007, Terminated: 4/23/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION re [171] Order, Defendant's Proffer of Evidence Regarding Personnel Actions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 180 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [175] MOTION to Continue Trial filed April 13, 2007 and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Hac Vice held on 1/26/07 before Judge J. Michael Seabright. Court Reporter: Debra Chun. (dc@hid.uscourts.gov) pp. 14.
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (STATUS CONF) held on 1/25/07 before Judge J. Michael Seabright. Court Reporter: Cynthia Fazio. (15 pp.) (cf@hid.uscourts.gov)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [175] MOTION to Continue : Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (edm, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 176 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Exhibit
                                                                EXHIBIT Defendant's Further Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security.. filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 175 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                  MOTION to Continue Trial by Christopher Gahr. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities# (2) Affidavit of Moises A. Aviles# (3) Affidavit of Christopher Gahr# (4) Certificate of service)(gls, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 174 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Objection
                                                                    OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Jury Instructions, and Verdict Forms filed by Christopher Gahr. (gls, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 173 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Trial Brief
                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by Christopher Gahr. filed by Christopher Gahr.(gls, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 172 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal with Prejudice re: Claims of Lucas Bruno III, Charles Turner and Tom Young; ORDER. Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/10/07. [Claims of plaintiffs Lucas Bruno III, Charles Turner and Tom Young against defendant MICHAEL CHERTOFF, Secretary, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Still remaining in this action are the claims of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER GAHR against Defendant MICHAEL CHERTOFF, Secretary, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.](afc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 171 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER REQUIRING WRITTEN PROFFER FROM PLAINTIFF AS TO [123] DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PERSONAL DECISIONS OTHER THAN PLAINTIFF'S TERMINATION -. Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/11/07. [Plaintiff's proffer is to be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, April 16. The defendant may file a reply, at its option, by 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, April 18.] (emt, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                            COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [171] "ORDER REQUIRING WRITTEN PROFFER FROM PLAINTIFF AS TO [123] DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PERSONAL DECISIONS OTHER THAN PLAINTIFF'S TERMINATION" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on April 11, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 170 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition re [123] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Personnel Decisions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service filed by Christopher Gahr. (gls, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 169 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition re [143] MOTION in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Patrick Collins Regarding Derogatory Racial Statements and Certificate of Service filed by Christopher Gahr. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Christopher Gahr# (2) Certificate of Service)(gls, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 168 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [144] MOTION in Limine Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence Relating to Gahr v. San Bernardino City Unified School District, San Bernardino Superior Court Case No. SCVSS 33196 and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 167 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Trial Brief
                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 166 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                      Errata to Exhibit List - by Christopher Gahr. (emt, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 165 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                        VOIR DIRE - by Christopher Gahr. (emt, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 164 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Special Verdict Form
                                                                                          VERDICT FORMS - by Christopher Gahr. (emt, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 163 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Statement of No Opposition
                                                                                            STATEMENT of Non-Objections to the Defendant's Exhibits and the Deposition of Filbert Carvalho, deceased - filed by Christopher Gahr. (emt, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 162 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              STATEMENT TO THE JURY - by Christopher Gahr (emt, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 161 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                JURY INSTRUCTIONS - filed by Christopher Gahr.(emt, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 160 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                  JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Certificate of Service attached) - filed by Christopher Gahr.(emt, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 159 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Objection
                                                                                                    OBJECTION Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Designation of Deposition Testimony and Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment "1"# (2) Attachment "2"# (3) Attachment "3"# (4) Attachment "4"# (5) Attachment "5"# (6) Attachment "6")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 158 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                    Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions (Unannotated Version); Certificate of Service Proposed Jury Instructions by Department of Homeland Security. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 157 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                      Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions (Annotated Version); Certificate of Service Proposed Jury Instructions by Department of Homeland Security. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 156 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Concise Statement of Facts
                                                                                                        CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts Defendant Michael Chertoff's Concise Statement of the Case; Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 155 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by Department of Homeland Security. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 154 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Special Verdict Form
                                                                                                            Special Verdict Form by Department of Homeland Security. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [123] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Personnel Decisions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service : Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (edm, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 152 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                EXHIBIT Defendant Michael Chertoff's Preliminary Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security.. filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A"# (2) Exhibit "B")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                  ADVISORY ENTRY RE: The entry docket number [152] Exhibit, filed by Department of Homeland Security. Please be advised that wrong event was selected, the more appropriate event would have been "objection" found in the "Responses and Replies" catagory. NO FURTHER ACTION REQUIRED. (emt, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [144] MOTION in Limine, [143] MOTION in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Patrick Collins Regarding Derogatory Racial Statements and Certificate of Service : Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (edm, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 150 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Witness List
                                                                                                                      Witness List by Christopher Gahr; Certificate of Service. (gab, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 149 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        Statement Designating Deposition Testimony by Christopher Gahr (gab, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 148 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Defendant's Amended Exhibit List and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security.. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 147 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Defendant's Second Statement Regarding Exhibits and Notice of Submission of Defendant's Amended Exhibit List and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security.. filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              EO: Jury Selection/Trial set for 4/17/2007 09:00 AM is continued to 4/24/2007 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2007 09:00 AM is continued to 4/19/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [144] MOTION in Limine, [143] MOTION in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Patrick Collins Regarding Derogatory Racial Statements and Certificate of Service : Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (edm, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 144 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007, Terminated: 4/19/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence Relating to Gahr vs. San Bernardino City Unified School District (San Bernardino Superior Court Case Number SCVSS 33196)- by Christopher Gahr. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities# (2) Affidavit of Christopher Gahr# (3) Certificate of Service)(emt, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 143 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007, Terminated: 4/19/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Patrick Collins Regarding Derogatory Racial Statements and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 142 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Final Pretrial Conference-MagCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      EP: Final Pretrial Conference held. Mr. Aviles advised to make his request to continue the trial before Judge Michael Seabright. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 10:15 - 10:28) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        EO: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2007 at 11:00 AM is moved to 10:00 AM Hawaii time on the same day before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 3/11/2007, Entered: 3/11/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          EO: Final Pretrial Conference is continued from 3/8/2007 to 3/15/2007 at 11:00 AM Hawaii time before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Mr. Todd Withy to notify Mr. Moises Aviles. cc: Thomas Helper, Todd Withy. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            EO: Terminated: Settlement Conference set for 3/8/2007 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Final Pretrial Conference will remain on the calendar for 3/8/2007 at 11:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Any party participating by phone at the Final Pretrial Conference is to call Richlyn Young @ (808) 541-3090 or email prior to 3/8/2007. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 138 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Final PRETRIAL Statement by Christopher Gahr; Certificate of Service. (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                EO: Final Pretrial Conference is continued from 3/6/2007 to 3/8/2007 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                  COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [136] Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on: Moises Aviles, Eve Green, Michael Green, Denise Hevicon and Debra Kagawa. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (gls, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 136 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 2/5/07. (gls, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      EO: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2007 9:00 AM is reschuled to 4/5/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 134 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by G. Todd Withy on behalf of Christopher Gahr. (gls, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          EO: Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 4/17/2007 before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Settlement Conference set for 3/8/2007 11:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Final Pretrial Conference 4/12/2007 1:30 PM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 132 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Motion and ORDER for Appearance of Pro Hac Vice, Attorney Moises A. Aviles for Christopher Gahr added.. Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/26/07. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Moises A. Aviles# (2) Affidavit of G. Todd Withy# (3) Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice# (4) Certificate of service)(gls, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 131 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENTERING ORDER: New Dates Given:1.Jury trial on April 17, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. before JMS2.Final Pretrial Conference on March 6, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK3.Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A4.Final Pretrial Statement by February 27, 20078a.File Motions in Limine by March 20, 20078b.File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by April 10, 200712.Settlement Conference set for 3/8/2007 at 11:00 a.m. before BMK13.Settlement Conference statements by 3/1/200720.Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by April 3, 200721.File Final witness list by March 27, 200724.Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by March 20, 200725.Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by March 27, 200726.File objections to the Exhibits by April 3, 200728a.File Deposition Excerpt Designations by March 27, 200728b.File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by April 3, 200729.File Trial Brief by April 3, 200730.File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A (Judge BARRY M. KURREN )(edm, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 130 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              EP: Status Conference:Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Pro Hac Vice:Plaintiff Christopher Gahr - telephonically.Court signed in Open Court Plaintiff Christopher Gahrs Motion for Appearance of Pro Hac Vice.Plaintiffs Oral Motion to Continue Trial GRANTED. Trial continued to April 17, 2007 at 9:00 a.m.Court VACATED all pretrial dates associated with trial dates.Motion in Limine and Final Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, February 8, 2007 VACATED.Magistrate Judge Kurren to prepare new scheduling conference order. (Court Reporter Debra Chun.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                EP: Status Conference held in chambers. Christopher Gahr present telephonically. Special appearances by Todd Withy who was present in chambers and Moises Aviles telephonically.Mr. Withy to file motion for pro hac vice by 2:00 p.m. on January 26, 2007 and hearing will be held at 3:30 p.m. on January 26, 2007. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/12/07 (Plaintiff's Gahr's Motion for Continuance and Plaintiff Burno's Status Conference Regarding Settlement) before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Court Reporter: Jessica B. Cahill. 21pgs. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [123] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Personnel Decisions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2007 01:30 PM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (edm, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      EO:. Status Conference set for 1/25/2007 09:30 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT )(edm, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 125 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007, Terminated: 1/29/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support# (2) Declaration of Thomas A. Helper# (3) Exhibit "A")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 124 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                        Designation of Deposition Transcript Re: Filbert Carvalho by Department of Homeland Security..(gls, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 123 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007, Terminated: 4/20/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Personnel Decisions Other Than Plaintiff's Termination and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 122 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List by Department of Homeland Security..(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 121 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Defendant's Statement Regarding Exhibits, and Notice of Submission of Exhibit List and Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security... (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 120 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on MotiCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying Plaintiff Christopher Gahr's Motion to Continue Trial.. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 1/17/07. (gls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 119 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  EP: As to Plaintiff Christopher Gahr: [116] Plaintiff Christopher Gahr's Motion for Continuance (9:08 - 9:30) - DENIED. Jury Selection/Trial to remain on the 2/13/2007 calendar. Helper to prepare order to include notifying Mr. Gahr of his right to appeal. Final Pretrial Conference held. Gahr reminded to follow the pretrial deadlines. As to Plaintiff Lucas Bruno, III: Status Conference Re Settlement (9:32 - 9:50) - Mr. Bruno participated by phone. Per Bruno, settlement documents will be signed asap. cc: Dottie Miwa (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 9:08 - 9:50) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN) (rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [116] MOTION to Continue Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Christopher Gahr's Motion for Continuance of Trial and Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas A. Helper)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                    (FAXED) Plaintiff's Final Pretrial Statement by Charles Turner. (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 116 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                      (FAXED) Plaintiff's MOTION for Continuance by Christopher Gahr. (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        EO: Status Conference Re Settlement as to Lucas Bruno, III is set for 1/12/2007 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Notified: Thomas Helper, Denise Hevicon, Lucas Bruno. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 114 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Final Pretrial Conference-MagCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          EP: Final Pretrial Conference held. Christopher Gahr's Oral Motion to Continue the Trial for 6 Months DENIED. Gahr advised to file a written motion by 1/10/2007. Further Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2007 @ 9 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Gahr to file Final Pretrial Statements by 1/10/2007. Gahr reminded of upcoming deadlines. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 11 - 11:10) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            EP: Final Pretrial Conference continued to 1/5/2007 @ 11 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Notified: Christopher Gahr via email and left message with Christian Gahr (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 10:45 - 10:50) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 112 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security re [109] Pretrial Conference Statement Amended Certificate of Service re: Defendant's Final Pretrial Statement (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                EO: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2007 at 9:00 AM is moved to 10:30 AM the same day before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. cc: all parties (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2007 at 09:00 AM is continued to 1/4/2007 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN )(wnn, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 109 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pretrial Conference Statement by Department of Homeland Security Defendant's Final Pretrial Statement and Certificate of Service. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP:Further Settlement Conference and Rescheduling Conference held on 11/13/2006. Court and Counsel discussed Settlement. No Settlement at this time. Rescheduling Conference- Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 2/13/2007 before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (Court Reporter None.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN )(lls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS' LIEN; certificate of service by Lucas Bruno, III, Charles Turner, Tom Young. (cc: BMK) (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 106 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          EP: Further Status Conference Re Discovery - settlement agreement has been reached with all plaintiffs, except Christopher Gahr. Helper to prepare settlement documents forthwith.Further Settlement Conference and Rescheduling Conference with Christopher Gahr and Thomas A. Helper is set for 11/13/2006 @ 10 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 9:14 - 9:30) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO: Further Status Conference Re Discovery continued from 9/28/2006 to 10/31/2006 @ 9 a.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN at the agreement of the parties. cc: Denise Hevicon, Christopher Gahr (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Certificate of Service re: Defendant's Notice of Taking Video Tele-Conference Deposition (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 103 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [92] defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 08/21/06. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO: Terminated: Status Conference Re Dismissal set for 9/11/2006 @ 9:30 a.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 101 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery [92] - GRANTED. Discovery permitted to take place over the next 30 days for the limited purpose of determining whether there was a settlement and authority for a settlement on behalf of the of the defendants. Helper to prepare order.Further Status Conference Re Discovery set for 9/28/2006 @ 9 a.m., BMK.Mr. Gahr to notify his new counsel.(FTR-Ctrm C6F, 10:29 - 10:37.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO: [92] Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery [92] and Further Status Conference Re Discovery and Deadline Schedule set for 8/17/2006 at 9:00 AM is moved to 10:30 AM the same day before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP: Status Conference, Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery [92], and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Lucas Bruno, III and Christopher Gahr [96] - hearing held on 8/10/2006.Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Lucas Bruno, III and Christopher Gahr [96] GRANTED as to Christopher Gahr. Mr. Green will remain as counsel for Lucas Bruno, III. Green to prepare order.Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery [92] - hearing continued to 8-17-06 @ 9 a.m., BMK.Status Conference held. Further conference to determine discovery and deadline schedule with Christopher Gahr's new counsel set for 8-17-06 @ 9 a.m., BMK.Terminate:[96] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 9:06 - 9:31) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declarations of Michael Jay Green, Denise M. Hevicon and Debra A. Kagawa; Exhibits 1-11 [96] - by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young (SEALED) (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [96] MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel - Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2006 09:15 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of motion; MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL for Lucas Bruno III and Christopher Gahr; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Eve; Certificate of Service by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young. [SEALED] (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO: Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery [92] and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Lucas Bruno III and Christopher Gahr for 8/15/2006 at 9:00 AM is moved to 02:30 PM the same day before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN at the agreement of the parties. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy) Modified on 8/9/2006 (rwy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION TO FILE DECLARATIONS of Michael Jay Green, Denise M. Hevicon and Debra A. Kagawa under SEAL AND TO SHORTEN TIME of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Lucas BrunoIII and Christopher Gahr; Declaration of Michael Jay Green; Declaration of Denise M. Hevicon; Declaration of Debra A. Kagawa; ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Motion to File Declarations of Michael Jay Green, Denise M. Hevicon and Debra A. Kagawa under SEAL AND TO SHORTEN TIME of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Lucas BrunoIII and Christopher Gahr; Certificate of Service. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on August 7, 2006. [SEALED](bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on [92] Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery is set for 8/15/2006 09:15 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006, Terminated: 8/17/2006 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery; Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery# (2) Declaration of Thomas A. Helper# (3) Exhibit "A"# (4) Exhibit "B"# (5) Exhibit "C")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Eve M. Green (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO: Status Conference is set for 8/10/2006 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EP: Status Conference Re Settlement held on 7/14/2006. (FTR-Ctrm Chambers 11 - 11:55) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EO: Status Conference Re Settlement set for 7/14/2006 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO: Case settled. Trial date/deadlines vacated. Status Conference Re Dismissal set for 9/11/2006 at 09:30 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable to EVE M. GREEN. Forwarded mail to "Forward Address" on 07/11/2006. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Further Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. Further settlement on call.(FTR-Ctrm Chambers, 11 - 11:15) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO: Further Settlement Conference set for 7/7/2006 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on June 29, 2006. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [83] "Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 06/30/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO: Jury Selection/Trial continued from 8/1/2006 to 09:00 AM on 8/8/2006 before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. New deadlines given. Court to prepare an amended order. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP: Further Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. Further conference on call.(FTR-Ctrm Chambers 8:30 - 9, 1:30 -2:15) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 80 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP: Settlement Conference held on 6/22/2006. Further Settlement Conference set for 6/23/2006 at 8:30 AM with the defendants and 01:30 PM with all parties before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (FTR-Ctrm Chambers 9:30 - 10:15) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 78 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Final Pretrial Conference Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's FINAL PRETRIAL STATEMENT; # (1) Certificate of Service;# (2) Exhibit A;# (3) Exhibit B. (cc: BMK) (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pretrial Conference Statement by Department of Homeland Security Defendant's Final Pretrial Statement; Certificate of Service. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 76 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 75 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Re: Defendant Michael Chertoff's Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Request for Answers to Production of Documents and/or Things (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Re: Defendant Michael Chertoff's Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Answers to Production of Documents and/or Things (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Re: Defendant Michael Chertoff's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Production of Documents and/or Things (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Re: Defendant Michael Chertoff's Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Re: Defendant Michael Chertoff's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO: Final Pretrial Conference continued from 6/20/2006 to 6/22/2006 at 09:30 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN and Settlement Conference continued from 6/6/2006 to 6/22/2006 at 09:30 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN at the agreement of the parties. Pretrial Statements and Supplemental Scheduling Conference Statements due 6/19/2006. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN) (rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 67 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Defendant's [49] Motion for Summary Judgment on the claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson. Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on May 18, 2006. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 66 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Re: Defendant's Second Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Requet for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [67] "ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 05/18/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Statement of No Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young's STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION to Defendant's [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson; Certificate of Service. (cc: DAE) (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner and Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EO: Settlement Conference is continued from 5/31/2006 to 6/6/2006 at 01:30 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements may be submitted by 5/30/2006. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turnera and Tom Young. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Certificate of Service Re: Defendant's Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Christopher Gahr 5/4/06). (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Certificate of Service Re: Defendant's Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Christopher Gahr 5/4/06) (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Defendant's motion to compel Plainitff Christopher Gahr to Answer Interrogatories - re [55] Discovery Hearing. [order prepared by Defendant]. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on April 3, 2006. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 4/3/2006 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EP: Discovery Conference held on 3/30/2006. Plaintiff has 2 weeks to supplement answers to interrogatories. Thomas Helper to prepare order. Michael Green and Thomas Helper present. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record 1:27 - 1:35.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EO: Discovery Conference set for 3/30/2006 at 01:30 PM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN )(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Certificate of Service Re: Defendant's Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Tom Young 3/15/06) (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson, Certificate of Service: Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2006 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (edm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Concise Statement in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONCISE STATEMENT in Support re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson, Certificate of Service Defendant's Concise Statement of Material Fact in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson, Certificate of Service filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas Daquano# (2) Declaration of Thomas Mulhern# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006, Terminated: 5/18/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson, Certificate of Service by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Frank Paulson)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Certificate of Service Re: Def's Second Amended Ntc of Taking Deps Upon Oral Exam (Lucas Bruno III, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner & Charles Young) (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Homeland Security Certificate of Service Re: Def's Amended Ntc of Taking Dep Upon Oral Exam (Bruno III, Paulson, Turner & Young) (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Motion to withdraw as counsel; (Attachments: (1) declaration of David J. Gierlach; (2) order granting ex parte motion to withdraw as counsel; (3) certificate of service.) Attorney David J. Gierlach terminated. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 01/04/2006.(bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO: OSC set aside as to Frank Paulson. Per Thomas Helper, discovery was received. (FTR-Ctrm No record.) (Judge BARRY M KURREN )(rwy, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Charles Turner, Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EP: OSC held on 1/12/06. (FTR-Ctrm C6 2:15 - 2:20.) (Judge BARRY M KURREN )(rwy, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Respond to Defendants' Discovery continued from 1-6-06 to 1-12-06 @ 2 p.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren.cc: Michael Green, David Gierlach, Debra Kagawa, Denise Hevicon, Eve Green, Thomas Helper Show Cause Hearing set for 1/12/2006 02:00 PM before JUDGE BARRY M KURREN. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucas Bruno, III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, Tom Young (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2006 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M KURREN. Settlement Conference set for 5/31/2006 02:00 PM before JUDGE BARRY M KURREN. Discovery due by 6/2/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 12/30/2005. Motions due by 3/1/2006.Signed by Judge BARRY M KURREN on 12/07/2005. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Hearing set for 1/6/2006 02:30 PM before JUDGE BARRY M KURREN. Signed by Judge BARRY M KURREN on 12/05/2005. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry Discovery Conference held. Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Respond to Defendants Discovery Requests set for 1-6-06 @ 2:30 p.m., BMK. Dates given. Court to prepare scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on August 1, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before JMS 2. Final Pretrial Conference on June 20, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3.4. Final Pretrial Statement by June 13, 2006 5.?File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by December 30, 2005 6.?File other Non-Dispositive Motions by May 3, 2006 7.?File Dispositive Motions by March 1, 2006 8a. File Motions in Limine by July 11, 2006 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by July 18, 2006 11a. Plaintiff?s Expert Witness Disclosures by January 30, 2006 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 1, 2006 12. Discovery deadline June 2, 200613. Settlement Conference set for May 31, 2006 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. ?Settlement Conference statements by May 24, 2006 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by July 18, 2006 21. File Final witness list by July 11, 2006 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by July 5, 2006 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by July 11, 2006 26. File objections to the Exhibits by July 18, 2006 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by July 11, 2006 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by July 18, 2006 29. File Trial Brief by July 18, 2006 30. (Court Reporter no record; 9:27 - 9:33.) (gls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of hearing Discovery Conference is set for 12/1/05 @ 9:30 a.m. before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: Thomas Helper, Denise Hevicon) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re-assigning civil case by Judge David A. Ezra Case reassigned to Judge J. M. Seabright (cc: JMS, DM, BMK, KSC, LEK, CRM's all counsel) (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Department of Homeland and Thomas J. Ridge (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (emt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO : At the agreement of the parties, new dates given. Court to prepare an amended scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on April 18, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on March 7, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by February 28, 2006 5. 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by January 18, 2006 7. File Dispositive Motions by November 16, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by March 28, 2006 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by April 4, 2006 11a. 11b. 12. Discovery deadline February 17, 2006 13. Settlement Conference set for January 26, 2006 at 10:00 a.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by January 19, 2006 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by April 4, 2006 21. File Final witness list by March 28, 2006 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by March 21, 2006 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by March 28, 2006 26. File objections to the Exhibits by April 4, 2006 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by March 28, 2006 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by April 4, 2006 29. File Trial Brief by April 4, 2006 30. cc: Tammy Kimura ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 4/18/06 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 3/7/06 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Discovery ddl set for 2/17/06 ; file dispositive motions by 11/16/05 , ; settlement conference set for 10:00 1/26/06 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO: New dates given at the agreement of the parties. Court to prepare an amended scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on October 25, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on September 13, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by September 6, 2005 5. 6. 7. File Dispositive Motions by May 25, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by October 4, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by October 11, 2005 11a. 11b. 12. Discovery deadline August 26, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for July 26, 2005 at 1:30 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by July 19, 2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by October 11, 2005 21. File Final witness list by October 4, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by September 27, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by October 4, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by October 11, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by October 4, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by October 11, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by October 11, 2005 30. cc: Tammy Kimura ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 10/25/05 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 9/13/05 ; Discovery ddl set for 8/26/05 ; Motion filing ddl set for 5/25/05 ; settlement/status conference set for 1:30 7/26/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Thomas J. Ridge on 12/7/04 (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS issued as to defendant Thomas J. Ridge (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second AMENDED COMPLAINT; demand of jury trial; summons [4-1], [1-1] by plaintiffs Lucas Bruno III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner and Tom Young: TERMINATING - defendants James Loy, Jack Wagner, Doe Defts 1-100, U.S. Department of T, Transportation Secur, Howard Tagamori, Lowrey Leong, Patti Igarashi, Filbert Carvalho and Robert Au (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP: Status Conference Re Deadlines - no deadlines amended at this time. Pltfs will file an Amended Complaint. Defts will file a M/Sever. (Ct Rptr: No Record Taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO: Status Conference Re Deadlines set for 08/12/2004 03:30:00 PM before BMK. Denise Hevicon to notify parties. ; in court hearing set for 3:30 8/12/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on April 12, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on March 1, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by February 22, 2005 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by September 10, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by January 12, 2005 7. File Dispositive Motions by November 10, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by March 22, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by March 29, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 8, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 8, 2004 12. Discovery deadline February 11, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for February 17, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by February 10, 2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by March 29, 2005 21. File Final witness list by March 22, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by March 15, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by March 22, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by March 29, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by March 22, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by March 29, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by March 29, 2005 30. cc: Tammy Kimura ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 4/12/05 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 3/1/05 Discovery ddl set for 2/11/05 ; Motion filing ddl set for 11/10/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; rule 16 conference held on 9:00 4/26/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , adding attorney Thomas A. Helper ( Ct Rptr : No record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Filbert Carvalho on 3/24/04: first amended complaint (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Lowrey Leong on 3/24/04: first amended complaint (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Robert Au on 3/23/04: first amended complaint (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Howard Tagamori on 3/24/04: first amended complaint (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Patti Igarashi on 4/15/04: first amended complaint (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of defendants; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE - service of first amended complaint and summons executed upon defendant THOMAS J. RIDGE/Secretary via service upon U.S. Attorney's Office - Hawaii; Stephen Lehto signing for service; date of service: 02/27/04 (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE - service of first amended complaint and summons executed upon defendant Admiral JAMES LOY, Under-Secretary of Transportation for Security; Transportation Security Administration via service upon U.S. Attorney's Office - Hawaii; Stephen Lehto signing for service; date of service: 02/27/04 (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE - service of first amended complaint and summons executed upon defendant JACK WAGNER, Deputy Area Director for Western Region, Transportation Security Administration via service upon U.S. Attorney's Office - Hawaii; Stephen Lehto signing for service; date of service: 02/27/04 (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE - service of first amended complaint and summons executed upon defendant DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY via service upon U.S. Attorney's Office - Hawaii; Stephen Lehto signing for service; date of service: 02/27/04 (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE - service of first amended complaint and summons executed upon defendant U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION via service upon U.S. Attorney's Office - Hawaii; Stephen Lehto signing for service; date of service: 02/27/04 (afc) Modified on 04/08/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE - service of first amended complaint and summons executed upon defendant TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION via service upon U.S. Attorney's Office - Hawaii; Stephen Lehto signing for service; date of service: 02/27/04 (afc) Modified on 04/08/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                plaintiffs Lucas Bruno III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner, and Tom Young's EX PARTE MOTION for extension of time to serve defendants' declaration of Denise M. Hevicon; Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren granting ex parte motion for extension of time to serve defendants by extending (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS issued - as to 1st Amended Complaint (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EO: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 02/23/2004 09:00:00 AM to 04/26/2004 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Amended Complaint not yet served on all parties. Denise Hevicon to notify parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 4/26/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1]; demand for jury trial; summons - by plaintiffs Lucas Bruno III, Christopher Gahr, Frank Robert Paulson, Charles Turner and Tom Young: adding Jack Wagner, James Loy, Thomas J. Ridge (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for January 12, 2004 continued to February 23, 2004 @9:00 a.m. before Judge Kurren. The Complaint has not been served and an Amended Complaint will be filed very shortly.; rule 16 conference set for 9:00 2/23/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheudling Conference by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/12/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; Summons(es) issued (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 218888 (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?