Barrozo v. Barnhart
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00605-ACK-KSC
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marie E. Barrozo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Priest, Jr. +1 808 242 4936
v.
Social Security Administration Social Security Administration, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jo Anne B. Social Security Administration"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 11/4/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 865 - Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Maui
Terminated 11/1/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT In A Civil Case: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered pursuant to the, "Order Denying Plaintiff's Appeal Of The Decision Of The Commissioner Of The Social Security Administration", by the Honorable Senior U.S. District Judge Alan C. Kay, and filed on October 27, 2004. re [19-1] terminating case by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk, by Gary Santos, Deputy (gs)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004, Terminated: 11/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Appeal of the Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by Judge Alan C. Kay [1-1] (gs)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Reply
      Plaintiff's REPLY Brief; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Marie E. Barrozo re [17-1] (sealed)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Reply
        Defendant's Answering Brief; Certificate of Service by defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart re [15-1] (gs)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
          STIPULATION to Amend Briefing Schedule; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay (gs)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Miscellaneous Document
            Plaintiff's Opening BRIEF; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Marie E. Barrozo (gs)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Transcript
              TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record, dated February 25, 2004 - referred to ACK (eps) Modified on 04/02/2004
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Answer
                ANSWER by defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart [1-1]; certificate of service (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EP: Rule 16 scheduling conference; Parties have agreed to a breifing schedule as follows: Pltf's Opening brief due: May 31, 2004; Deft's resp due: June 30, 2004; Pltf's optl reply due: July 30, 2004; Counsel are agreeable to submittal on the briefs (Ct Rptr : no record) by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                    SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart; Certificate of Service (gs)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Report of Planning Meeting
                      REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Marie E. Barrozo (gs)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of Plaintiff; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Marie E. Barrozo (gs)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                          Process Receipt and RETURN executed upon defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart on 2/6/04 (gs)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                            Process Receipt and RETURN executed upon defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart on 2/2/04 (gs)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                              Process Receipt and RETURN executed upon defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart on 2/3/04 (gs)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                EO: At Plaintiff's Request, The Rule 16 Scheduling conference currently set for 1/26/04 at 9:00 a.m. has been continued to 9:00 2/26/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang; Mr. Priest to notify all parties by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay granting plaintiff's application to proceed without Prepayment of Fees [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                    LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003, Terminated: 12/17/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa PauperisCourt Filing
                                    Application by Plaintiff Marie E. Barrozo to proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit before Judge Alan C. Kay (sealed)
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/26/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (sealed)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003, Terminated: 10/27/2004 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (sealed)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?