Tuliloa, et al v. United States of Am
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00684-ACK-BMK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Fuata'i Tuato'o Tuliloa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
No Logo Tuliloa Tuliloa, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rai Saint Chu +5284 528 528 4000
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
Space Richard Turbin +5284 528 528 4000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 12/12/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Tort Claim
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 8/23/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice and ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay : terminating case (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 7/3/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EO: This case has Settled. Per Plaintiff's Counsel Richard Turbin the Settlement Documents have been signed but awaiting settlement check before dismissing the case. Trial, Final PreTrial Conference and Settlement Conference Dates have been vacated. () JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (afc)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      AMENDED Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP :Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. New dates given. Court to prepare an amended scheduling order. 1. Non-jury trial on September 13, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on August 2, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by July 26, 2005 5. 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by June 15, 2005 7. File Dispositive Motions by April 13, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by August 23, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by August 30, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 1, 2005 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 1, 2005 12. Discovery deadline July 15, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for July 1, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by June 24, 2005 20. 21. File Final witness list by August 23, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by August 16, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by August 23, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by August 30, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by August 23, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by August 30, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by August 30, 2005 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by August 30, 2005 ; Trial set for 9:00 9/13/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 8/2/05 ; Discovery ddl set for 7/15/05 ; Motion filing ddl set for 4/13/05 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 7/1/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO : Settlement Conference set for 12/07/2004 02:00:00 PM before BMK. Confidential Statements due by noon on 12/06/2004, Notified: Richard Turbin, Thomas Helper ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EO : Continued : [Final Pretrial Conference] from 12/21/2004 09:00:00 AM to 12/16/2004 09:30:00 AM before BMK. Pretrial Statements due 12-14-04. cc: Richard Turbin, Thomas Helper ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Certificate Of Service.
              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Am (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Fuata'i Tuato'o Tuliloa, plaintiff Tuliloa Tuliloa Jr. (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Fuata'i Tuato'o Tuliloa, plaintiff Tuliloa Tuliloa Jr. (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION to extend time for disclosing expert witnesses and expert witness reports and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : extended by one month; pltf discl due 9/9/04; deft discl due 10/8/04 (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP : Further Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. Further conference on call. ( Ct Rptr : no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EO : Further Settlement Conference set for 07/12/2004 at 9:30 a.m. is moved to 1:30 p.m. the same day before BMK. Thomas Helper to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EP : settlement conference held. Further Settlement Conference 7-12-04 @ 9:30 a.m., before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            EO : Continued : [Settlement Conference] from 06/10/2004 03:00:00 PM to 06/30/2004 11:00:00 PM before Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Am (eps)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare order. 1. Non-jury trial on February 8, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on December 21, 2004 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by December 14, 2004 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by July 9, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by November 10, 2004 7. File Dispositive Motions by September 8, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by January 18, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by January 25, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by August 9, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 8, 2004 12. Discovery deadline December 10, 2004 13. Settlement Conference set for June 10, 2004 at 3:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by June 3, 2004 20. 21. File Final witness list by January 18, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by January 11, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by January 18, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by January 25, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by January 18, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by January 25, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by January 25, 2005 30. rule 16 conference held on 9:30 3/8/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Trial set for 9:00 2/8/05 Judge Alan C. Kay , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 12/21/04 ; Discovery ddl set for 12/10/04 ; Motion filing ddl set for 9/8/04 ; settlement/status conference for 3:00 6/10/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Ct Rptr : C6 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EO : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3-8-04 @ 9 a.m. is moved to 9:30 a.m. the same day before BMK. Helper to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service by defendant United States of Am (eps)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff Fuata'i Tuato'o Tuliloa, plaintiff Tuliloa Tuliloa Jr. (eps)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Answer
                                          ANSWER by defendant United States of Am [1-1]; certificate of service (eps)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/8/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT; exhibita a-c; (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 219861 (fe)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?