Rodriguez et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:13-cv-01578
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 7:27 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Annette Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson Crowder & DeGaris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley Hodges DeGaris +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 adegaris@cwcd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@cwcd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Steen & Harrison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Van OSteen +1 602 252 8888 +1 602 274 1209 josteen@vanosteen.com
No Logo Roberto Rodriguez, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P Griffin +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 timothy.griffin@stinsonleonard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vaughn A Crawford +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 vcrawford@swlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 9 (Interim Protective Order). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement) Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8. (Forms for use by each plaintiff in providing preliminary and more extensive case-specific factual information in the above-referenced matter.). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Master Plaintiff's Preliminary Disclosure Form, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Fact Sheet)Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7. (Accepting Service of Process). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/19/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6. (Order governing procedures.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/21/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5. (Order Designating Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel Committee, Liaison Counsel, and Steering Committee & Defendants' Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel.) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/5/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4. Order Regarding Direct Filing of Cases into this Court Without Need to Associate Local Counsel. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/3/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3 (Agenda for September 9, 2013, Status Conference). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/5/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Annesley H DeGaris on behalf of Annette Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez. (DeGaris, Annesley) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Dellaccio on behalf of Annette Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez. (Dellaccio, Douglas) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. 1. INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE All parties shall appear for an initial status conference on Monday, September 9, 2013, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 7C, 7th Floor, Warren E. Burger Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Minnesota. An order setting forth an agenda and the related procedure for the initial status conference will be forthcoming. 2. EXTENSION AND STAY As was done for the Defendants' in Pretrial Order No. 1, each Plaintiff is granted an indefinite extension of time for filing any motion or responding to any pending motion until this Court, by subsequent order, sets a date by which Plaintiffs shall submit or respond to any motions. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/22/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 (Establishing Preliminary Procedures and Appointing Interim Counsel). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 07/05/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(rlb) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaints are hereby extended until such time that the Court establishes a time line for such responses. By separate order, the Court will set a status conference for a date and time to be determined in August for all cases in the MDL. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 07/01/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(rlb) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER re 13 Stipulation filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Annette Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 07/01/2013. (rlb) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Annette Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez. (Griffin, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Stryker Corporation. (Griffin, Timothy) Modified text on 6/28/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P Griffin on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (Griffin, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:13-cv-00783. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel per MDL List. (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) Transferring Case to the District of Minnesota re MDL-2441. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                      TEXT ONLY ORDER: ORDERED denying the parties' Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling by MDL Panel (Doc. 7). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including 7/1/13 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NRB) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING BY MDL PANEL by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Crawford, Vaughn) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Vaughn A Crawford on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (Crawford, Vaughn) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                            Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (MHU). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Submitted by Annette Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez. (OSteen, Jonathan) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4-19-13. (NRB) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-8061552. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-13-00783-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-8061552, filed by Annette Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez. (submitted by Jonathan OSteen) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/26/2013.] (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?