BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00080

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 1:09 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Beveridge & Diamond, PC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Austin Barker +1 202 789 6050 dbarker@bdlaw.com
Space Jayni A Lanham +1 410 230 1333 +1 410 230 1389 jlanham@bdlaw.com
v.
No Logo AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, Defendant
Centers For Disease Control And Prevention Centers For Disease Control And Prevention, Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marina Utgoff Braswell +1 202 514 7226 +1 202 514 8780 Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov
Space Shannon L. Fagan +1 202 252 2575 shannon.fagan@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shannon L. Fagan on behalf of AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Judith Kidwell (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
            REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Barker, David) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
              Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition by AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                    Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C. (See Docket Entry 14 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                      Memorandum in opposition re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, David) Modified event title on 5/13/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Katherine Norris, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants Summary Judgment)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.. (Barker, David) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE Joint Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, David) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to Complaint by AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2014. (Barker, David) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/23/2014. (Barker, David) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY served on 1/23/2014 (Barker, David) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 1/23/2014 (Barker, David) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/23/2014 (Barker, David) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jayni Anita Lanham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lanham, Jayni) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (5) Issued as to AGENCY FOR TOXIC SUBSTANCES AND DISEASE REGISTRY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3596996) filed by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 8 Summons Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, # 9 Summons Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry, # 10 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 11 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Barker, David) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?