Corso Properties, LLC, et al v. Branch Banking and Trust Compa
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 13-14907

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 5:21 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107386740 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
ORDER: The appellants' motion to reinstate the appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, as the appellants have not attempted to show extraordinary circumstances. [7074902-2] (SM and AJ)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107339453 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
Certificate of Service of Response to Motion filed by Attorney Joshua John Lewis for Appellee Branch Banking and Trust Company. (ECF: Joshua Lewis)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107339414 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
    RESPONSE to Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Corso Properties, LLC in 13-14907 [7074902-2] filed by Attorney Joshua John Lewis for Appellee Branch Banking and Trust Company. (ECF: Joshua Lewis)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107331848 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Corso Properties, LLC. Motion is Opposed. [7074902-1] (ECF: William Jones)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107311943 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
      ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellants Corso Properties, LLC and NDWC Investment Property, Inc. failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107311925 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
        ORDER: The parties' joint motion to amend the Notice of Removal and deem the Amended Notice of Removal to be part of the record on appeal is GRANTED. [7036492-2] (SM, WHP and AJ)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107283279 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
        Appellant's brief filed by Corso Properties, LLC and NDWC Investment Property, Inc.. Service date: 12/10/2013 [13-14907] Attorney for Appellee: Lewis - email; Attorney for Appellee: Rankin - US mail. (ECF: William Jones)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107270808 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
          Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney William T. Jones for Appellants Corso Properties, LLC and NDWC Investment Property, Inc..
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107270804 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
            ORDER: The motion for leave to file the civil appeal statement form out of time is granted. (AGW) [7035399-2]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107270760 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
              Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to supplement the record filed by Appellee Branch Banking and Trust Company. (ECF: Joshua Lewis)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107270736 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua John Lewis for Branch Banking and Trust Company. (ECF: Joshua Lewis)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107270732 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James S. Rankin, Jr. for Branch Banking and Trust Company. (ECF: Joshua Lewis)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107270095 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                    Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellants' brief due on 12/10/2013.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107269074 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                      JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Corso Properties, LLC and NDWC Investment Property, Inc..
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107269010 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                        MOTION for leave to file Appellants' First Amended Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time out of time filed by Corso Properties, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [7035399-1] (ECF: William Jones)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107264368 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William T. Jones for Appellants (ECF: William Jones)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107250323 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                            Attorney Reginald Anthony Jason Greene for Appellants Corso Properties, LLC and NDWC Investment Property, Inc. has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time.
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107231454 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                              CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Corso Properties, LLC and NDWC Investment Property, Inc. on 10/23/2013. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellants brief is due on or before 12/03/2013. The appendix is due on or before 12/10/2013.
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 892 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?