USA v. Renfrow et al
Criminal Case Kansas District Court, Case No. 2:12-cr-20041
District Judge Carlos Murguia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 12:43 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Renfrow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Thomas W. Bartee +1 913 551 6712 +1 913 551 6562 tom_bartee@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE (Form PS42) as to Anthony Renfrow. Modification of Conditions of Release effective 12/11/2015. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/11/2015. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None
    STATEMENT OF REASONS as to Anthony Renfrow regarding 90 Judgment. (NOTE: Access to this document is restricted to the USA and this defendant.) (mg) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      JUDGMENT as to Anthony Renfrow (1) on Count 1 of the 1 Indictment: Sentenced to 12 months and 1 day imprisonment. Three (3) years supervised release. $100 assessment. $1,692,803.26 restitution. Count 2 of the 1 Indictment: Dismissed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/2/2015. (mg) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Carlos Murguia: SENTENCING HEARING held on 11/30/2015 as to defendant Anthony Renfrow. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (ss) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Anthony Renfrow. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Sentencing set for 11/30/2015 at 01:30 PM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (ss) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
            PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Anthony Renfrow. (NOTE: Access to this document is restricted to the USA and this defendant.) (USPO) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE AND IMPOSITION OF FORFEITURE JUDGMENT granting the government's 85 Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture and Imposition of Forfeiture Judgment as to Anthony Renfrow. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 08/24/2015. (mg) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                MOTION for Final Order of Forfeiture and Imposition of Forfeiture Judgment by USA as to Anthony Renfrow. (Sommer, Robin) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE to Southern District of California of a Rule 20 Consent to Transfer as to William Fox. Docket sheet and documents attached. The District of Kansas will transmit the passport collected. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to [ksd_clerks_kansascity@ksd.uscourts.gov]. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (mm) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                    CONSENT TO TRANSFER JURISDICTION (Rule 20) to Southern District of California. Counts closed as to William Fox (2) Counts 1 and 2. (mm) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                      Unopposed NOTICE of Consent to Transfer Case for Plea and Sentencing under Rule 20 by USA as to William Fox. (Rask, Scott) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Anthony Renfrow re: 80 Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty. (mm) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          PETITION TO ENTER PLEA OF GUILTY AND ORDER ENTERING PLEA as to Anthony Renfrow (1) Count 1. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/21/15. (mm) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Carlos Murguia: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Anthony Renfrow held on 5/21/2015. The parties are to contact the court to set the case for sentencing after the PSI has been filed. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (ss) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER as to Anthony Renfrow - The Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/21/2015 at 10:30 AM HAS BEEN MOVED UP TO 9:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/13/15. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF INTENT TO CHANGE PLEA and NOTICE OF HEARING. The defendant Anthony Renfrow has notified the court on 5/12/15 that he intends to change his plea. The time from this notice until the change of plea hearing (including any continuances) is excludable time for speedy trial purposes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/21/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (ss) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 76 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRIAL ORDER Setting Trial Deadlines as to William Fox. Limine Conference set for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. See this Order for additional deadlines. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 04/29/2015. (mg) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TRIAL ORDER Setting Trial Deadlines as to Anthony Renfrow. Limine Conference set for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. See this Order for additional deadlines. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 04/29/2015. (mg) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 74 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Withdraw Shazzie Naseem as Attorney by William Fox. (Naseem, Shazzie) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Carlos Murguia: MOTION HEARING as to Anthony Renfrow held on 4/7/2015 denying 40 Motion to Dismiss Counts as to Anthony Renfrow (1). Jury trial to remain set 6/8/15 at 9:30 AM. Court Reporter Nancy Wiss. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Exhibits) (ss) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER finding as moot 70 Motion to Withdraw Document as to Anthony Renfrow. (1) Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/7/15. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 70 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Document as to William Fox (2). Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/6/15. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Withdraw Document 39 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Indictment For Lack of Jurisdiction, and WAIVER OF APPEARANCE by William Fox as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. (Naseem, Shazzie) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 68 Defendant's Motion to Continue Motion Hearing as to Anthony Renfrow (1), William Fox (2). Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. BOTH DEFENDANTS TO APPEAR IN PERSON AND WITH COUNSEL IN KANSAS CITY. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/4/15. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue Motions Hearing by William Fox as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. (Naseem, Shazzie) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendants Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 3/4/15 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 3/5/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (ss) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by USA as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Indictment For Lack of Jurisdiction, 40 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of the 1 Indictment. (Rask, Scott) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting as to Anthony Renfrow and William Fox, the government's 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Pretrial Motions. The government's response deadline is continued to 2/20/2015. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/18/2015. (mg) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by USA as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. (Rask, Scott) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 ENTERED: estimated trial time 14 days Discovery deadline 1/9/2015. Motions due by 2/4/2015. Response deadline 2/18/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/6/15. (mm) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Carlos Murguia: STATUS CONFERENCE as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox held on 12/15/2014-granting 50 Motion to Withdraw Tom Telthorst as Attorney as to William Fox (2). Motions due by 2/4/2015. Response deadline 2/18/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Excludable time designated from 12/15/14 to 6/8/15 as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (ss) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney William W Brown for William Fox. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/attorney-electronic-filing-registration-form as to William Fox (2) Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/12/14. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for attorneyWilliam W. Brown to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Credit Card Receipt Number 1083-3259142.) by William Fox. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(Naseem, Shazzie) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to William Fox re: 57 MOTION to waive appearance filed by William Fox. DEFENDANT WILLIAM FOX IS REQUIRED TO APPEAR. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/12/14. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: by attorney Shazzie Naseem appearing for William Fox. (Naseem, Shazzie) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Waive Appearance by William Fox. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Telthorst, Thomas) (Modified on 12/11/2014 to reflect this is a motion. (mg)) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Anthony Renfrow. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (ss) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER as to William Fox re: 50 MOTION to Withdraw Thomas R. Telthorst as Attorney filed by William Fox, The Motion Hearing set for 10/27/14 has been CONTINUED to 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. At the request of the parties. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/21/14. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 52 Motion to Continue as to William Fox (2). Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/25/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: change of plea and motion hearing 9/29/2014 as to Defendants Anthony Renfrow, William Fox cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Hearing on Withdrawal Motion by William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to William Fox. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. 50 MOTION to Withdraw Thomas R. Telthorst as Attorney: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (js) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw Thomas R. Telthorst as Attorney by William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER sustaining defendant Anthony Renfrow's 48 Motion to Continue and to Declare Time Excludable from Speedy Trial Act Deadlines. Hearing continued to 9/29/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. The time period from 06/24/2014 through 09/29/2014 shall be excluded when calculating speedy trial time. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 06/30/2014. (mg) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Continue and to Declare Time Excludable From Speedy Trial Act Deadline by Anthony Renfrow. (Bartee, Thomas) (Motion title modified on 06/24/2014. (mg)) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF INTENT TO CHANGE PLEA and NOTICE OF HEARING. The defendant William Fox has notified the court on 6/20/2014 that he intends to change his plea. The time from this notice until the change of plea hearing (including any continuances) is excludable time for speedy trial purposes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Change of Plea Hearing set for 9/29/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (js) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER granting 45 Motion to Continue. Time excluded from 4/30/2014 until 6/24/2014 as to William Fox (2). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. 40 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of the 1 Indictment, 39 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Indictment For Lack of Jurisdiction: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (js) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Anthony Renfrow. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. 40 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of the 1 Indictment: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (js) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox regarding 40 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of the 1 Indictment, 39 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Indictment For Lack of Jurisdiction. Response deadline 3/7/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox - status conference set for 1/27/2014 canceled. (js) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendants Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion hearing set for 1/27/2014 is converted to a status conference on 1/27 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (js) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of the 1 Indictment by Anthony Renfrow. (Bartee, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 1 Indictment For Lack of Jurisdiction by William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 37 Motion to continue motion deadlines as to Anthony Renfrow (1). Pretrial motions extended to 12/9/13. Responses due by 1/9/14. Pretrial motion hearing set for 1/27/14 at 9:30. The time period from October 21, 2013, through January 27, 2014, shall be excluded whencalculating speedy trial time. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/3/13. (mm) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION Join Co-Defendant's Motion to Continue by Anthony Renfrow. (Bartee, Thomas) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 35 Motion to Continue. Time excluded from 10/21/13 until 1/27/14 as to William Fox (2). Motions due by 12/9/2013. Response deadline 1/9/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/1/2013. (mm) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Motions Deadline by William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      WARRANT FOR ARREST RETURNED executed on 05/16/2012 as to William Fox. (mg) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE AND DESIGNATION OF COMPLEX CASE as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. Motions due by 10/7/2013. Response deadline 10/14/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Excludable started as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox 2/25/13 thru 10/21/13. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/8/2013. (mm) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Carlos Murguia: STATUS CONFERENCE as to Anthony Renfrow and William Fox held on 2/25/2013. The following deadlines were set: Motions due by 10/7/2013. Response deadline 10/14/2013. A Motion Hearing/Status Conference is set for 10/21/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (mem) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION To Waive Appearance by Anthony Renfrow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Waiver)(Bartee, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION Waiver of Appearance by William Fox. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF JURY TRIAL AND DESIGNATION OF COMPLEX CASE as to Anthony Renfrow, and William Fox. The time period from 10/12/2012 through 02/25/2013 shall be excluded when calculating speedy trial time. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/7/2012. (mg) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Carlos Murguia: MOTION HEARING as to Anthony Renfrow and William Fox held on 10/25/2012. The Court grants 23 Motion to Continue as to Anthony Renfrow (1) and William Fox (2). The Court designates this matter as a complex case pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(B)(ii). A formal Order memorializing that ruling to follow. A Status Conference is set for 2/25/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (mem) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 26 Motion for Order to Waive Appearace as to Anthony Renfrow (1); and 25 Motion for Excusal from Hearing as to William Fox (2). Defendant Anthony Renfrow and WIlliam Fox are excused from appearing at the 10/25/2012 motion hearing. Counsel will appear on their behalf. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/23/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Waive Appearance by Anthony Renfrow. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Bartee, Thomas) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Waive Appearance by William Fox. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Telthorst, Thomas) (Motion title modified on 10/21/2012. (mg)) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to defendants Anthony Renfrow and William Fox. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. 23 Joint MOTION to Continue Motions Deadline: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS set for 10/25/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (ses) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue Motions Deadline by William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/4/2012. (kao) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER changing motions deadlines as to Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. Pretrial Motions due by 10/15/2012. Response deadline 10/22/2012. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/7/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jw) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendants Anthony Renfrow, William Fox. The Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 will begin at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Motion Hearing RESET for 10/29/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jw) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/3/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cs) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER sustaining defendant William Fox's 16 Joint MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Motions Deadline as to Anthony Renfrow and William Fox. The pretrial motions deadline is extended to 10/17/2012. The response deadline is 10/24/2012. The pretrial motions hearing is continued to 10/30/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Trial is continued from 07/30/12 to 11/5/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. The time period from 07/17/2012 through 10/17/2012 shall be excluded when calculating speedy trial time. Signed by District Judge Beth Phillips on 7/5/2012. (mg) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) NOTICE & RECEIPT OF SURRENDERED PASSPORT as to William Fox. Passport Number 132903683 issued by USA. (Sealed User MM) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Motions Deadline by William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            GENERAL ORDER OF DISCOVERY & SCHEDULING as to William Fox: Motions due by 7/17/2012. Response deadline 7/20/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Estimated trial time 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/13/2012. (mg) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse: DISCOVERY HEARING as to William Fox held on 6/13/2012. Defendant William Fox appeared telephonically per Consent (ECF Doc. 11 ) along with attorney William W. Brown, who entered his appearance for defendant in the Southern District of California but has not yet moved for admission pro hac vice in the District of Kansas. Motions due by 7/17/2012. Response deadline 7/20/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Release order continued in effect; defendant released on $50,000.00 secured bond. (mg) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Anthony Renfrow - On the Court's own motion, the Response deadline is reset to 7/20/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/13/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mem) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: by attorney Thomas R. Telthorst appearing for William Fox. (Telthorst, Thomas) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO TELEPHONIC ARRAIGNMENT by William Fox. (mg) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 5(c)(3) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED as to William Fox from Southern District of California. (mm) Main document has been blocked from public view pursuant to the court's privacy policy. The redacted pleading is available here: (Additional # 1 Main Document - Redacted). (mh) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: by attorney Thomas W. Bartee appearing for Anthony Renfrow. (Bartee, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER: Requiring Payment by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/30/2012. (mg) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Anthony Renfrow (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) The Motion Hearing is re-set for 7/24/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Jury Trial is set for 7/30/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. (mem) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            GENERAL ORDER OF DISCOVERY & SCHEDULING as to Anthony Renfrow: Motions due by 7/17/2012. Response deadline 7/24/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Estimated trial time 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/30/2012. (mg) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Anthony Renfrow. (mg) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse: ARRAIGNMENT/DISCOVERY HEARINGS as to Anthony Renfrow (1) on Counts 1 and 2 of the Indictment held on 5/30/2012. Federal Public Defender appointed as counsel for defendant. Motions due by 7/17/2012. Response deadline 7/24/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 476 (KHV) before Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Release order continued in effect; defendant released on $10,000.00 unsecured bond. (mg) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 5(c)(3) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED as to Anthony Renfrow from Eastern District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Bond, # 3 Order of Release, # 4 Conditions of Release)(mm) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    WARRANT FOR ARREST RETURNED executed on 05/16/2012 as to Anthony Renfrow. (mg) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT as to Anthony Renfrow (1) on counts 1 and 2, and as to William "Bill" Fox (2) on counts 1 and 2. (mg) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 8,064 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?