Hesham Abbas v. Christopher Woleben
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-2288

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 9:02 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404714575 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL -- ENTRY STRUCK --[Edited 11/06/2013 by TW][999234677] [13-2288] Douglass Fisher
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999283943] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 02/14/14, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/14/2014. Response brief due 03/19/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-2288] (JHM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER filed [999270602] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 1/22/14, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/22/2014. Response brief due 02/24/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-2288] (TW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
        ORDER filed [999258147] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 1/6/14, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/06/2014. Response brief due 02/07/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-2288] (TW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
          ORDER filed [999244701] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 12/16/13, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/16/2013. Response brief due 01/17/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-2288] (TW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-2288] (LP)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Hesham M. Abbas. [13-2288] Douglass Fisher
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Hesham M. Abbas. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999234680] [13-2288] Douglass Fisher
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by D.Hayden Fisher for Hesham M. Abbas.[999234679] [13-2288] Douglass Fisher
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Yongyue Chen. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999232417] [13-2288] Charles Allen
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Charles M. Allen for Yongyue Chen.[999232416] [13-2288] Charles Allen
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 84 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?