UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COMET DISTRIBUTION LTD
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00681
District Judge Beryl A. Howell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 11:35 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/31/2013 Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ON MUSEUM OF DISCOVERY & SCIENCE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 15 Writ of Garnishment issued (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
    *SEALED* Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Museum of Discovery & Science, Vidal PD, Inc. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
      APPLICATION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment (CORRECTED) (NON-WAGE) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 CORRECTED WRIT OF CONTINUING NON-WAGE GARNISHMENT)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Oliver W. McDaniel on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney AUSA Judith Kidwell (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
          APPLICATION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Non-Wage) (Immediate Issuance Requested) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Continuing Non-Wage Garnishment (Clerk's ActionO, # 2 Notice of Continuing Non-Wage Garnishment, # 3 Notice About Available Exemptions, # 4 Request for Hearing or for Transfer, # 5 Answer of the Garnishee)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 9 Motion for Default Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 2/27/12. (alp) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
              MOTION for Default Judgment as to Comet Distribution by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Gregory Bokman, # 2 Exhibit ONE)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to COMET DISTRIBUTION LTD (rdj) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COMET DISTRIBUTION LTD served on 11/11/2011, answer due 12/2/2011. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Filing of Affidavit of Process Server by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Process Server))(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 and 3)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re Order,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 and 3)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 15, 2011. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against COMET DISTRIBUTION LTD (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?