In Re: USA v. Nguyen
Federal Court Proceeding Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:03-mc-00003-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space June Y.I. Ito +5411 541 541 1369
Office Hawaii
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 4/3/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra denying petition for naturalization [1-1]; certificate of service - on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Naturalization Service (fe)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra granting motion to supplement the record [1-1] [2-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
      MOTION to supplement the record [1-1] ; exhibits one through six; certificate of service - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003, Terminated: 4/3/2003 Miscellaneous Document
        FINDINGS of FACT, analysis and recommendation that the PETITION be denied; exhibit a; certificate of service - by USA - referred to DAE (eps)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 66 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?