System and method for providing configuration and sales information to assist in the development of insurance plans

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09739448
Examiner Natalie Pass, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Natalie Pass
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jerome Dale Johnson, North Mankato, MN, Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Berman +1 301 412 6500
Space Brian Hearn +1 540 899 6218
Space ABRAHAM HERSHKOVITZ +1 703 370 4800
Space Leila Naghibi +1 703 370 4800
Space Dinh Nguyen +1 703 370 4800
Space EUGENE RZUCIDLO +1 703 370 4800
Space Joseph Scafetta +1 703 370 4800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Jerome Dale Johnson, North Mankato, MN, ()
Filing Date December 18, 2000
Status On Appeal -- Awaiting Decision by the Board of Appeals
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P65332
Confirmation Number 3475
Group Art Unit 3686
Class / Sub-Class 705 / 4
Timeline
  Entries (331) Tab Overlap Assignments (8) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Docketing Notice Mailed to Appellant
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - AP_DK_M
Appeal Docketing Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Assignment of Appeal Number
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Appeal Awaiting BPAI Docketing
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Reply Brief Noted by Examiner
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Reply Brief Noted by Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Reply Brief Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - APRB
Reply Brief Filed (16 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Exam. Ans. Review Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Answer
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - APEA
Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief (38 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Appeal Brief Review Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - AP.B
Appeal Brief Filed (39 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Appeal Brief Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N/AP
Notice of Appeal Filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Appeal Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - AF/D
Affidavit-submitted prior to Mar 15, 2013 (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/14/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Post Card
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - OA.POSTCARD
A courtesy postcard sent by USPTO to users who opt-in for e-Office Action (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/6/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (18 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SA..
Supplemental Response or Supplemental Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Supplemental Response
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (138 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (29 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/8/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/8/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Appeal Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N/AP
Notice of Appeal Filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (29 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Incoming Letter Pertaining to the Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (16 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Finish
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (20 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - EBCC.AD
Notice of Change of Address placed in File Wrapper due to EBC Customer Number update (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (17 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (18 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (34 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement considered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (18 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/12/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - EBCC.AD
Notice of Change of Address placed in File Wrapper due to EBC Customer Number update (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (18 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (18 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (16 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 26 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?