Preparation of ketorolac
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09754529
Examiner Taofiq A Solola, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter J. Harrington, Louisville, CO, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Genentech, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Buckwalter +1 650 225 8018
Space David Chang +1 650 855 5316
Space Grant Green +1 925 730 8232
Space Robert Hall +1 650 225 8203
Space George Jr Johnston +1 973 235 3656
Space Jennifer Kisko +1 973 235 3657
Space Samuel Megerditchian +1 212 407 7644
Space PATRICIA S. ROCHA-TRAMALONI +1 201 235 2441
Space DENNIS P. TRAMALONI +1 973 235 4475
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Peter J. Harrington, Louisville, CO, ()
Filing Date January 1, 2001
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 13265-1245D1
Confirmation Number 2614
Group Art Unit 1626
Class / Sub-Class 548 / 516
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
    Correspondence Address Change
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
      Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
        Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
          Issue Notification Mailed
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
            Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
              Issue Fee Payment Verified
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Workflow - Customer Service Request - Begin
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Workflow - Customer Service Request - Finish
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Mail Notice of Allowance
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Application Dispatched from OIPE
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Correspondence Address Change
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Correspondence Address Change
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Initial Exam Team nn
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?