Haili, et al v. Greenspan, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00089-DAE-LEK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elizabeth Ann Ho'oipo Kalaena'auao Pa Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence I. Kawasaki +5337 533 533 7434 seitzoffice@yahoo.com
Space Eric A. Seitz +5337 533 533 7434 eseitzatty@yahoo.com
No Logo Kahilihiwa Kipapa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence I. Kawasaki +5337 533 533 7434 seitzoffice@yahoo.com
Space Eric A. Seitz +5337 533 533 7434 eseitzatty@yahoo.com
No Logo Momi Haili, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence I. Kawasaki +5337 533 533 7434 seitzoffice@yahoo.com
Space Eric A. Seitz +5337 533 533 7434 eseitzatty@yahoo.com
v.
Greenspan, Alan Greenspan, Alan, Defendant
Officially listed as "Alan Greenspan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine H. Wheatley +1 202 452 3779 +1 202 736 5615 kit.wheatley@frb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Michael Burke +5412 541 541 2850 mike.burke@usdoj.gov
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben S. Bernanke"

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine H. Wheatley +1 202 452 3779 +1 202 736 5615 kit.wheatley@frb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Michael Burke +5412 541 541 2850 mike.burke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Doe Associations 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Donald L. Kohn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine H. Wheatley +1 202 452 3779 +1 202 736 5615 kit.wheatley@frb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Michael Burke +5412 541 541 2850 mike.burke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Edward M. Gramlich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine H. Wheatley +1 202 452 3779 +1 202 736 5615 kit.wheatley@frb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Michael Burke +5412 541 541 2850 mike.burke@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Mark W. Olson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine H. Wheatley +1 202 452 3779 +1 202 736 5615 kit.wheatley@frb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Michael Burke +5412 541 541 2850 mike.burke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine H. Wheatley +1 202 452 3779 +1 202 736 5615 kit.wheatley@frb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Michael Burke +5412 541 541 2850 mike.burke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Susan Schmidt Bies, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine H. Wheatley +1 202 452 3779 +1 202 736 5615 kit.wheatley@frb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Michael Burke +5412 541 541 2850 mike.burke@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 2/6/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 430 - Banks and Banking
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County Honolulu
Terminated 2/25/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 USCA Order
CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees on appeal; attest date 12/15/04 by Cathy Catterson, Clerk, 9th CCA cc: DAE, CRM, all counsel (sm)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/A.F. Chang, Deputy Clerk - Pursuant to the "Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction" filed on February 23, 2004, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED and the Action is DISMISSED without Prejudice. terminating case (cc: all counsel) (afc)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER denying plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and dismissing case [4-1] by Judge David A. Ezra - [action dismissed without prejudice] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 Transcript
        ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed (Ct Rptr Stephen B. Platt) taken on February 18, 2004 (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP :: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. - taking under advisement on the motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] ( Ct Rptr : Steve Platt) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth Ann Ho'oipo Kalaena'auao Pa Martin; certificate of service - filed by plaintiffs [4-1] (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Table of contents; table of authorities; defendants' COUNTER-OPPOSITION to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1]; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (afc)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Amended Complaint
                Plaintiffs' FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT for writ of mandamus, declaratory judgment and injunction; verification of Elizabeth Ann Ho'Oipo Kalaena'auao Pa Martin; summons (issued) [1-1]; ADDING DEFENDANTS: Donald L. Kohn (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004, Terminated: 2/23/2004 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiffs for preliminary injunction ; declaration of Ian Chan Hodges; exhibits 1-3; declaration of Robert L. Kuttner (facsimile signature); memorandum of law; certificate of service - set for 1:30 2/18/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                    EX PARTE MOTION by plaintiffs' to shorten time for hearing plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction ; affidavit of Eric A. Seitz; ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra - granting ex parte motion - hearing to be set for 1:30 02/18/04 (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 5/3/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Complaint
                        VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, declaratory judgment, and injunction; verification of Elizabeth Ann Ho'oipo Kalaena'auao Pa Martin; summons (summons issued) (Summons(es) issued) (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Filing Fee Received
                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 220937 (afc)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 231 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?