State Farm Fire Cas v. Thomason, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00100-ACK-BMK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

State Farm Fire And Casualty Company State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tom Petrus & Miller LLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard B. Miller +7925 792 792 5809 rmiller@tpm-hawaii.com
Space Patricia K. Wall kwall@tpm-hawaii.com
v.
No Logo Association of Apartment Owners of Twin Towers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl D. Soto +5237 523 523 7649
No Logo Fidelity Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Richelle M. Thomason, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Hawaii

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard H. Thomason +5872 587 587 2900 richard.h.thomason@hawaii.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 2/10/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 2/26/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Clerks Judgment
JUDGMENT - that Summary Judgment is granted in favor of Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and against Defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Twin Towers, Inc.; Default Judgment is entered against Defendants Richelle M. Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc. (eps )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
    COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - [30] Clerk's Judgment, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 2/26/07 (Soto & Thomason). Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eps )
      LREF
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST RICHARD H. THOMASON WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge ALAN C KAY on 2/20/07. (eps ) - Richard H. Thomason terminated
        LREF
        Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 LetterCourt Filing
        Letter from Counsel - Tom Petrus & Miller to Judge Kurren, dated 2/8/2007 (eps ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2007 (eps, ).
        LREF
        Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
        EP: Status Conference Re Defendant Richard H. Thomason - a Stipulation for Dismissal is to be submitted this week. Ms. Wall to contact the parties. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record 9:10 - 9:13) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Notice of Hearing.
          NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference regarding the Status of this case as to Defendant Richard H. Thomason set for 2/5/2007 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (lls, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP :Plaintiff State Farm & Casualty Company's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant The Association of Apartment Owners of Twin Towers, Inc. And Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant's Richelle M. Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc.-is hereby Granted. Court to prepare Written Order as to this Motion. [17-1] ( Ct Rptr : ESR 9:35 -9:37 a.m.) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (gab) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2007 (eps, ).
              LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to defendant the Association of Apartment of Twin Towers, Inc. and granting motion for default judgment as to Defendants Richelle M. Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc. [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (emt) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2007 (eps, ).
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 2/22/2005 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 3/18/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                  WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by plaintiff State Farm Fire Cas withdrawing motion for summary judgment as to defendant Richard H. Thomason [18-1] filed 11/1/2004; certificate of service (gab) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2007 (eps, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                    NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on motion for summary judgment as to defendant Richard H. Thomason [18-1] motion for summary judgment as to defendant the Association of Apartment Owners of Twin Towers, Inc. and for default judgment as to Defendants Richelle M. Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc. [17-1] continued from 1/31/2005 to 2/22/05 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Alan C. Kay (gab).
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP: Rule 16 scheduling conference continued to 2/22/05 @ 9:00 a.m., BMK (Ct Rptr: no record) by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                        Separate Concise STATEMENT of undisputed facts by plaintiff State Farm Fire Casualty in support of 1) motion for summary judgment as to defendant Richard H. Thomason [18-1], and 2) motion for judgment as to defendant the Association of Apartment of Twin Towers, Inc. and for default judgment as to Defendants Richelle M. Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc. [17-1]; declaration of Jennifer Wilson; exhibits A through and K; certificate of service (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff State Farm Fire Casalty Company for summary judgment as to defendant Richard H. Thomason memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service; set for 9:30 1/31/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004, Terminated: 2/22/2005 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff State Farm Fire Casalty Company for summary judgment as to defendant the Association of Apartment Owners of Twin Towers, Inc. and for default judgment as to Defendants Richelle M. Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc. Memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service; set for 9:30 1/31/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Answer
                              Defendant The Association of Apartment Owners of The Twin Towers, Inc. ANSWER to complaint filed on February 10, 2004; Certificate of service to [1-1] (gs)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                FIRST STIPULATION to extend dispositive motions deadline; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - filed by plaintiff Dispositive Motion filing ddl set for 11/1/04 (afc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATION to set aside the default judgment of The AOAO of The Twin Towers, Inc.; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay; certificate of service - filed by deft AOAO Twin Towers setting aside default [12-1]; deft AOAO Twin Towers Inc. shall file ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY 10/25/04 (afc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EP : rule 16 scheduling conference continued to 9:00 11/15/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Dispositive motion as to Richard Thomason to be filed by 9/15/04; Richard Miller to proceed with the motions for default judgment against the other defendants. ; Motion filing ddl set for 9/15/04 ( Ct Rptr : no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                      Request to Clerk for Entry of Default of Defendant the Association of Apartment Owners of Twin Towers, Inc. as to the complaint for declaratory judgment filed on 2/10/2004; declaration of counsel; exhibit A; Entry of DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Twin Towers, Inc. as to the complaint for declaratory judgment filed on 2/10/04; certificate of service (gab)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff State Farm Fire Casualty; certificate of service (gab)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 5/13/04 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 5/14/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                            ENTRY OF DEFAULT of defendants Richelle M. Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc. as to the complaint for declaratory judgment filed on February 10, 2004; certificate of service - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/George Bartels, Deputy Clerk [9-1] (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Request
                                              REQUEST to clerk for ENTRY OF DEFAULT of defendants Richelle Thomason and Fidelity Management, Inc. as to the complaint for declaratory judgment filed on February 10, 2004; declaration of counsel; exhibit A - by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed on 4/5/04 upon Leah at City Properties, Inc. (gab)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  EO : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 5/10/04 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 5/13/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren BMK not available on 5/10/04. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Answer
                                                    ANSWER by defendant Richard H. Thomason to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed 2/10/04 [1-1]; certificate of service (sealed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Twin Towers, Inc. on 2/16/04 at 409 Opihikao St (fe)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004, Terminated: 4/19/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Fidelity Management, on 2/27/04 through Richelle Thomason (fe)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004, Terminated: 4/19/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Richelle M. Thomason on 2/27/04 (fe)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 5/10/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment; (Summons(es) issued) (fe) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2007 (eps, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 221011 (fe)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Space Space

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?