In Re: P.F. Three Partners v. Upland Partners, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00158-SOM-LEK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo P.F. Three Partners, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Richard B. Ferguson, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessner Umebayashi Bain & Matsunaga

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Guttman +1 808 536 1900 +5297 529 529 7177 kdubm_bk@kdubm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyle S. Hosoda & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lyle S. Hosoda lsh@hosodalaw.com
No Logo Richard Emery, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessner Umebayashi Bain & Matsunaga

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Guttman +1 808 536 1900 +5297 529 529 7177 kdubm_bk@kdubm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyle S. Hosoda & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raina P.B. Gushiken rpbg@hosodalaw.com
Space Lyle S. Hosoda lsh@hosodalaw.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 3/4/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Honolulu
Terminated 6/18/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case BK99-03746[US BK Ct, HI]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Vacating Order Approving Settlement and Remanding Matter by Judge Susan O. Mollway remanding the matter back to Bankruptcy Court [Appeal [2-1] (cc: all counsel) (sm)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : Appeal Hearing - Arguments. Court remands this case to the Bankruptcy Court. Court to prepare a written order by the end of the week. ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (sm)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Appellants Reply Brief
      P. R. Three Partners' REPLY BRIEF to Appellee Trustee Richard Emery's Answering Brief; Declaration of David C. Farmer; Exhibits A & C; Certificate of Service (sm)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Answer
        Appellee Trustee Richard Emery's answerign brief; Affidavt of Raina P. B.Mead; exhibits a-3; certificate of service (sm)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Miscellaneous Document
          APPENDIX to appellee Trustee Richard Emery's Answering Brief; Certificate of Service (sm)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Joinder
            Appellee Richard B. Ferguson's JOINDER in Appellee Trustee Richard Emery's Answering Brief Dated April 30, 2004; Certificate of Service (sm)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Miscellaneous Document
              APPENDIX to P.F. Three Partners' Opening Brief on Appeal from Order Granting Motion for Approval of a Compromise Settlement of Richard Ferguson's Claims Against the Debtor, Entered on December 3, 2003; and Order Denying P. F. Three Paratners' Motion for Reconsideration of Settlement Between Trustee and Richard Ferguson entered on January 8, 2004 (sm)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Appellants Reply Brief
                P.F. Three Partners' Opening Brief on Appeal from Order Granting Motion for Approval of a Compromise Settlement of Richard Ferguson's Claims Against the Debtor, entered on December 3, 2003; and Order Denying P. F. Three Partners' Motion for Reconsideration of Settlement Between Trustee and Richard Ferguson, Entered on January 8, 2004; Certficate of Service (sm)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO :Appeal Hearing set for 06/15/2004 03:00:00 PM before SOM. cc: all counsel, and Judge Mollway's Chambers. - setting hearing on appeal bankruptcy [2-1] 3:00 6/15/04 ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION re: extension of briefing deadlines and ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway : 1) appellant shall serve and file brief by 4/15/04; 2) appellees shall serve and file briefs by 4/30/04; 3) appellant may serve and file a reply brief by 5/3/04; no further briefs may be filed except with leave of this court (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 RemarkCourt Filing
                      Election to have Appeal heard by District Court - referred to Judge Susan Oki Mollway (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy
                        NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Transmittal of Documents
                          TRANSMITTAL of documents - received from US Bankruptcy Court, BK Case No. 97-03746: Docket Sheets; Notice of Appeal; Order of Judgment appealed; Transcripts designated by the parties as items on appeal haven been filed with the Banktupcty Court; Statement of Issues; Statement of items for Record on Appeal (fe)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 143 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?