State Farm Fire Cas v. Furukawa, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00236-DAE-LEK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
State Farm Fire And Casualty Company State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tom Petrus & Miller LLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark B. Desmarais mdesmarais@tpm-hawaii.com
Space Richard B. Miller +7925 792 792 5809 rmiller@tpm-hawaii.com
Space Patricia K. Wall kwall@tpm-hawaii.com
v.
No Logo Lawrence Suemitsu Furukawa, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 4/15/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Honolulu
Terminated 7/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Default -Judgment
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that default judgment is hereby entered against Lawrence Suemitsu Furukawa, pursuant to the "Findings and Recommendation to Grant Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company's Motion for Default Judgment; Certificate of Service" filed on June 24, 2005 and the "Order Adopting Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation" filed on July 18, 2005. [29-1], [28-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (emt)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER adopting magistrate's findings and recommendation by Judge David A. Ezra [28-1] (cc: all counsel) (emt)
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Findings and RecommendationsCourt Filing
      FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to grant plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company's motion for default judgment; certificate of service [25-1] by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel, DAE) (emt)
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP :Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company's Motion For Default Judgment - Defendant Lawrence Suemitsu Furukawa not present. Three calls made, no response. Motion Granted and terminated. Miller to prepare Findings and Recommendation. Trial date and all deadlines are Vacated. [25-1] ; ( Ct Rptr : C7 9:37-9:39) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO : Final Pretrial Conference set for 04/28/2005 09:00:00 AM before LEK is Vacated. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff State Farm Fire Casualty Company for default judgment ; certificate of service set for 9:30 5/13/05 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EO : Settlement Conference set for 04/15/2005 02:00:00 PM before LEK is Vacated. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by Judge David A. Ezra [15-1] (cc: all counsel) (emt)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO : Continued : [Final Pretrial Conference] from 04/26/2005 09:00:00 AM to 04/28/2005 09:00:00 AM before LEK. Final Pretrial Statements are now due 4/21/05. cc: all counsel ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (emt)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
                    STIPULATED JUDGMENT for declaratory relief in favor of plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and against defendant Carol Mitsuko Furukawa by Judge David A. Ezra terminating party Carol Mitsuko Furukawa (emt)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EO :Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company's Motion for Summary Judgment set for 03/07/2005 10:30:00 AM before DAE- DEEMED WITHDRAWN, PARTIES STIPULATED, NO HEARING. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (emt)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EO :Continued : [Settlement Conference] from 03/22/2005 02:00:00 PM to 04/15/2005 02:00:00 PM before LEK. Confidential Settlement Conference statements are now due 4/8/05. cc: all counsel ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 4/15/05 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi () Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EO : ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 3/22/05 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Description not available
                            DISCLOSURE of expert witnesses by plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company's; certificate of service (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                              Plaintiff's Separate Concise Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Affidavit of Jennifer Wilson; Exhibits 1-3; Certificate Pursuant to L.R. 7.5; Certificate of Service [15-1] (sm)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004, Terminated: 3/14/2005 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff State Farm Fire Casualty Company for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service set for 10:30 3/7/05 before Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EO : Continued : [Final Pretrial Conference] from 04/19/2005 09:00:00 AM to 04/26/2005 09:00:00 AM before LEK. Final Pretrial Statements are now due 4/19/05. cc: all counsel ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 4/26/05 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi () Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EO :Continued : [Settlement Conference] from 01/05/2005 02:00:00 PM to 01/14/2005 02:00:00 PM before LEK. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are now due 1/7/05. cc: all counsel ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 1/14/05 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi () Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. 1. Non-jury trial on June 1, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on April 19, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by April 12, 2005 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by October 29, 2004 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by March 2, 2005 7. File Dispositive Motions by December 29, 2004 8a. File Motions in Limine by May 10, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by May 17, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 29, 2004 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 29, 2004 12. Discovery deadline April 1, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for January 5, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by December 29, 2004 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by May 10, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by May 3, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by May 10, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by May 17, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by May 10, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by May 17, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by May 17, 2005 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by May 17, 2005 Other Matters: A copy of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties. ; Trial set for 9:00 6/1/05 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 4/19/05 ; Discovery ddl set for 4/1/05 ; Motion filing ddl set for 12/29/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 1/5/05 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : Ct7, no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Certificate of Service by defendant Carol Mitsuko Furukawa (sm)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Certificate of Service by plaintiff State Farm Fire Casualty Company (sm)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                              Request to Clerk for ENTRY OF DEFAULT of defendant Lawrence Suemitsu Furukawa as to the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Filed on April 15, 2004; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibit A; Entry of Default of Defendant Lawarence Suemitsu Furukawa as to the Complaint for Declarartory Judgment Filed on April 15, 2004; Certificate of Service by Walter A.Y.H.Chinn, Clerk; by plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (sm)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Lawrence Suemitsu Furukawa thru Carol Furukawa on 4/16/04 (sm) Modified on 06/25/2004
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  EO :Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 07/12/2004 09:00:00 AM to 07/26/2004 09:00:00 AM before LEK. cc: all counsel rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/26/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi () JUDGE Mag Leslie E. Kobayashi (sm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Answer
                                                    Defendant Carol Mitsuko Furukawa Answer to Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed on April 15, 2004; [1-1] Certificate of Service (sm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Carol Mitsuko Furukawa on 4/16/04 - left copies at the defendant Carol Mitsuko's dwelling house or usual place of abode with a person of suitable age and discretion then residing therein. (sm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Carol Mitsuko Furukawa on 4/16/04 - served personally upon the defendant (sm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/12/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment; summons (Summons issued) (afc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                              FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 222201 (afc)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?