Caplan v. Thompson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00251-ACK-LEK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Steven R. Caplan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence I. Kawasaki +5337 533 533 7434 seitzoffice@yahoo.com
Space Eric A. Seitz +5337 533 533 7434 eseitzatty@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Tommy G. Thompson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 4/20/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County Honolulu
Terminated 12/27/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Correspondence
9CCA service list re: 9CCA Order, doc [23] (afc)
    LREF
    Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 USCA Order
    Certified Copy of 9CCA ORDER as to [21] Notice of Appeal - appellant's motion to dismiss appeal is granted. (afc)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [23] USCA Order has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on August 28, 2006 and to those addresses of record as reflected on the 9CCA service list. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Interoffice delivery: Chambers of Judge Alan C. Kay, Chambers of Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi, respective CRM's. (afc)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
        APPEAL number 05-15285 received from 9CCA regarding [21-1] (afc)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005, Terminated: 8/28/2006 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL, etc. and copy of docket sheet sent to 9th CCA [21-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 8/28/2006 Appeal - Miscellaneous
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Steven R. Caplan from Dist. Court decision [20-2]; representation statement; certificate of service [9CCA 05-15285] (gab) Modified on 02/24/2005
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Filing Fee Received
              FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 255.00, receipt # 227724 (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                JUDGMENT In A Civil Case: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered pursuant to the, "Order Affirming Final Decision Of The Secretary", by the Honorable Senior U.S. District Judge Alan C. Kay, and filed on December 17, 2004. re [19-1] terminating case by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk, by G. Santos, Deputy (gs)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER Affirming Final Decision Of The Secretary by Judge Alan C. Kay [1-1] (gs)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                    LETTER re questions ask by the court to AUSA Thomas A. Helper - on behalf of plaintiff [17-2] (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP: Oral Argument was held. Defendant's Counsel Thomas Helper will notify the Court regarding the Defendant's Response to the Court's Questions. This matter is hereby under submission [1-1] (Ct Rptr : ESR-Gary Santos) JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                        NOTICE of hearing: Oral Argument previously set for Monday December 6, 2004 at 9:30 is now set for Monday December 6, 2004 at 10:30 a.m. before the Honorable Alan C. Kay (cc: Eric Seitz, Esq.; Thomas Helper, Esq.) (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Answer
                          ANSWERING BRIEF by defendant Tommy G. Thompson; table of contents; table of authorities; certificate of service [1-1] (afc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                            Plaintiff's OPENING BRIEF; certificate of service (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Deadlines issued. Plaintiff's Opening Brief is due 9/1/04. Defendant's Responsive Brief is due 10/1/04. Plaintiff's Optional Reply Brief is due 11/1/04. Oral Argument set for 9:30 12/6/04 before Judge Alan C. Kay. cc: all counsel (Ct Rptr: Courtroom 7 - No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                EO: continued [Rule 16 scheduling conference] from 8/2/04 9:00 a.m. to 8/9/04 9:00 a.m. before LEK by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                  Plaintiff's SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Certificate of Service (gs)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                    SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of Defendant; Certificate of Service by defendant Tommy G. Thompson (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                      PROOF OF SERVICE; exhibits A-C - SERVICE of complaint and summons executed via certified mail upon the following: (1) defendant Tommy G. Thompson, Secretary of Health & Human Services on 04/21/04; RRR: 04/27/04; (2) John Ashcroft, Attorney General of the United States on 04/21/04; RRR: 04/27/04; and (3) Edward H. Kubo, Jr., U.S. Attorney General - Hawaii on 04/21/04; RRR: 04/22/04 (afc)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Transcript
                                        TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS - RECORD OF THE APPELLATE DIVISION in Volume 4 of 4 of the Administrative Record before The Department of Health and Human Services, Departmental Appeals Board (afc) Modified on 06/22/2004
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Transcript
                                          TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS - PART TWO - RECORD OF THE CIVIL REMEDIES DIVISION in Volume 3 of 4 of the Administrative Record before The Department of Health and Human Services, Departmental Appeals Board (afc) Modified on 06/22/2004
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Transcript
                                            TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS - PART ONE - DECISION in Volume 2 of 4 of the Administrative Record before The Department of Health and Human Services, Departmental Appeals Board (afc) Modified on 06/22/2004
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Transcript
                                              TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS - INDEX in Volume 1 of 4 of the Administrative Record before the Department of Health and Human Services, Departmental Appeals Board (afc) Modified on 06/22/2004
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Answer
                                                ANSWER by defendant to complaint; certificate of service [1-1] (afc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  EP: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 07/19/2004 09:00:00 AM to 08/02/2004 09:00:00 AM before LEK. cc: all counsel () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/19/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (gs)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT Summons issued (gs)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 222453 (afc)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?