Sekiya v. Rumsfeld
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00297-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Linda D. Sekiya, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Venetia K. Carpenter-Asui +5236 523 523 6446 vkcarpenter1@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Donald H. Rumsfeld, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/6/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 3/24/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-15887'['9CCA']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned. (afc)
    LREF
    Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 USCA Judgment
    USCA JUDGMENT as to [47] Notice of Appeal filed by Linda D. Sekiya. (Attachments: # (1) USCA Opinion, # (2) USCA Transmittal Sheet and Service List) ~ Appeal is DISMISSED ~ (afc)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Court's Certificate of Service
      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [54] USCA Judgment has been served upon all counsel of record who, as Registered Participants of CM/ECF, received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
        LREF
        Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Acknowledgment of Service
        9CCA ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Records re [52] Appeal Record Sent to USCA, [47] Notice of Appeal. (afc)
          LREF
          Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006, Terminated: 1/25/2008 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [47] Notice of Appeal (afc)
            LREF
            Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 USCA Case Number
            USCA Case Number 06-15887 for [47] Notice of Appeal filed by Linda D. Sekiya. (bbb, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [47], [50] APPEAL PACKET has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 05/01/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Supplement
                Plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya's REPRESENTATION STATEMENT; certificate of service re: [47] Notice of Appeal filed by Linda D. Sekiya. (cc: DAE) (bbb, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Notice of Appeal
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL # (1) Exhibit a;# (2) and certificate of service as to [46] Judgment by Linda D. Sekiya. Filing fee $ 455. (cc: DAE) (bbb, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT in a civil case. (bbb, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [46] "JUDGMENT in a civil case" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 03/24/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting Defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld's [32] MOTION to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment, and in the alternative to strike jury demand on Plaintiff's family and medical leave act claim. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 03/17/2006. (bbb, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [45] "ORDER granting Defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld's [32] MOTION to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment, and in the alternative to strike jury demand on Plaintiff's family and medical leave act claim" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 03/20/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 44 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                            EO: By agreement of counsel, Settlement Conference and Final Pretrial Conference set 3/28/06 has been continued to 4/11/2006 02:00 PM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG pending Judge Ezra's ruling on the Motion to Dismiss (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [43] Motion Hearing, Motions Taken Under Advisement, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record : Venetia K. Carpenter-Asui. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dhh)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                E.P.: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2006 re [32] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld,, Motion Taken Under Advisement: [32] MOTION to Dismiss. (Court Reporter Cnythia Fazio.) (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA )(dhh)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Supplement
                                  Plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya's SECOND SUPPLEMENT to Plaintiff's [36] [41] Concise Statement of facts in Opposition to Defendant's Concise Statement of facts filed on February 21, 2006# (1) Declaration of Dr. Bernard Portner, M.D.;# (2) certificate of service. (cc: DAE) (bbb, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [38] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 03/07/2006. (bbb, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                                      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [40] "ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 03/08/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Supplement
                                        Plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya 's First SUPPLEMENT to [36] Plaintiff's Concise Statement of facts in Opposition to Defendant's Concise Statement of facts filed on February 21, 2006; # (1) Declaration of Linda D. Sekiya;# (2) Declaration of Dr. Mark H. Bernstein, M.D.;# (3) certificate of service. (cc: DAE) (bbb, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 39 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [32] Defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld's MOTION to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment and in the alternative to strike jury demand on Plaintiff's family and medical leave act claim: Per Counsel's request, Motion Hearing has been continued to 3/14/2006 09:45 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (tl, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006, Terminated: 3/8/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief; Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief; Certificate of Service by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(Helper, Thomas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Reply
                                              REPLY re [32] MOTION to Dismiss Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld's Motion to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment and in the Alternative to Strike Jury Demand on Plaintiff's Family and Medical Leave Act Claim; Certification of Word Count; Certificate of Service filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents# (2) Table of Authorities# (3) Exhibit H)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Concise Statement in Opposition
                                                Plaintiff's Linda D. Sekiya's CONCISE STATE OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION to Defendant's concise statement of facts;# (1) declaration of Linda D. Sekiya;# (2) declaration of Plaintiff's counsel;# (3) Exhibit A;# (4) Exhibit B;# (5) Exhibit C;# (6) Exhibit D;# (7) Exhibit E;# (8) Exhibit F;# (9) Exhibit G [part 1 of 2] pages 1-5;# (10) Exhibit G [part 2 of 2] pages 6-10;# (11) Exhibit H;# (12) Exhibit I;# (13) Exhibit J;# (14) Exhibit K;# (15) Exhibit L;# (16) Exhibit M;# (17) Exhibit N;# (18) Exhibit O;# (19) Exhibit P;# (20) Exhibit Q;# (21) Exhibit R;# (22) Exhibit S;# (23) Exhibit T;# (24) Exhibit U;# (25) Exhibit V;# (26) Exhibit W;# (27) Exhibit X;# (28) Exhibit Y;# (29) Exhibit Z;# (30) Exhibit AA;# (31) Exhibit BB;# (32) Exhibit CC;# (33) Exhibit DD;# (34) Exhibit EE;# (35) Exhibit FF;# (36) Exhibit GG;# (37) Exhibit HH;# (38) Exhibit II;# (39) Exhibit JJ;# (40) Exhibit KK;# (41) Exhibit LL;# (42) Exhibit MM;# (43) Exhibit NN;# (44) Exhibit OO;# (45) certificate of service.(bbb, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya's MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to Defendant's [32] MOTION to Dismiss, for summary judgment and in the alternative to strike jury demand on Plaintiff's Family and Medical Leave Act Claim; certificate of service. (bbb, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                  EO: By agreement of counsel, Settlement Conference set 1/26/06 has been continued to 3/28/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. The time for the Final Pretrial Conference set 3/28/06 at 9:00am has been changed to 10:00am on 3/28/06. All counsel notified.(sna, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Concise Statement in Support of Motion
                                                    Defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld's CONCISE STATEMENT of material facts in Support of [32] MOTION for Summary Judgment; declaration of Godfrey Ching; exhibits a-e; certificate of compliance; certificate of service. (bbb, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005, Terminated: 3/20/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                      Notice of motion; Defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld's MOTION to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment and in the alternative to strike jury demand on Plaintiff's family and medical leave act claim; table of contents, table of authorities; memorandum in support of defendant's motion to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment and in the alternative to strike jury demand on Plaintiff's family and medical leave act claim; certificate of service. (bbb, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
                                                        Set hearing as to [32] MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2006 10:30 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. [see docket entry #32]. (bbb, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld (bbb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (afc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              EP: Status Conference. Decision issued regarding MSBP hearing and case has been dismissed as untimely. 5/9/06 jury trial date shall remain before Judge Ezra. ; In-court hearing held 7/29/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C7-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                EO: Status Conference set 8/03/2005 at 9:00 AM has been moved to 7/29/2005 at 9:15 AM before Judge Chang. cc: all counsel, via fax ; in court hearing set for 9:15 7/29/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                  EO: Status Conference set for 8/03/2005 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. cc: all counsel via fax ; in court hearing set for 9:00 8/3/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                      EP: Further Status Conference. No decision yet. New trial date given. First Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. 1. Jury trial on May 9, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on March 28, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by March 21, 2006 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by (CLOSED) 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by February 8, 2006 7. File Dispositive Motions by December 7, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by April 18, 2006 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by April 25, 2006 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 7, 2005 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 7, 2005 12. Discovery deadline March 10, 2006 13. Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2006 at 10:00am before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by 1/19/2006 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by April 25, 2006 21. File Final witness list by April 18, 2006 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 11, 2006 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by April 18, 2006 26. File objections to the Exhibits by April 25, 2006 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by April 18, 2006 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by April 25, 2006 29. File Trial Brief by April 25, 2006 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: None.; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 3/28/06 ; Discovery ddl set for 3/10/06 ; Motion filing ddl set for 12/7/05 ; settlement/status conference set for 10:00 1/26/06 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 5/9/06 before Judge David A. Ezra ( Ct Rptr : C5-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        EO: Settlement Conference set 7/25/2005 at 2:00 PM has been continued to 7/26/2005 at 11:00 AM before Judge Chang. cc: all counsel via mail ; settlement/status conference set for 11:00 7/26/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          EP: Further Status Conference. There being no appearance by either counsel, Further Status Conference continued to 7/5/05 at 9:00am before Judge Chang. cc: Thomas Helper, via fax Venetia Carpenter-Asui, via fax ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 7/5/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C5-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Description not available
                                                                            EXPERT WITNESS ("Treating Physicians") disclosures; certificate of service - filed by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                              EP: Further Status Conference. Ms. Carpenter-Asui reported that her client called the judge directly and was told that the decision would be out in 6 weeks. Ms. Carpenter-Asui to confirm this in a letter. Further Status Conference set 6/21/05 at 9:00am before Judge Chang. (Ct Rptr: C5-No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Answer
                                                                                Defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld ANSWER to amended complaint [3-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  EP: Status Conference. Plaintiff forwarded a letter to the Judge regarding status of ruling in the MSPB proceedings. Defendant to file Answer. Further Status Conference set 4/25/05 at 9:00am before Judge Chang. ( Ct Rptr: C5-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    EO: Final Pretrial Conference set 9/27/2005 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 10/05/2005 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. cc: all counsel of record via mail ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 10/5/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                      EP :Status Conference Re: MSPB Proceedings. No decision yet on the MSPB hearing held on 12/6/04. The court will allow defendant 30 days to answer. Status Conference set for 3/4/05 at 9:00am before Judge Chang.Venetia Carpenter-Asui Thomas Helper present; ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 3/4/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C7, no record ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (sm)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                        plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya's Notice of WITHDRAWAL without prejudice OF plaintiff's MOTION for stay of proceedings, or in the alternative, that the discrimination claim be tolled [11-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          EP: Plaintiff's Motion for a Stay of Proceedings, or in the Alternative, that the Discrimination Claim be Tolled. Plaintiff to withdraw this Motion without prejudice. [11-1] ( Ct Rptr : C5 9:32-9:33:12) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                            INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service by plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya (bbb)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service by plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya (bbb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                Notice of appearance and SUBSTITUTION of counsel for plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya: terminating attorney William E.H. Tagupa for Linda D. Sekiya and substituting attorney Venetia K. Carpenter-Asui for Linda D. Sekiya (bbb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF hearing; plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya's MOTION for stay of proceedings, or in the alternative, that the discrimination claim be tolled ; declaration of counsel; certificate of service - motion set for 9:30 12/3/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                      EP: Continued Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel has been signed by Mr. Tagupa and Ms. Carpenter-Asui will submit it to the court. Plaintiff filed a Motion for Stay last night. Plaintiff suggests a tolling agreement. Plaintiff agrees, and shall memorialize this in a letter, to postpone defendant's answer date until the Status Conference Re: MSPB Proceedings set for 1/5/05 at 9:00am before Judge Chang. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. 1. Jury trial on November 8, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on September 27, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by September 20, 2005 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by April 8, 2005 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by August 10, 2005 7. File Dispositive Motions by June 8, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by October 18, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by October 25, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by May 9, 2005 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by June 8, 2005 12. Discovery deadline September 9, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for 7/25/2005 at 2:00pm before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by 7/18/2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by October 25, 2005 21. File Final witness list by October 18, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by October 11, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by October 18, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by October 25, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by October 18, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by October 25, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by October 25, 2005 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: None. ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 9/27/05 ; Discovery ddl set for 9/9/05 ; Motion filing ddl set for 6/8/05 ; rule 16 conference held on 9:00 10/28/04 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 7/25/05 ; in court hearing set for 9:00 1/5/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 11/8/05 before Judge David A. Ezra ( Ct Rptr : C5-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                        EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference-This matter continued to October 28, 2004 @9:00 a.m. before Judge Chang. Venetia Carpenter-Asui will be representing the Plaintiff. Ms. Carpenter-Asui is to file within 30days the Substitution of Counsel.; rule 16 conference set for 9:00 10/28/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya of Complaint & Amended Complaint (bbb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                            EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference not held. The docket sheet reflects that the complaint has not been served and no proof of service has been filed. Court explained to Ms. Sekiya that she should file a Proof of Service with the court if service of the complaint has been made. Ms. Sekiya is in the process of meeting with an attorney. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference continued to 10/14/04 at 9:00am before Judge Chang to allow Ms. Sekiya to retain counsel.; rule 16 conference set for 9:00 10/14/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C5-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of defendant Donald H. Rumsfeld; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                EO: At plaintiff's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/02/2004 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 9/01/2004 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Mr. Tagupa to notify all parties. () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1]; demand for jury trial; exhibits; certificate of service by plaintiff Linda D. Sekiya (bbb)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/2/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                      Employment discrimination COMPLAINT; right to sue letter; exhibit a; Summons issued (bbb)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 222720 (bbb)
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?